Arrowhead Central Credit Union v. Tesla Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20CV367177

Tags
Last Updated September 14, 2021 at 12:22 PM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arrowhead Central Credit Union, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Prenovost Normandin Bergh and Dawe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karel Rocha +1 714 547 2444 +1 714 835 2889 krocha@pnbd.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by thetafirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Soheyl Tahsildoost st@thetafirm.com
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
    Blank 10 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
    Case Management Statement
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
        Case Management Statement
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Affidavit
          Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause Hearing
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
            To Complaint atty: Tashsildoost
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                Proof of Service of Summons Complaint
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 275 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?