California Newspapers Partnership v. County of Alameda
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20062745

Tags
Last Updated November 28, 2020 at 2:45 AM ST (4.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo California Newspapers Partnership, Petitioner
No Logo Alameda County Public Health Department, Respondent
No Logo County Of Alameda, Respondent
No Logo Carolan, Duffy, Attorney
No Logo Kramer, James, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Writ of Mandate
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conf Continuance 01/28/2021 01:30 PM D- 15
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
        Petition for Writ of Mandate Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
          Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
            Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (15 Pages)
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None ?
              Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (51 Pages)
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed (187 Pages)
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/22/2020 01:30 PM D- 15 (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Petition for Writ of Mandate 10/22/2020 01:30 PM D- 15
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Individual Defendants Attachments To Suplemental Case Management Statment Form CM-110 Filed (10 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Answer to Petition Filed for County of Alameda, Alameda County Public Health Department (12 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                          Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Frank Roesch Granted (1 Page)
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Frank Roesch Filed for California Newspapers Partnership (6 Pages)
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Case Management Conference 08/21/2020 09:00 AM D- 17 (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Calfornia Newspapers Partnership (3 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (143 Pages)

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 384 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?