USA v. Maxwell
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cr-00330-AJN

Tags
Last Updated May 14, 2021 at 7:10 PM DT (1.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maurene Ryan Comey +1 212 637 2324 maurene.comey@usdoj.gov
Space Alison Gainfort Moe +1 212 637 2225 alison.moe@usdoj.gov
Space Alex Rossmiller +1 212 637 2415 alexander.rossmiller@usdoj.gov
v.
Maxwell, Ghislaine Maxwell, Ghislaine, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ghislaine Maxwell"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Ghislaine Maxwell (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/29/2020
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO ENTICE MINORS TO TRAVEL TO ENGAGE IN ILLEGAL SEX ACTS
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2422.F
Offense Level 4
182422.F COERCION OR ENTICEMENT OFA MINOT TO TRAVEL TO ENGAGE IN ILLEGAL SEX ACTS
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO TRANSPORT MINORS WITH INTENT TO ENGAGE IN CRIMINAL SEXUAL ACTIVITY
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2423.F
Offense Level 4
182423.F COERCION OR ENTICEMENT OF MINOR FEMALE (TRANSPORTATION OF A MINOR WITH INTENT TO ENGAGE IN CRIMINAL SEXUAL ACTIVITY)
Count 5-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1623.F
Offense Level 4
181623.F FALSE DECLARATIONS BEFORE GRAND JURY/COURT (PERJURY)
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (303) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 189 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. The Court is in receipt of the Government's letter responding to its March 18, 2021 order regarding redactions to its omnibus memorandum of law in opposition to the Defendants twelve pretrial motions. Dkt. No. 170. the Court ORDERS that the information contained on pages 129134 of the Governments brief be unredacted. With respect to the proposed redactions to pages 118119 and Exhibit 11, the Court now understands that the parties seek redactions on the basis that the material has been maintained under seal in Giuffre v. Maxwell, Case No 15-cv-7433 (S.D.N.Y.). By April 1, 2021, the parties must meet and confer and either submit to the Court justification for those redactionsbeyond that it has been ordered redacted in the civil matteror, in the alternative, notify the Court that the parties are no longer seeking those redactions. If the parties disagree, they shall indicate their separate views in the joint letter. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/29/21)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 188 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, Lara Pomerantz, and Andrew Rohrbach dated March 29, 2021 re: S2 Superseding Indictment Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 187 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 indictment
                                                                                                                                                          (S2) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Ghislaine Maxwell (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-8ss. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 186 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: The Court sees no reason to maintain the redactions on Boies Schiller Flexner LLP's March 26, 2021 letter. Dkt. No. 183. Unless the Government indicates an objection to removing those redactions by March 29, 2021, BSF shall file the unredacted version on the docket on March 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/26/2021) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 185 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, Lara Pomerantz, and Andrew Rohrbach dated March 26, 2021 re: Recent decision in United States v. Schulte, 17 Cr. 548 (PAC) Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 184 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sigrid S. McCawley dated March 26, 2021 re: Proposed redactions to March 22, 2021 Letter (ECF No. 183) Document filed by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP. (McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 183 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sigrid S. McCawley dated March 22, 2021 re: Objection to Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell's motion for an order authorizing a Rule 17(c) subpoena. Document filed by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP. (McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 182 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24312691. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP as to Ghislaine Maxwell. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, # (2) Florida Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 181 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance of Sigrid S. McCawley for Boies Schiller Flexner LLP and the Victims it Represents as to Ghislaine Maxwell (McCawley, Sigrid)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 180 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of David Boies for Boies Schiller Flexner LLP and the Victims it Represents as to Ghislaine Maxwell (Boies, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [182] MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24312691. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 173 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ghislaine Maxwell from [169] Order, Terminate Motions. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 172 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. On March 5, 2021, Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell submitted to the Court an application for an order authorizing a subpoena pursuant to Rule 17(c)(3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. The proposed subpoena was directed at a law firm that represents alleged victims of the Defendant. As is standard for Rule 17(c) subpoenas, the application was made ex parte and under seal on the ground that it reveals defense strategy....[*** See this Order ***]... Rule 17(c)(3) provides that "[a]fter [an indictment] is filed, a subpoena requiring the production of personal or confidential information about a victim may be served on a third party only by court order," but "before entering the order and unless there are exceptional circumstances, the court must require giving notice to the victim so that the victim can move to quash or modify the subpoena or otherwise object." Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c)(3). Consistent with the Rule, on March 12, 2021, in a sealed ex parte Order, the Court required defense counsel to provide notice to alleged victims whose personal or confidential information may be disclosed by the proposed subpoena. The Court also gave the alleged victims an opportunity to object to or request modifications of the subpoena as required by Rule 17(c)(3). On March 19, 2021, the Court received a letter from the law firm indicating that it can provide notice to alleged victims whose personal or confidential information may be elicited by the subpoena. The law firm shall provide notice to any such alleged victims it represents. In that letter, the law firm also interposed substantial objections on behalf of the law firm and the alleged victims it represents. Those objections are functionally the equivalent of a motion to quash, even though the subpoena has not yet issued. So that the Court can receive adversarial briefing on the proposed subpoena comparable to a motion to quash, the law firm shall enter an appearance and file its objections on the public docket. See United States v. Ray, No. 20-CR-110 (LJL), 2020 WL 6939677, at *10 (S.D.N.Y. Nov. 25, 2020) ("[I]f the Court determines that the subpoena calls for personal or confidential information about a victim, it requires the requesting party have given notice to the victim before it permits the service of the subpoena. If the victim objects, the Court will then determine whether to modify or quash the subpoena, including on grounds that Nixon was not satisfied."). In advance of noticing an appearance and filing, the law firm shall meet and confer with defense counsel to see if any issues can be narrowed before formal briefing. Moreover, prior to filing, the law firm shall confer with defense counsel as to any proposed, necessary, and tailored redactions to the objections. The law firm's objections with any proposed redactions shall be filed on or before March 26, 2021. Any redactions must be justified consistent with Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). Within one week of the filing of objections, defense counsel may respond to the subpoena objections. The law firm may reply within three days of the Defendant's response.