USA v. Rothenberg
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cr-00266-WHA

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2021 at 5:10 PM DT (3.8 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Joseph Walsh +1 415 436 7248 nicholas.walsh@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle F. Waldinger +1 415 436 6830 +1 415 436 7234 kyle.waldinger@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Rothenberg, Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Brent Rothenberg"
Officer/Director, Sackler, David
Officer/Director, Morgans Foods Inc
Officer/Director, Cadus Pharmaceutical Corp
Officer/Director, Moab Partners L P
Officer/Director, Moab Capital Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Moab GP LLC
Officer/Director, Mac-gray Corp
Officer/Director, Mac-gray Corp
Officer/Director, Mac-gray Corp
Officer/Director, Mac-gray Corp
Officer/Director, CAPITAL SOUTHWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Perceptron Inc/mi

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene G. Illovsky +1 510 394 5885 +1 650 494 0792 eugene@boersch-illovsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela Chuang +1 415 436 7700 +1 415 436 7706 angela_chuang@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Michael Brent Rothenberg (1)
Office San Francisco
Filed 6/26/2020
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
320-mj-70834-MAG
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344 and 2 Bank Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 12-18
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 and 2 Wire Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 and 2 False Statements to a Financial Institution and Aiding and Abetting
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344 and 2 Bank Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 and 2 False Statements to a Financial Institution and Aiding and Abetting
Count 5-7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 and 2 Wire Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 8-11
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-4601.F
Offense Level 4
181957 and 2 Engaging in Monetary Transactions Derived from Specified Unlawful Activity and Aiding and Abetting
Count 12s-23s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1343 & 2 Wire Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1344 & 2 Bank Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1014 & 2 False Statements to a Financial Institution and Aiding and Abetting
Count 3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1344 & 2 Bank Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 4s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1014 & 2 False Statements to a Financial Institution and Aiding and Abetting
Count 5s-7s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1343 & 2 Wire Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 8s-11s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-4601.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1957 & 2 Engaging in Monetary Transactions in Property Derived from Specified Unlawful Activity and Aiding and Abetting
Defendant Custody Status Not in Custody
Flag E-ProSe
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Separate Trial on Counts
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/11/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/4/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Change Venue
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/27/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/4/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                    CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Brent Rothenberg (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 11/16/2020. Status Conference set for 12/15/2020 12:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. All parties appeared by Zoom videoconference. Defendant consented to proceed by Zoom videoconference. Ms. Chuang is appointed as counsel this date. FTR Time 12:02-12:05. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING. I.D. of Counsel hearing is reset to 11/16/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020) Modified on 11/6/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [27] Stipulation to continue hearing as to Michael Brent Rothenberg (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/6/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020, Terminated: 11/6/2020 stipulation
                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Michael Brent Rothenberg to Continue. (Chuang, Angela) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                  Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[25] Order,. should have been filed in 20-mj-71490-MAG (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    *Disregard-does not apply to this case*ORDER RE: DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Michael Brent Rothenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/28/2020. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (lskS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Arraignment as to Michael Brent Rothenberg (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s,5s-7s,8s-11s,12s-23s held on 10/28/2020, plead not guilty. ID of Counsel Hearing as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 10/28/2020, Added attorney prov. Angela Chuang for Michael Brent Rothenberg. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 11/9/2020 10:30AMin San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Status Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Dft consents to proceed via Zoom video. Mr. Rothenberg also appears pro se. Ms. Chuang needs the Gov't to produce discovery re financial information to help assist in the completion of a financial affidavit. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 ID of Counsel HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ID of Counsel Hearing as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 10/21/2020 David Rizk, spec. appear. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 10/28/2020 10:30AMin San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Dft consents to proceed via Zoom video. Time excluded from STA for effective preparation of counsel: 10/21/2020-10/28/2020.Mr. Rothenberg also appears pro se.Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Objection by Michael Brent Rothenberg (Rothenberg, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/17/2020, Entered: 10/17/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The Status RE:ID of Counsel, set for Wednesday, 10/21/2020 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Spero will be by Zoom. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Zoom Webinar ID: 161 926 0804. Password: 050855.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2020)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Status Conference as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 9/21/2020. Status Conference re ID counsel set for 10/21/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding held via video conference. Defendant consents to proceed by video. Defendant has not retained counsel and requests more time to obtain legal representation. The Court excludes time until 10/21/20. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                Summons Returned Executed on 6/25/2020 as to Michael Brent Rothenberg. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 ID of Counsel HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: ID of Counsel Hearing as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 8/27/2020, Status Conference as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 8/27/2020 Arraignment set for 9/21/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 9/21/2020 10:30AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Defendant does not waive his right to counsel. The Court grants defendant's request for continuance to retain counsel. Time excluded under 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv) and the Speedy Trial Act from 8/27/20 to 9/21/20.Court Reporter: Lee Ann Shortridge. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/27/2020 Exhibits
                                                                                                                    Exhibits B-E by Michael Brent Rothenberg re [16] Reply to Response (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit E)(Rothenberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Michael Brent Rothenberg re [8] MOTION to Dismiss, [13] Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Rothenberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: 8/20/2020 indictment
                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Michael Brent Rothenberg (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s-7s, 8s-11s, 12s-23s. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/4/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service by USA as to Michael Brent Rothenberg re [13] Memorandum in Opposition (Waldinger, Kyle) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: 8/4/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Michael Brent Rothenberg United States Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss Information With Prejudice (Waldinger, Kyle) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: 7/24/2020 response
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Michael Brent Rothenberg [11] Order RESPONSE TO ORDER BY EUGENE ILLOVSKY (Illovsky, Eugene) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/21/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Sealed Document - No NEF issued
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. No NEF issued. Not served by CSA. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting [3] Stipulation Excluding Time Under Speedy Trial Act as to Michael Brent Rothenberg (1).(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Notice Of Related Case In A Criminal Action by USA as to Michael Brent Rothenberg (Waldinger, Kyle) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Information with Prejudice by Michael Brent Rothenberg. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kyle F. Waldinger appearing for USA. Notice Of Appearance Of Additional Assistant United States Attorney (Waldinger, Kyle) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Docket CallCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: initial appearance as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 6/26/2020. Attorney is Eugene Illovsky specially appearing. Def. consents to appear by video. Court issues bond in 3:20-70834 only. Set for 8/27/2020 10:30 before Mag. Judge van Kuelen for status on arraignment/ID counsel. Total Time in Court 16 mins. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Initial Appearance as to Michael Brent Rothenberg held on 6/26/2020, attorney Eugene Illovsky specially appearing. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 8/27/2020 10:30AMin San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Def. consents to video appearance.Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: 6/26/2020, Terminated: 7/7/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Michael Brent Rothenberg re Set/Reset Hearings,, [1] Complaint, to Exclude Time under the Speedy Trial Act and Waiver of Time under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5.1 filed by USA. (Walsh, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: 6/26/2020 information - felony
                                                                                                                                                  INFORMATION as to Michael Brent Rothenberg (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-7, 8-11, 12-18. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: # (1) penalty sheet) (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: # (2) cover sheet) (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/26/2020) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT as to Michael Brent Rothenberg (1). (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)[3:20-mj-70834-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Michael Brent Rothenberg re [1] Complaint. Initial Appearance set for 6/26/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Zoom link: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/westmore-kandis-a-kaw/ (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)[3:20-mj-70834-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?