The Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit v. Elon Musk, et al.
State Civil Lawsuit Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2020-0477-JRS

Tags
Last Updated June 18, 2020 at 11:29 AM DT (11 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Police And Fire Retirement System Of The City Of Detroit, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit, derivatively on behalf of Tesla, Inc."
v.
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Buss, Bradd"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Unknown Role, Cavium Networks
Unknown Role, Aecom Technology Corp
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Unknown Role, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Echelon Corp
Ehrenpreis, Ira Ehrenpreis, Ira, Defendant
Ellison, Lawrence J. Ellison, Lawrence J., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mollusk Holdings, LLC
Unknown Role, Cephalopod Corp
Unknown Role, Ozark Holding Inc.
Unknown Role, Netledger, Inc.
Unknown Role, K12 Inc.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Draper Associates, LP
Unknown Role, Draper Timothy C
Unknown Role, Fisher John H N
Unknown Role, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Mizuni, Hiromichi, Defendant
No Logo Murdoch, James, Defendant
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Elon"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Kimbal"
Unknown Role, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
No Logo Rice Linda Johnson, Defendant
Unknown Role, Bausch & Lomb, Inc.
Unknown Role, Omnicom Group Inc.
Unknown Role, Kimberly Clark Corp
Unknown Role, Dial Corp /de/
Unknown Role, Grubhub Seamless Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
No Logo Wilson-thompson, Kathleen, Defendant
Unknown Role, KELLOGG CO
Unknown Role, Walgreen Co
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Nominal Defendant
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
Entry of Appearance of Justin T. Hymes of Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP as counsel for nominal defendant Tesla, Inc., and Certificate of Service
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None
    Stipulated [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order
      Blank 24 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None
      Stipulation and Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information, approved by Vice Chancellor Slights on December 11, 2020
        Blank 23 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None
        Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information
          Blank 22 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None
          Notice of Service of Nominal Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants with Certificate of Service
            Blank 21 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None
            Notice of Service with Certificate of Service of Director Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants
              Blank 20 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None
              Notice of Service of Plaintiff’s Responses and Objections to Director Defendants’ First Request for Production of Documents with attached Certificate of Service
                Blank 19 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                Granted with Modifications (Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order)
                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None
                  Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order
                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Request for Production
                    Notice of Service of Director Defendants’ First Request for the Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff, with Certificate of Service
                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service
                      Notice of Service of Plaintiff’s First Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendants with attached Certificate of Service
                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Answer
                        Answer of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. and Certificate of Service
                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                          Entry of Appearance of Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP on behalf of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. and Certificate of Service
                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None
                            Defendants' Answer And Affirmative Defenses To Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint
                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None
                              Granted (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For The Substitution Of Counsel)
                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None
                                Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For The Substitution Of Counsel
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Granted (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time To Respond To Complaint)
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None
                                    Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time To Respond To Complaint
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                      Entry of Appearance of Raymond J. DiCamillo and Kevin M. Gallagher of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A., on Behalf of Defendants and Nominal Defendant
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Certified Mail Return
                                        Registered Mail Green Cards received 07-20-20. All Defendants served at Principal Place of Business on 7-15-20
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Register's Certificate
                                          Register's Certificate of Registered Mailings sent to the USPS on 07.07.2020
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None
                                            Summons as to Defendants Linda Johnson Rice, James Murdoch, Kathleen Wilson-THompson and Hiromichi Mizuno Served Pursuant to 10 Del. C. Section 3114 on June 25, 2020
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None
                                              Summons as to Defendants Elon Musk, Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ephrenpreis, Lawrence J. Ellison, Antonio J. Gracias, Stephen T. Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk Served Pursuant to 10 Del. C. Section 3114 on June 25, 2020
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None
                                                Summons as to Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. Served Pursuant to 8 Del. C. Section 321 on June 25, 2020
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Issuance of Summons
                                                  Issued 1 Summons 1 copy. Issued 2 Summons (3114) 12 copies to Counsel via Fed Ex. 06.24.2020.
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 697 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?