(See Citation 1 on this Order). Counsel shall confer regarding any proposed redactions for all briefing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/24/2021)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [173] Notice of Appeal were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to Ghislaine Maxwell to US Court of Appeals re: [173] Notice of Appeal. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appeal Remark as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [173] Notice of Appeal. $505.00 Appeal Fee Due. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 171 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [160] THIRD MOTION for Bond . . (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 170 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, Lara Pomerantz, and Andrew Rohrbach dated March 22, 2021 re: Redactions to Government Opposition to Defense Pretrial Motions Document filed by USA. (Pomerantz, Lara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell's third motion for release on bail, Dkt. No. 160, is DENIED. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and propose and justify any redactions to the Defendant's reply brief by March 24, 2021. If they conclude that redactions are unnecessary, the Defendant is ORDERED to docket the unredacted version of the brief by March 24, 2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/22/2021) (See ORDER set forth) (ap) Modified on 3/23/2021 (ap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 168 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. On February 26, 2021, the Government filed its omnibus memorandum of law opposing Defendants' twelve pretrial motions. It filed the brief, along with the corresponding exhibits, under temporary seal pending the Court's resolution of its request to redact sensitive or confidential information. See Dkt. No. 162. On March 9, 2021, the Defendant objected to certain of the redactions that the Government had proposed, and she proposed additional redactions. Having considered the parties' respective positions, the Court will grant the Government's requests for redactions and sealing, as well as the Defendant's additional redaction requests, with the exceptions discussed below. Finally, the Court denies the Governments request to file Exhibit 11 entirely under seal. While portions of that transcript have been redacted, other portions are part of the public record. See Giuffre v. Maxwell, Case No. 15-cv-7433, Dkt. No. 1212-1. In light of this, the Court sees no basis to file the transcript entirely under seal rather than by redacting the relevant portions. In light of the above, the Government is hereby ORDERED to either docket on ECF their brief and the corresponding exhibits, consistent with this Order, or to file a letter with the Court justifying more tailored redaction and sealing requests regarding pages 1128 and 187188 and Exhibits 8 and 9 by no later than March 22, 2021. The parties are further ORDERED to meet, confer, and jointly propose redactions to the Defendant's cover letter objecting to the Government's proposed redactions by March 22, 2021. Finally, the parties are ORDERED to meet, confer, and propose redactions to Exhibit 11 of the Government's submission by March 22, 2021 (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/18/21)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: 3/16/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bobbi C. Sternheim dated 03/16/2021 re: Letter regarding Reply to Bail Motion (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated March 15, 2021 re: Pretrial Motion Replies (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated March 9, 2021 re: Opposition to Third Bail Motion Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Pomerantz, Lara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT [163] LETTER MOTION To request a 10-day extension of time until Monday, March 15, 2021 to file our reply re: [163] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated March 1, 2021 re: Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule...ENDORSEMENT...The Defendant's request is GRANTED. Her reply to the Government's Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to the Defendants Pretrial Motions is now due on March 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/1/21) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021, Terminated: 3/1/2021 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated March 1, 2021 re: Extension of Time to File Reply to Government Opposition to Defense Pretrial Motions . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ghislaine Maxwell: Defendant Replies due by 3/15/2021 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 162 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, Lara Pomerantz, and Andrew Rohrbach dated February 26, 2021 re: Cover Letter for Government Opposition to Defense Pretrial Motions Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 161 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On February 23, 2021, Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell filed a third motion for release on bail. Dkt. No. 160. The Government's response is due March 9, 2021, and the Defendants reply is due March 16, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/9/2021. Replies due by 3/16/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/24/2021) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 160 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021, Terminated: 3/22/2021 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              THIRD MOTION for Bond . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 159 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bobbi C. Sternheim dated 02/16/2021 re: Conditions of Pretrial Confinement (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 158 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated February 5, 2021 re: MDC Conditions Update Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 156 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 155 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 154 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 149 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Bobbi C. Sternheim in Support as to Ghislaine Maxwell re [147] MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Pretrial Disclosures.. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 148 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [147] MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Pretrial Disclosures.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B (Sealed), # (3) Exhibit C (Sealed), # (4) Exhibit D (Sealed), # (5) Exhibit E)(Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Pretrial Disclosures. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 146 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [145] MOTION to Strike Surplusage from Superseding Indictment.. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Surplusage from Superseding Indictment. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 144 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [143] MOTION to Dismiss Counts One Through Four of the Superseding Indictment as Time-Barred.. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 143 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Counts One Through Four of the Superseding Indictment as Time-Barred. