iFinex, Inc. v. Enterprise Bank & Trust
Federal Court Proceeding Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:20-mc-00446-SRC
District Judge Stephen R. Clark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2021 at 4:39 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo iFinex Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abigail Leigh Twenter +1 314 621 5070 atwenter@armstrongteasdale.com
Space Christopher J. Beal +1 858 638 1400 cbeal@dmalaw.com
Space Christopher LaRose +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 621 5065 clarose@atllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by mjllaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Jason Lee +1 949 551 1575 +1 214 800 5107 michael@mjllaw.com
No Logo Enterprise Bank & Trust, Respondent
Office St. Louis
Filed 6/25/2020
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Within US but Outside District
Terminated 11/24/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Entry of Appearance
    ENTRY of Appearance by Abigail Leigh Twenter for Plaintiff iFinex, Inc.. (Twenter, Abigail)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  SRC COVID-19 Remark
      Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Entry of Appearance
        ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher Beal for Plaintiff iFinex, Inc.. (Beal, Christopher)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Entry of Appearance
          ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Jason Lee for Plaintiff iFinex, Inc.. (Lee, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Disclosure of OrganizationalInterests Certificate
            DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff iFinex, Inc.. Parent companies: DigFinex Inc., Subsidiaries: Betfinex Prediction Markets N.V., BFX (BVI) Limited, BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Bitfinex Token Sales Inc., Dazarr Limited, EOSFinex Inc., iFinex Financial Technologies Limited, iFinex Inc., and Unus Sed Leo Limited., Publicly held company: None,. (LaRose, Christopher)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 memorandum in support of motion
              MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re [1] MOTION to Enforce Subpoena with receipt number AMOEDC-7985602, in the amount of $47Ex Parte Application to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to 28USC Section 1782 Memorandum of Points and Authority filed by Plaintiff iFinex, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Devansini, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Request for Production)(LaRose, Christopher)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020, Terminated: 7/22/2020 Motion to Enforce Subpoena
                MOTION to Enforce Subpoena with receipt number AMOEDC-7985602, in the amount of $47Ex Parte Application to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to 28USC Section 1782 Memorandum of Points and Authority, filed by iFinex, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(LaRose, Christopher)
                LREF
                Blank  Case Opening Notification
                Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?