Woodstock et al v. City of Portland et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-01035-SI
District Judge Michael H. Simon, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2021 at 4:30 PM DT (2.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alex Milan Tracy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
No Logo Brian Conley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
No Logo Doug Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Gunnar Martz +1 415 599 0210 martz@braunhagey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly K. Simon +1 503 227 6928 ksimon@aclu-or.org

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
Space Jonas Noah Hagey +1 415 599 0210 hagey@braunhagey.com
No Logo Index Newspapers LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
No Logo John Rudoff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly K. Simon +1 503 227 6928 ksimon@aclu-or.org

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
Space Jonas Noah Hagey +1 415 599 0210 hagey@braunhagey.com
Space Gunnar Martz +1 415 599 0210 martz@braunhagey.com
No Logo Justin Yau, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
No Logo Kat Mahoney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly K. Simon +1 503 227 6928 ksimon@aclu-or.org

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
Space Jonas Noah Hagey +1 415 599 0210 hagey@braunhagey.com
Space Gunnar Martz +1 415 599 0210 martz@braunhagey.com
No Logo Mathieu Lewis-Rolland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly K. Simon +1 503 227 6928 ksimon@aclu-or.org

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
Space Jonas Noah Hagey +1 415 599 0210 hagey@braunhagey.com
Space Gunnar Martz +1 415 599 0210 martz@braunhagey.com
No Logo Sam Gehrke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly K. Simon +1 503 227 6928 ksimon@aclu-or.org

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
Space Jonas Noah Hagey +1 415 599 0210 hagey@braunhagey.com
Space Gunnar Martz +1 415 599 0210 martz@braunhagey.com
No Logo Sergio Olmos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
No Logo Tuck Woodstock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly K. Simon +1 503 227 6928 ksimon@aclu-or.org