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 142 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [141] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment for Breach of Non-Prosecution Agreement.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C (Sealed), # (4) Exhibit D (Sealed), # (5) Exhibit E (Sealed), # (6) Exhibit F (Sealed), # (7) Exhibit G (Sealed), # (8) Exhibit H (Sealed))(Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 141 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment for Breach of Non-Prosecution Agreement. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 140 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [139] MOTION to Suppress Under the Fourth Amendment, Martindell, and the Fifth Amendment All Evidence Obtained from the Governments Subpoena to REDACTED and to Dismiss Counts Five And Six.. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 139 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Suppress Under the Fourth Amendment, Martindell, and the Fifth Amendment All Evidence Obtained from the Governments Subpoena to REDACTED and to Dismiss Counts Five And Six. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 138 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [137] MOTION to Dismiss Counts One Through Six of the Superseding Indictment for Pre-Indictment Delay.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 137 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Counts One Through Six of the Superseding Indictment for Pre-Indictment Delay. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 136 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [135] MOTION to Dismiss Counts Five and Six of the Superseding Indictment Because the Alleged Misstatements are Not Perjurious as a Matter of Law.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K)(Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 135 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Counts Five and Six of the Superseding Indictment Because the Alleged Misstatements are Not Perjurious as a Matter of Law. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 134 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [133] MOTION to Suppress Under the Due Process Clause All Evidence Obtained from the Governments Subpoena to REDACTED and to Dismiss Counts Five and Six.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 133 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Suppress Under the Due Process Clause All Evidence Obtained from the Governments Subpoena to REDACTED and to Dismiss Counts Five and Six. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 132 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: The Defendant is hereby ORDERED to docket the redacted documents and corresponding exhibits by no later than February 5, 2021. With respect to Motion 3, the Defendant is ORDERED to docket the version that includes the Government's proposed redactions in addition to her own. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/4/2021)(See ORDER as set forth) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 131 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: 2/2/2021 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on Letter addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sophia Papapetru ( Staff Attorney, MDC Brooklyn, Federal Bureau of Prisons) dated January 25, 2021. ENDORSEMENT: Having considered the request submitted by the Bureau of Prisons ("BOP") that the Court vacate its January 15, 2021 Order, Dkt. No. 117, as well as the Government's and the Defendant's responses, Dkt. Nos. 129, 130, the Court hereby DENIES the BOP's request to vacate the Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/2/2021)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 130 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bobbi C. Sternheim dated 02/02/2021 re: Opposition to MDC letter (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 129 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated February 1, 2021 re: MDC Laptop Access Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 128 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, Lara Pomerantz, and Andrew Rohrbach dated January 28, 2021 re: Defendant's Proposed Redactions to Pre-Trial Motions Document filed by USA. (Pomerantz, Lara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 127 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On January 25, 2021, the Defendant filed twelve pre-trial motions. Because there is a request to redact sensitive or confidential information, several of the motions have been filed under temporary seal. The Government may respond to the Defendant's proposed redactions within two days of this Order. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/26/2021) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 126 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [125] MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment as it was Obtained in Violation of the Sixth Amendment.. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 125 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment as it was Obtained in Violation of the Sixth Amendment. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 124 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [123] MOTION to Dismiss Counts One through Four of the Superseding Indictment for Lack of Specificity.. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 123 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Counts One through Four of the Superseding Indictment for Lack of Specificity. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 122 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [121] MOTION to Dismiss Either Count One Or Count Three of the Superseding Indictment as Multiplicitous.. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 121 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Either Count One Or Count Three of the Superseding Indictment as Multiplicitous. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 120 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re [119] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Ghislaine Maxwell (1) Count 5s-6s,5-6 .. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 119 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Motion for Separate Trial on Counts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Ghislaine Maxwell (1) Count 5s-6s,5-6 . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Mark S. Cohen dated January 25, 2021 re: Pretrial Motions (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On January 25, 2021, the Court received by email the attached letter from the Bureau of Prisons ("BOP"). In the letter, the BOP requests that the Court vacate its January 15, 2021 Order, Dkt. No. 116, which directed the BOP to give the Defendant access to her Government provided laptop computer on weekends and holidays during the hours that she is permitted to review discovery. The Defendant and the Government may respond to the BOP's letter within one week of this Order. