Edwards v. Telsa, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20065951

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edwards, Jason, Plaintiff
No Logo Edwards, Kristian, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Telsa, Inc"
No Logo Razavi, Poorad, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Product Liability
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None ?
Notice of Case Transferred Out of County Filed
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None ?
    Stipulation and Order Re: Transfer Out of County Granted (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None ?
      Stipulation and Order Re: Transfer Out of County Filed for Kristian Edwards, Jason Edwards (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?
        Initial Case Management Conference 11/09/2020 03:00 PM D- 514 (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
          Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None ?
            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None ?
              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kristian Edwards (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                Complaint - Product Liability Filed (27 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 433 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?