Toggle Switch Represented by BraunHagey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Athul K. Acharya +1 415 963 4493 acharya@braunhagey.com
Space Matthew Brooks Borden +1 415 599 0212 +1 415 276 1808 borden@braunhagey.com
Space Jonas Noah Hagey +1 415 599 0210 hagey@braunhagey.com
Space Gunnar Martz +1 415 599 0210 martz@braunhagey.com
v.
No Logo City of Portland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space YoungWoo Joh +1 503 823 9969 +1 503 823 3089 youngwoo.joh@portlandoregon.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan C. Bailey +1 503 823 9968 +1 503 823 3089 ryan.bailey@portlandoregon.gov
Space Naomi Sheffield +1 503 823 4047 naomi.sheffield@portlandoregon.gov
Space Denis M. Vannier +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 denis.vannier@portlandoregon.gov
No Logo John Does 1-60, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
No Logo U.s. Marshals Service, Defendant
No Logo National Police Association, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy & Buchal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L. Buchal +1 503 227 1034 jbuchal@mbllp.com
  Entries (154) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None reply to motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None MOTION - Miscellaneous
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None reply to motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Stay
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Opinion and Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/9/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Appear as Amicus Curiae
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Justin Yau in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[54].) (Borden, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Doug Brown in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[54].) (Borden, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Motion for temporary restraining order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borden, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Alex Milan Tracy, Sam Gehrke, Brian Conley, Index Newspapers LLC, Tuck Woodstock, Doug Brown, Justin Yau, Mathieu Lewis-Rolland, Kat Mahoney, John Rudoff, Sergio Olmos against All Defendants (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Summons). (Borden, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opinion and Order - The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. ECF [42]. Signed on 7/17/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Motion Hearing HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF TELEPHONE ORAL ARGUMENT: ORDER - Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF [42]) is taken under advisement as of 7/16/2020. Athul K. Acharya, Kelly K. Simon, and Matthew Bordon present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Denis M. Vannier present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge John V. Acosta. Ordered Motions [2] by Gunnar Martz, [3] by Matthew Borden, and [4] by Noah Hagey to appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs are granted. Ordered the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed discovery plan to the Court by 7/30/2020. The discovery plan shall address the discovery needed for a settlement conference and a timetable to complete discovery. If the parties are unable to agree, each parties' position shall be addressed in the proposed discovery plan. Matthew Borden, Gunnar Martz, Athul Acharya present as counsel for plaintiffs. Denis Vannier present as counsel for defendants. Tape No: Hearing was not recorded. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. (cw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Stipulated OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated Preliminary Injunction. Signed on 7/16/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Emergency Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [42]. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Emergency Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [42] Oral Argument requested. Filed by City of Portland. (Vannier, Denis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER - Defendant City of Portland's response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (ECF [42]) is due by the close of business on Wednesday, July 15, 2020, as agreed upon by the parties. Plaintiff's reply is due by 8:00 a.m. on Thursday, July 16, 2020. The Court will hear oral argument by telephone on Thursday, July 16, 2020 at 3:00PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Mathieu Lewis-Rolland Regarding Events of July 12, 2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition[42].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Garrison Davis Regarding Events of July 12, 2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition[42].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020, Terminated: 7/17/2020 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Attorney Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Association of Attorney Ryan C. Bailey,Ryan C. Bailey,Ryan C. Bailey for City of Portland. Filed by City of Portland. (Bailey, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Amended Complaint . Filed by Sam Gehrke, Doug Brown, Tuck Woodstock, Mathieu Lewis-Rolland, Kat Mahoney, John Rudoff, Index Newspapers LLC, Alex Milan Tracy, Brian Conley, Justin Yau, Sergio Olmos against All Defendants. (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Attorney Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Association of Attorney YoungWoo Joh for City of Portland. Filed by City of Portland. (Joh, YoungWoo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order - SETTING a Telephone Status Conference for Thursday, July 16, 2020 at 10:30 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta for the purpose of discussing the scheduling of a settlement conference pursuant to Judge Simon's Order [37]. The Court's conference call information shall be provided by separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) Modified on 7/14/2020 to correct month of status conference from June to July (mja).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - The Court directs the parties in both Woodstock v. City of Portland, Case No. 20-cv-1035-SI, and Elia v. Wheeler, Case No. 20-cv-1106-SI, to contact the chambers of United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta for the purpose of promptly participating in a joint settlement conference in both matters. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Denis M. Vannier appearing on behalf of City of Portland Filed by on behalf of City of Portland. (Vannier, Denis) Modified on 7/9/2020 to reflect correction representation from All Defendants to City of Portland, NEF regenerated.(rs).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: 7/3/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance of Naomi Sheffield appearing on behalf of City of Portland Filed by on behalf of City of Portland. (Sheffield, Naomi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Order on Motion to Appear as Amicus CuriaeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - The National Police Association's Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae (ECF [31]) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Order on motion for Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed on 7/2/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Ed Hutchison . Filed by National Police Association. (Related document(s): Motion to appear as amicus curiae[31].) (Buchal, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020, Terminated: 7/2/2020 Motion to appear as amicus curiae
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by National Police Association. (Buchal, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. The Court takes this matter under advisement on 7/2/2020. Matthew Borden, Athul K. Acharya, Gunner Martz, and Kelly K. Simon present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Denis M. Vannier and Naomi Sheffield present as counsel for Defendants. Beth Ann Creighton and Michael Rose present as amicus/potential intervenor. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: ORDER - Setting a further Telephone Conference for 7/2/2020 at 11:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Matthew Borden, Athul K. Acharya, Gunner Martz, and Kelly K. Simon present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Naomi Sheffield present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Declaration of Alex Milan Tracy in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Borden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Declaration of Kat Mahoney in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - Setting a Telephone Conference to discuss the status of the case for 7/1/2020 at 2:00PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Alex Zielinski in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Tuck Woodstock in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Alex Milan Tracy in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Elliot Tippie in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Blair Stenvick in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Case Reassignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Suzette Smith in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of John Rudoff in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Zach Putnam in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Sergio Olmos in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Nathan Millsap in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Kat Mahoney in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Mathieu Lewis-Rolland in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Wm. Steven Humphrey in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Sam Gehrke in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Doug Brown in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Matthew Borden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order[7].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020, Terminated: 7/2/2020 Motion for temporary restraining order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Acharya, Athul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Portland. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/27/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/27/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 11/27/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney J. Noah Hagey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6911218. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hagey, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew B. Borden. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6911177. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Borden, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Gunnar K. Martz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6911137. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Martz, Gunnar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney J. Noah Hagey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6911218[4] : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew B. Borden. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6911177[3] : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Gunnar K. Martz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6911137[2] : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2020, Entered: 6/28/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6907171 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Doug Brown, Tuck Woodstock, Sam Gehrke, Mathieu Lewis-Rolland, Kat Mahoney, John Rudoff against All Defendants (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Proposed Summons). (Simon, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?