UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOLTON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-01580-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 16, 2021 at 5:41 PM DT (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Franklin Van Horn +1 202 514 7168 +1 202 514 8780 daniel.vanhorn@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Bolton, John R., Defendant
Officially listed as "JOHN R. BOLTON"
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/16/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1330 Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/21/2020, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/2020, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/21/2020, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/21/2020, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Lodging Classified Declarations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re [3] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Van Horn, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit (Ellis Decl.), # (2) Affidavit (Evanina Decl.), # (3) Affidavit (Mitman Decl.), # (4) Affidavit (Nakasone Decl.), # (5) Affidavit (Ratcliffe Decl.), # (6) Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), # (7) Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), # (8) Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), # (9) Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), # (10) Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), # (11) Exhibit F (Letter of 2/7/2020), # (12) Exhibit G (Letter of 2/24/2020), # (13) Exhibit H (Email of 3/27/2020), # (14) Exhibit I (Email of 5/7/2020), # (15) Exhibit J (Letter of 6/8/2020), # (16) Exhibit K (Letter of 6/10/2020), # (17) Exhibit L (Letter of 6/11/2020), # (18) Exhibit M (Letter of 6/16/2020), # (19) Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JOHN R. BOLTON. (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zsb)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                        Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against JOHN R. BOLTON (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), # (2) Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), # (3) Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), # (4) Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), # (5) Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), # (6) Exhibit F (NY Times Article of 1/26/2020), # (7) Exhibit G (Wash. Post Article of 1/27/2020), # (8) Exhibit H (Letter of 2/7/2020), # (9) Exhibit I (Letter of 2/24/2020), # (10) Exhibit J (CNN Article of 3/3/2020), # (11) Exhibit K (Email of 3/27/2020), # (12) Exhibit L (Politico Article of 4/29/2020), # (13) Exhibit M (Email of 5/7/2020), # (14) Exhibit N (Wash. Post Article of 6/7/2020), # (15) Exhibit O (Letter of 6/8/2020), # (16) Exhibit P (Letter of 6/10/2020), # (17) Exhibit Q (Letter of 6/11/2020), # (18) Civil Cover Sheet, # (19) Summons)(Van Horn, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 226 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?