Securities And Exchange Commission v. Abramoff
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-04190

Tags
Last Updated January 15, 2021 at 3:40 PM ST (5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities And Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alice Liu Jensen +1 415 705 2500 +1 415 705 2501 jensena@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Abramoff, Jack Alan, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jack Alan Abramoff"
Office San Francisco
Filed 6/25/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 12 U.S.C. § 22 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Securities And Exchange Commission re CONSENT OF DEFENDANT JACK ALAN ABRAMOFF (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JACK ALLAN ABRAMOFF)(Jensen, Alice) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Proposed Summons
                          Proposed Summons. (Jensen, Alice) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                            Civil Cover Sheet by Securities And Exchange Commission . (Jensen, Alice) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against Jack Alan Abramoff. Filed bySecurities And Exchange Commission. (Jensen, Alice) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?