Cuenca v. Kaiser Permanente
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20065123

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 30, 2020 at 1:08 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cuenca, Michael, Plaintiff
v.
Kaiser Permanente Kaiser Permanente, Defendant
No Logo Schwartz, Bryan, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conference 10/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 23 (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None ?
    Complex Determination Hearing 09/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 23
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None ?
      Complex Designation Requested
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None ?
        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Cuenca (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None ?
          Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None ?
            Complaint - Other Employment Filed (27 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 193 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?