RE: For the Issuance of a Subpoena for the Taking of a Deposition and the Production of Documents for use in a Foreign Proceeding Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§1782
Federal Court Proceeding Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:20-mi-00042-JPB
District Judge J. P. Boulee, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 16, 2020 at 10:29 PM DT (12.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo iFinex Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Beal +1 858 638 1400 cbeal@dmalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White Provision

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Lester Bonder +1 404 995 8808 sbonder@friedbonder.com
Space David S. Fried +1 404 995 8808 dfried@friedbonder.com
Office Atlanta
Filed 4/10/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Assistance to foreign and international tribunals
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition non-reportable closing
County XX Outside US
Terminated 6/8/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags 4months,CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER denying the [1] Ex Parte Petition for Assistance in Aid of a Foreign Proceeding and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 6/8/2020. (ddm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Terminate MI Case
    Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (ddm)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020 Certificate of Interested Persons
      Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by iFinex Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Digfinex Inc. for iFinex Inc.. (Fried, David)
        LREF
        Blank  Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
        Clerks Notation re [8] Certificate of Interested Persons--Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 5/15/20. (cp)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
          Second Order to Show Cause. It is ordered that the Applicant file an amended certificate of interested persons / corporate disclosure statement within TEN (10) DAYS of this Order. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of the action. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/11/2020. (ddm)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020 Certificate of Interested Persons
            Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by iFinex Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Digfinex Inc. for iFinex Inc.. (Fried, David)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: 4/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER directing that the Applicant file its certificate of interested persons / corporate disclosure statement within 10 days of this Order. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 4/28/2020. (ddm)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Order on Application for Admission PHV
                ORDER approving [3][4] Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/22/20. (bnw)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                  APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [4] APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher J. Beal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9605849).. Attorney Christopher J Beal added appearing on behalf of iFinex Inc. (nmb)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                    APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [3] APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Jason Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9605832).. Attorney Michael Jason Lee added appearing on behalf of iFinex Inc. (nmb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020, Terminated: 4/22/2020 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                      APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher J. Beal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9605849).by iFinex Inc.. (Fried, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020, Terminated: 4/22/2020 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                        APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Jason Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9605832).by iFinex Inc.. (Fried, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                          AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Fee Payment Received
                            Filing Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number AGANDC-9583774 (eop)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 45 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?