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/25/2021) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 116 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on [115] LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated January 14, 2021 re: Laptop Access. ENDORSEMENT: The unobjected-to request is GRANTED. The Bureau of Prisons is ORDERED to give the Defendant access to the laptop computer on weekends and holidays during the hours that she is permitted to review discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/15/2021) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00, receipt number 465401271727 as to Ghislaine Maxwell on 01/15/2021 re: [113] Notice of Appeal filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (nd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Case Number 21-0058 from the U.S. Court of Appeals, 2nd Circ. as to Ghislaine Maxwell, assigned to [113] Notice of Appeal filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (nd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated January 14, 2021 re: Laptop Access (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Internet Citation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INTERNET CITATION NOTE as to Ghislaine Maxwell: Material from decision with Internet citation re: [106] Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [113] Notice of Appeal were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to Ghislaine Maxwell to US Court of Appeals re: [113] Notice of Appeal. (nd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 113 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ghislaine Maxwell from [104] Order. (nd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 112 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell (1) denying [109] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated January 8, 2021 re: Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. ENDORSEMENT: The request is denied. Good cause for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal has not been provided. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/11/2021) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appeal Remark as to re: [113] Notice of Appeal by Ghislaine Maxwell. $505.00 Appeal filing fee due. (nd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 109 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021, Terminated: 1/11/2021 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated January 8, 2021 re: Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 108 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell (1) on [107] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated December 31, 2020 re: Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/5/2021) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to Ghislaine Maxwell: Motions due by 1/25/2021. Responses due by 2/26/2021. Replies due by 3/5/2021. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: 12/31/2020, Terminated: 1/5/2021 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated December 31, 2020 re: Extension of Time . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated December 30, 2020 re: Joint Letter re December 28, 2020 Opinion and Order Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. On December 8, 2020, Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell filed a renewed motion for releaseon bail. Dkt No. 97. In an Opinion and Order concurrently filed under temporary seal, the Court DENIES the Defendant's motion. In light of the fact that the Opinion includes potentially confidential information that should not be filed on the public docket, the Court will permit the parties 48 hours to propose any redactions to the Courts Opinion and Order and to justify those redactions by reference tothe Second Circuits decision in Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110(2d Cir. 2006). After determining which, if any, portions of the Opinion and Order should be redacted, the Court will file the Opinion and Order on the public docket. As a result, the Court concludes that the Government has met its burden of persuasion that the Defendant poses a flight risk and that pretrial detention continues to be warranted. On or before December 30, 2020, the parties are ORDERED to submit a joint letter indicating whether they propose any redactions and the justification for any such proposal. This resolves Dkt No. 97. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/28/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re: Renewed Motion for Bail. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated December 18, 2020 re: Cover Letter for Reply Memorandum for Renewed Bail Application (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On December 18, 2020, the Defendant filed her reply to the Government's opposition to her renewed application for bail. In accordance with this Court's December 7, 2020 Order, see Dkt. No. 89, she filed these materials under seal and proposed narrowly tailored redactions on those materials. The Government did not file any opposition to the Defendant's proposed redactions. The Court will adopt the Defendant's proposed redactions after applying the three-part test articulated by the Second Circuit in Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). Under this test, the Court must: (i) determine whether the documents in question are "judicial documents;" (ii) assess the weight of the common law presumption of access to the materials; and (iii) balance competing considerations against the presumption of access. Id. at 11920. "Such countervailing factors include but are not limited to 'the danger of impairing law enforcement or judicial efficiency' and 'the privacy interests of those resisting disclosure.'" Id. at 120 (quoting United States v. Amodeo ("Amodeo II"), 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995)). The proposed redactions satisfy this test. The Court finds that the Defendant's submissions are "relevant to the performance of the judicial function and useful in the judicial process," thereby qualifying as a "judicial document" for purposes of the first element of the Lugosch test. United States v. Amodeo ("Amodeo I"), 44 F.3d 141, 145 (2d Cir. 1995). And the Court also finds that the common law presumption of access attaches. Id. at 146; see also Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 602 (1978). As with the redactions to her renewed motion for bail, the proposed redactions here are narrowly tailored to serve substantial interests, including, most importantly, third parties personal privacy interests. See Under Seal v. Under Seal, 273 F. Supp. 3d 460, 467 (S.D.N.Y. 2017). See also Dkt. No. 95. The Defendant is hereby ORDERED to docket the redacted documents and corresponding exhibits by no later than December 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/23/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell Renewed Bail Motion. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On December 16, 2020, the Government filed its opposition to Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell's renewed application for bail. In accordance with this Court's December 7, 2020 Order, see Dkt. No. 89, the Government filed its materials under seal and proposed narrowly tailored redactions on those materials. The Defendant did not file any opposition to the Government's proposed redactions. The Court will adopt the Government's proposed redactions after applying the three-part test articulated by the Second Circuit in Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). Under this test, the Court must: (i) determine whether the documents in question are "judicial documents;" (ii) assess the weight of the common law presumption access to the materials; and (iii) balance competing considerations against the presumption of access. Id. at 11920. "Such countervailing factors include but are not limited to 'the danger of impairing law enforcement or judicial efficiency' and 'the privacy interests of those resisting disclosure.'" Id. at 120 (quoting United States v. Amodeo ("Amodeo II"), 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995)). The proposed redactions satisfy this test. The Court finds that the Governments submissions are "relevant to the performance of the judicial function and useful in the judicial process," thereby qualifying as a "judicial document" for purposes of the first element of the Lugosch test. United States v. Amodeo ("Amodeo I"), 44 F.3d 141, 145 (2d Cir. 1995). And the Court also finds that the common law presumption of access attaches. Id. at 146; see also Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 602 (1978). Nevertheless, the proposed redactions are narrowly tailored to serve substantial interests, including, most importantly, third parties' personal privacy interests. See Under Seal v. Under Seal, 273 F. Supp. 3d 460 467 (S.D.N.Y.2017). The Government is hereby ORDERED to docket the redacted documents and corresponding exhibits by no later than December 18, 2 (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/18/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 98 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrew Rohrbach appearing for USA. (Rohrbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 97 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Ghislaine Maxwell re: Renewed Motion for Bail. