Hunter v. Tesla Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20064015

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hunter, Kevin, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Antonucci, Barbara I., Attorney
No Logo Jalil-valles, Shahla, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Wrongful Termination
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None ?
Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Dropped from dept: 19 date: 01/25/2021 time: 03:00 P
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None ?
    Dismissal Court Ordered Without Prejudice Filed (7 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None ?
      Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (7 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
        Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Joint Stip for Binding Arbiration and Order to D (7 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 14 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
          Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 01/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (87 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 12 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conf Continuance 01/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Statement of Tesla Inc Filed (6 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Statement of Kevin Hunter Filed (6 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla Inc (13 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Inc Filed (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                            Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Initial Case Management Conference 10/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 19 (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kevin Hunter (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed (18 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?