District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Nevada District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Joshua Godhart v. Tesla, Inc.

Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 20-16140
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 2, 2021 at 12:40 AM EDT (3.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Joshua Godhart, Plaintiff - Appellant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Godhart +1 702 888 2633 +1 818 337 2913 jgodhart@gmail.com
No Logo Joshua J. Godhart, Plaintiff - Appellant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua J. Godhart
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deverie Jean Christensen +41539 494 00x6328 +1 415 394 9401 christensend@jacksonlewis.com
Space Joshua A Sliker +1 702 921 2460 +1 702 921 2461 joshua.sliker@jacksonlewis.com
Attributes
Nature of Suit 3445 - Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nvd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:19-cv-01541-JAD-VCF
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None ?
Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [22] filed by Tesla, Inc.. [11966267] (SD)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None ?
Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [23] in 2 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellee Tesla, Inc.. [11965941] (KWG)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032400540 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
Filed clerk order: The answering brief [22] submitted by Tesla, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [23] submitted by Tesla, Inc. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11960790] (KT)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032397805 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None ?
Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Tesla, Inc.. Date of service: 01/11/2021. [11959478] [20-16140]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDFs of supplemental excerpts of record. 01/12/2021 by KT] (Sliker, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032397767 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None ?
Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Tesla, Inc.. Date of service: 01/11/2021. [11959467] [20-16140]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of answering brief. 01/12/2021 by KT] (Sliker, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032358800 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS ): Granting Motion [20] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellee Tesla, Inc.; Appellee Tesla, Inc. answering brief due 01/11/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11936372] (GS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032324931 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) Appellee Tesla, Inc. Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 01/11/2021. Date of service: 12/09/2020. [11920491] [20-16140] (Christensen, Deverie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None ?
Streamlined request [18] by Appellee Tesla, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellee Tesla, Inc. answering brief due 12/14/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11880970] (BG)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Tesla, Inc.. New requested due date is 12/14/2020. [11880936] [20-16140] (Sliker, Joshua)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [15] filed by Joshua Godhart. [11869065] (SD)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032184232 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed clerk order: The opening brief [15] submitted by Joshua Godhart is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: not applicable. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11857924] (KT)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032182573 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Joshua Godhart. Date of service: 10/13/2020. [11857225] [20-16140] (Godhart, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None ?
ENTRY UPDATED TO CORRECT PARTY REQUESTING STREAMLINED REQUEST. Streamlined request [13] by Appellant Joshua Godhart to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Joshua Godhart opening brief due 10/13/2020. Appellee Tesla, Inc. answering brief due 11/12/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11815054]--[Edited 09/08/2020 by BG] (BG)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/7/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Joshua Godhart. New requested due date is 10/13/2020. [11814957] [20-16140] (Godhart, Joshua)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031991019 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due September 11, 2020; appellee's answering brief is due October 13, 2020; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11771649] (WL)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031966688 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None ?
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-16140: Paid] ). [11753607] (RL)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031940846 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) Appellant Joshua Godhart Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to submit mediation questionnaire]. Date of service: 07/09/2020. [11748579] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [6] .] (TYL)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None ?
The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/09/2020.
To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.
Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11748105]. [20-16140] (AD)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031939555 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) Appellant Joshua Godhart response to Court order dated 06/15/2020. Date of service: 07/09/2020. [11748060] [20-16140] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached PDF of cover sheet. Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 7/15/2020 by TYL] (Godhart, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031939536 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) Appellant Joshua Godhart Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/09/2020. [11748054] [20-16140] --[COURT UPDATE: Removed motion (refiled in entry [9]. 7/10/2020 by TYL] (Godhart, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None ?
Added Attorney(s) Joshua A. Sliker for party(s) Appellee Tesla, Inc., in case 20-16140. [11743371] (JFF)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua Alan Sliker (Jackson Lewis P.C., 300 S. Fourth Street, Suite 900, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101) for Appellee Tesla, Inc.. Date of service: 07/06/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11742262] [20-16140] (Sliker, Joshua)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031878402 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None ?
Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11721720] (CKP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None ?
Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-16140: Due] ). [11721571] (CO)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031868180 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None ?
DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Joshua J. Godhart opening brief due 08/10/2020. Appellee Tesla, Inc. answering brief due 09/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11717135] (JBS)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 142 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?