AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-01568

Tags
Last Updated September 13, 2021 at 3:26 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Townsend KatieLynn +1 202 795 9300 ktownsend@rcfp.org
No Logo BENJAMIN GITTLESON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Townsend KatieLynn +1 202 795 9300 ktownsend@rcfp.org
v.
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/15/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7231125) filed by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., BENJAMIN GITTLESON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Summons, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet, # (4) LCvR 26.1 Certificate)(Townsend, KatieLynn)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?