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W, # (24) Exhibit X)(Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 96 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated December 8, 2020 re: Cover Letter for Renewed Bail Application (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 95 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On December 8, 2020, Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell filed her renewed application for bail under seal with proposed redactions, in accordance with this Court's December 7, 2020 Order, see Dkt. No. 89. The Government did not file any opposition to the Defendant's proposed redactions. After due consideration, the Court will adopt the Defendant's proposed redactions. The Court's decision to adopt those redactions is guided by the three-part test articulated by the Second Circuit in Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). Under this test, the Court must: (i) determine whether the documents in question are "judicial documents;" (ii) assess the weight of the common law presumption of access to the materials; and (iii) balance competing considerations against the presumption of access. Id. at 11920. "Such countervailing factors include but are not limited to the danger of impairing law enforcement or judicial efficiency' and 'the privacy interests of those resisting disclosure.'" Id. at 120 (quoting United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1048 (2d Cir.1995) ("Amodeo II")). The proposed redactions satisfy this test. The Court finds that Defendant's letter motions are "relevant to the performance of the judicial function and useful in the judicial process,' thereby qualifying as a "judicial document" for purposes of the first element of the Lugosch test. United States v. Amodeo ("Amodeo I"), 44 F.3d 141, 145 (2d Cir. 1995). And the Court also finds that the common law presumption of access attaches. Id. at 146; see also Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 602 (1978). Nevertheless, in balancing competing considerations against the presumption of access, the Court finds that the redactions are narrowly tailored to properly guard the privacy interests of the individuals referenced in the Defendant's submission and in the corresponding exhibits The Defendant is hereby ORDERED to docket the redacted documents and corresponding exhibits. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/14/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 94 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ghislaine Maxwell. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/14/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: Conference held on 7/14/2020 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2021. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On December 4, 2020, the Court received a letter from MDC legal counsel responding to the concerns that the Defendant raised in her November 24, 2020 letter. See Dkt. Nos. 75, 88; see also Dkt. No. 78. The Defendant responded to the MDC legal counsel's letter on December 7, 2020, reiterating her request that the Court summon Warden Heriberto Tellez to personally respond to questions from the Court regarding the Defendant's conditions of confinement. See Dkt. No. 91. Having carefully reviewed the parties' submissions, along with the MDC legal counsel's December 4, 2020 letter, the Court DENIES the Defendant's request to summon the Warden to personally appear and respond to questions. This resolves Dkt. No. 75. Notwithstanding this, as originally provided in Dkt. No. 49, the Government shall continue to submit written status updates detailing any material changes to the conditions of Ms. Maxwell's confinement, with particular emphasis on her access to legal materials, including legal mail and email, and her ability to communicate with defense counsel. The updates shall also include information on the frequency of searches of the Defendant. The Court hereby ORDERS the Government to submit these written updates every 60 days. Furthermore, the Government shall take all necessary steps to ensure that the Defendant continues to receive adequate access to her legal materials and her ability to communicate with defense counsel. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/8/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bobbi C. Sternheim dated 12/07/2020 re: Response to MDC Report to Court re: conditions (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Mark S. Cohen and Christian R. Everdell dated 11/25/20 re: On behalf of my client, Ghislaine Maxwell, we plan to file a Renewed Motion for Release on Bail (the "Motion") and respectfully request an in camera conference, with all counsel present, to address the appropriate procedures for the filing and consideration of the Motion. For the reasons explained below, we intend to request, pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.l(d), that the Court permit the filing of portions of the Motion and certain supporting materials under seal and require that any responsive materials be filed under seal....ENDORSEMENT: The Court sees no basis for the sealing of this letter. On or before December 2, 2020, Defendant shall justify why this letter should be sealed (or redacted). Alternatively, the Defendant may file the letter on the public docket by that date. The Court will take no action on the request pending resolution of the initial sealing question. The Defendant's letter and this memorandum endorsement will be temporarily sealed pending resolution of the sealing request. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/25/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [85] Letter filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. The Court is in receipt of the Defendant's December 4, 2020 letter, Dkt. No. 85, and hereby sets the following schedule: The Defendants submission is due December 8, 2020; The Government's response is due December 16, 2020; The Defendant's reply is due December 18, 2020. After reviewing these submissions, the Court will determine whether a hearing on the renewed bail motion is necessary. The Court grants the Defendants request that the Government shall file its submission under seal with proposed redactions. Any objections to proposed redactions are due within 24 hours after any brief has been filed. Finally, the Defendant is granted leave to file a motion not to exceed 40 pages. The Governments response shall also be limited to 40 pages. The Defendant's reply shall not exceed 10 pages ( Defendant submission due by 12/8/2020., Defendant Replies due by 12/18/2020., Government Responses due by 12/16/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/7/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sophia Papapetru and John Wallace dated 12/4/20 re: This letter is written in response to your order dated December 2, 2020, concerning Ghislaine Maxwell, Reg. 02879-509., an inmate currently confined at the Metropolitan Detention center in Brooklyn, New York. You expressed various concerns regarding Ms. Maxwells confinement and well-being. