Essapour, Antonio v. Tesla Motors Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus, Case No. CV-20-001190

Tags
Last Updated June 16, 2020 at 11:49 PM DT (11.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ESSAPOUR, ANTONIO, Plaintiff
No Logo ESSAPOUR, NANCY, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "TESLA MOTORS INC"
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
Request for Judicial Notice
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
    Declaration: Declaration OF RAYMOND KIM
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
      Declaration: Declaration OF SOHEYL TAHSILDOOST
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
        Notice of Motion & Motion
          Blank 10 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
          Case Management Conference
            Blank 9 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None
            Case Management Conference
              Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None
              Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
                Blank 7 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None
                Case Management Conference Statement
                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None
                  Notice of Case Management Conference
                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None
                    Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None
                      Declaration re: Venue
                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None
                        Declaration re: Venue
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None
                          Complaint
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None
                            Summons Issued / Filed

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 63 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?