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated 11/30/2020 re: Sealing (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 86 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated 11/25/2020 re: Sealing (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated December 4, 2020 re: Briefing Schedule (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 83 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 82 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 81 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. On November 25, 2020, counsel for Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell filed a letter request seeking an in camera conference for the presentation of a renewed motion for release on bail and a request to seal the November 25, 2020 letter in its entirety. The Court required justification for the sealing request. On November 30, 2020, the defense counsel filed a second letter no longer fully pressing the unsupported request to file the letter entirely under seal and instead proposing redactions to both the November 25th and November 30th letters. The Government has indicated that it does not oppose the redactions. Dkt. No. 80. After due consideration, the Court will adopt the Defendant's proposed redactions, which are consented to by the Government. The Court's decision is guided by the three-part test articulated by the Second Circuit in Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). Under this test, the Court must: (i) determine whether the documents in question are "judicial documents;" (ii) assess the weight of the common law presumption of access to the materials; and (iii) balance competing considerations against the presumption of access. Id. at 11920. "Such countervailing factors include but are not limited to 'the danger of impairing law enforcement or judicial efficiency' and 'the privacy interests of those resisting disclosure.'" Id. at 120 (quoting United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995) ("Amodeo II")). The proposed redactions satisfy this test. First, the Court finds that the Defendant's letter motions are "relevant to the performance of the judicial function and useful in the judicial process," thereby qualifying as a "judicial document" for purposes of the first element of the Lugosch test. United States v. Amodeo ("Amodeo I"), 44 F.3d 141, 145 (2d Cir. 1995). And while the Court assumes that the common law presumption of access attaches, in balancing competing considerations against the presumption of access, the Court finds that the arguments the Defendant has put forthincluding, most notably, the privacy interests of the individuals referenced in the lettersfavor her proposed and tailored redactions. The Defendant is hereby ORDERED to docket the redacted versions of the two letters by December 4, 2020. For the reasons outlined in the Government's letter dated December 2, 2020, Dkt. No. 80, the Court DENIES the Defendant's request for an in camera conference. In order to protect the privacy interests referenced in the Defendant's November 25, 2020 letter, the Court will permit the Defendant to make her submission in writing and to propose narrowly tailored redactions. The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer and to jointly prepare a briefing schedule for the Defendant's forthcoming renewed motion for release on bail. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/3/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated December 2, 2020 re: Defense Requests for Sealing Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 79 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on re: [78] LETTER by USA addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated December 1, 2020 re: Joint Letter regarding Conditions of Confinement. ENDORSEMENT: MDC legal counsel shall submit their letter to the Court by December 4, 2020. Upon review of that letter, the Court will determine whether any additional information is required, either orally or in writing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/2/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated December 1, 2020 re: Joint Letter regarding Conditions of Confinement Document filed by USA. (Pomerantz, Lara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. On November 25, 2020, the Defendant filed a letter request under seal. On November 30, 2020, she filed a second letter request in which she proposed redactions on both letters. The Government is hereby ORDERED to respond to the Defendant's November 25, 2020 letter request and to the request for proposed redactions by no later than December 2, 2020. The letters shall be temporarily sealed while the Court resolves the redaction request. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/1/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on re: [75] LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bobbi C. Sternheim dated 11/24/2020 re: Response to 90-day MDC conditions report. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer regarding Defendant's request that Warden Heriberto Tellez directly address Defendant's concerns regarding the conditions of her detention. The parties shall jointly submit a status update within one week of this Order. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/24/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bobbi C. Sternheim dated 11/24/2020 re: Response to 90-day MDC conditions report (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated November 23, 2020 re: Update Regarding Conditions of Confinement Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on re: [60] Letter filed by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: The Government respectfully requests that the Court approve the Government's request to delay disclosure of these Materials...ENDORSEMENT...There is no dispute that the materials referenced in the Government's letter will be turned over to the defense. The Government has indicated that it will do so. The only dispute, then, relates to the timing of such disclosure. See Dkt. Nos. 64, 65. Because the Government has articulated plausible reasons for some delay of disclosure, see Dkt. No. 65 at 4, the Court grants the Government's request to delay disclosure. However, the Governments proposal to delay disclosure until 8 weeks in advance of trial is insufficient. In order to ensure that the defense can adequately prepare for trial, the Government shall produce the referenced materials, which are not voluminous, to the defense by March 12, 2021. Disclosure of the materials will of course be subject to the protective order entered by the Court, see Dkt. No. 36. (Government Responses due by 3/12/2021) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/18/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on [69] LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated November 6, 2020 re: Request to Extend Discovery Deadline for Portion of Electronic Discovery. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby extends the deadline for the Government's production of electronic discovery from November 9, 2020 to November 23, 2020. The Court also grants the parties' request for an extension of the motions deadlines as follows: the Defendant's motions are due by January 11, 2021, the Government's responses are due by February 12, 2021, and any replies are due by February 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 11/23/2020. Motions due by 1/11/2021. Responses due by 2/12/2021. Replies due by 2/19/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/9/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [55] Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 20-3061-cr. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the motion to consolidate is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/09/2020. (nd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Maurene Comey by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated November 6, 2020 re: Request to Extend Discovery Deadline for Portion of Electronic Discovery Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/5/2020) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated October 30, 2020 re: Reply to Defense's October 23, 2020 Letter Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jeffrey S. Pagliuca dated October 23, 2020 re: Response to the Governments October 7, 2020 letter (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated October 20, 2020 re: Reply Letter in Further Support of Request to Delay Disclosure Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated October 14, 2020 re: Response to [60] LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from USA dated October 6, 2020 re: Request to Delay Disclosure. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated October 7, 2020 re: Review of Investigative Files from Other Offices and Agencies Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on re: [60] Accordingly, the Government respectfully requests that the Court approve the Government's request to delay disclosure of these Materials...ENDORSEMENT...The Defendant shall file any opposition to the Government's request by October 14, 2020. The Government's reply, if any, is due by October 20, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Government Replies due by 10/20/2020., Defendant Responses due by 10/14/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/7/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Maurene Comey by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Lara Pomerantz dated October 6, 2020 re: Request to Delay Disclosure Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bobbi C Sternheim appearing for Ghislaine Maxwell. Appearance Type: Retained. (Sternheim, Bobbi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [55] Notice of Appeal were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to Ghislaine Maxwell to US Court of Appeals re: [55] Notice of Appeal. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated 8/24/2020 re: Reply in Support of Request to Modify Protective Order. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan dated 8/24/2020 re: Proposed Redactions to Request to Modify Protective Order. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ghislaine Maxwell from [51] Memorandum & Opinion. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401266036. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan, from Jeffrey S. Pagliuca dated 8/17/2020 re: Defense counsel writes with redacted request to modify protective order. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUMOPINION AND ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On August 17, 2020, Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell filed a sealed letter motion seeking an Order modifying the protective order in this case. Specifically, she sought a Court order allowing her to file under seal in certain civil cases ("Civil Cases") materials ("Documents") that she received in discovery from the Government in this case. She also sought permission to reference, but not file, other discovery material that the Government produced in this case. For the reasons that follow, Defendant's requests are DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/2/2020)(See MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as set forth) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Laura A. Menninger dated August 24, 2020 re: Request to File Under Seal: Proposed Redactions to Request to Modify Protective Order and Reply in Support Thereof . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Menninger, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Maurene Comey dated August 21, 2020 re: Proposed redactions to letter briefing, in response to the Court's Order of August 18, 2020 Document filed by USA. (Rossmiller, Alex)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Maurene Comey dated August 21, 2020 re: [43] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jeffrey S. Pagliuca dated August 17, 2020 re: Request for Permission to Submit Letter Motion in Excess of Three Pages .. (Rossmiller, Alex)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: 8/27/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: 8/20/2020 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Lara Elizabeth Pomerantz appearing for USA. (Pomerantz, Lara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: On August 17, 2020, the Defendant filed a letter motion seeking a modification of this Court's Protective Order, which the Court entered on July 30, 2020. Defendant also moves to file that letter motion under seal. The Governments opposition to Defendant's letter motion is hereby due Friday, August 21 at 12 p.m. The Defendant's reply is due on Monday, August 24 at 12 p.m. The parties shall propose redactions to the letter briefing on this issue. Alternatively, the parties shall provide support and argument for why the letter motions should be sealed in their entirety. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 8/21/2020. Replies due by 8/24/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/18/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jeffrey S. Pagliuca dated August 17, 2020 re: Request for Permission to Submit Letter Motion in Excess of Three Pages . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated August 17, 2020 re [38] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated August 10, 2020 re: Discovery Disclosure and Access .. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alex Rossmiller dated August 13, 2020 re: [38] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated August 10, 2020 re: Discovery Disclosure and Access .. (Rossmiller, Alex)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on re: [38] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated August 10, 2020 re: Discovery Disclosure and Access. ENDORSEMENT: The Government is hereby ORDERED to respond to the Defendant's letter motion by Thursday, August 13, 2020. The Defendant's reply, if any, is due on or before Monday, August 17, 2020. (Responses due by 8/13/2020. Replies due by 8/17/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/11/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Christian R. Everdell by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020, Terminated: 8/25/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated August 10, 2020 re: Discovery Disclosure and Access . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. Both parties have asked for the Court to enter a protective order. While they agree on most of the language, two areas of dispute have emerged. First, Ms. Maxwell seeks language allowing her to publicly reference alleged victims or witnesses who have spoken on the public record to the media or in public fora, or in litigation relating to Ms. Maxwell or Jeffrey Epstein. Second, Ms. Maxwell seeks language restricting potential Government witnesses and their counsel from using discovery materials for any purpose other than preparing for the criminal trial in this action. The Government has proposed contrary language on both of these issues. For the following reasons, the Court adopts the Government's proposed protective order Under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d)(1), "[a]t any time the court may, for good cause, deny, restrict, or defer discovery or inspection, or grant other appropriate relief." The good cause standard "requires courts to balance several interests, including whether dissemination of the discovery materials inflicts hazard to others... whether the imposition of the protective order would prejudice the defendant," and "the public's interest in the information." United States v. Smith, 985 F. Supp. 2d 506, 522 (S.D.N.Y. 2013). The party seeking to restrict disclosure bears the burden of showing good cause. Cf. Gambale v. Deutsche Bank AG, 377 F.3d 133, 142 (2d Cir. 2004). First, the Court finds that the Government has met its burden of showing good cause with regard to restricting the ability of Ms. Maxwell to publicly reference alleged victims and witnesses other than those who have publicly identified themselves in this litigation. As a general matter, it is undisputed that there is a strong and specific interest in protecting the privacy of alleged victims and witnesses in this case that supports restricting the disclosure of their identities. Dkt. No. 29 at 3 (acknowledging that as a baseline the protective order should "prohibit[] Ms. Maxwell, defense counsel, and others on the defense team from disclosing or disseminating the identity of any alleged victim or potential witness referenced in the discovery materials"); see also United States v. Corley, No. 13-cr-48, 2016 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 194426, at *11 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 15, 2016). The Defense argues this interest is significantly diminished for individuals who have spoken on the public record about Ms. Maxwell or Jeffrey Epstein, because they have voluntarily chosen to identify themselves. But not all accusations or public statements are equal. Deciding to participate in or contribute to a criminal investigation or prosecution is a far different matter than simply making a public statement "relating to" Ms. Maxwell or Jeffrey Epstein, particularly since such a statement might have occurred decades ago and have no relevance to the charges in this case. These individuals still maintain a significant privacy interest that must be safeguarded. The exception the Defense seeks is too broad and risks undermining the protections of the privacy of witnesses and alleged victims that is required by law. In contrast, the Government's proffered language would allow Ms. Maxwell to publicly reference individuals who have spoken by name on the record in this case. It also allows the Defense to "referenc[e] the identities of individuals they believe may be relevant... to Potential Defense Witnesses and their counsel during the course of the investigation and preparation of the defense case at trial." Dkt. No. 33-1, 5. This proposal adequately balances the interests at stake. And as the Government's letter notes, see Dkt. No. 33 at 4, to the extent that the Defense needs an exception to the protective order for a specific investigative purpose, they can make applications to the Court on a case-by-case basis. Second, restrictions on the ability of potential witnesses and their counsel to use discovery materials for purposes other than preparing for trial in this case are unwarranted. The request appears unprecedented despite the fact that there have been many high-profile criminal matters that had related civil litigation. The Government labors under many restrictions including Rule 6(e) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the Privacy Act of 1974, and other policies of the Department of Justice and the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York, all of which the Court expects the Government to scrupulously follow. Furthermore, the Government indicates that it will likely only provide potential witnesses with materials that those witnesses already have in their possession. See Dkt. No. 33 at 6. And of course, those witnesses who do testify at trial would be subject to examination on the record as to what materials were provided or shown to them by the Government. Nothing in the Defense's papers explains how its unprecedented proposed restriction is somehow necessary to ensure a fair trial. For the foregoing reasons, the Court adopts the Government's proposed protective order, which will be entered on the docket. This resolves Dkt. No. 29. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/30/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/30/2020)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: 7/29/2020 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated July 29, 2020 re [29] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated July 27, 2020 re: Proposed Protective Order .. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Alex Rossmiller by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell. (Rossmiller, Alex)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alex Rossmiller dated July 28, 2020 re: [29] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated July 27, 2020 re: Proposed Protective Order .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (proposed protective order))(Rossmiller, Alex)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on [31] LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alison Moe dated July 27, 2020 re: requesting until 5 p.m. tomorrow to respond to defense counsel's letter, filed July 27, 2020. ENDORSEMENT: The Government's response to the Defense's letter is due by 5 p.m. on July 28, 2020. The Defense may file a reply by 5 p.m. on July 29, 2020. Before the Government's response is filed, the parties must meet and confer by phone regarding this issue, and any response from the Government must contain an affirmation that the parties have done so. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 7/28/2020. Replies due by 7/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/27/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alison Moe dated July 27, 2020 re: requesting until 5 p.m. tomorrow to respond to defense counsel's letter, filed July 27, 2020 Document filed by USA. (Moe, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Christian R. Everdell by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020, Terminated: 7/30/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Christian R. Everdell dated July 27, 2020 re: Proposed Protective Order . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Proposed Protective Order))(Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: The Defense has moved for an order "prohibiting the Government, its agents and counsel for witnesses from making extrajudicial statements concerning this case." Dkt. No. 27 at 1. The Court firmly expects that counsel for all involved parties will exercise great care to ensure compliance with this Court's local rules, including Local Criminal Rule 23.1, and the rules of professional responsibility. In light of this clear expectation, the Court does not believe that further action is needed at this time to protect the Defendant's right to a fair trial by an impartial jury. Accordingly, it denies the Defendant's motion without prejudice. But the Court warns counsel and agents for the parties and counsel for potential witnesses that going forward it will not hesitate to take appropriate action in the face of violations of any relevant rules. The Court will ensure strict compliance with those rules and will ensure that the Defendant's right to a fair trial will be safeguarded. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/23/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020, Terminated: 7/23/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jeffrey S. Pagliuca dated July 21, 2020 re: Local Criminal Rule 23.1 . Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell: The Court has received a significant number of letters and messages from non-parties that purport to be related to this case. These submissions are either procedurally improper or irrelevant to the judicial function. Therefore, they will not be considered or docketed. The Court will accord the same treatment to any similar correspondence it receives in the future. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/21/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. Initial non-electronic discovery, generally to include search warrant applications and subpoena returns, is due by Friday, August 21, 2020. Completion of discovery, to include electronic materials, is due by Monday, November 9, 2020. Motions are due by Monday, December 21, 2020. Motion responses are due by Friday, January 22, 2021. Motion replies are due by Friday, February 5, 2021. Trial is set for Monday, July 12, 2021 ( Discovery due by 8/21/2020., Motions due by 12/21/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/15/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Waiver of Right to be Present at Criminal Proceeding as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: Arraignment, Bail Hearing, Conference. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. For the reasons stated on the record at today's proceeding, the Governments motion to detain the Defendant pending trial is hereby GRANTED (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/14/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Plea entered by Ghislaine Maxwell (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s,5s-6s Not Guilty. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Plea entered by Ghislaine Maxwell (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s,5s-6s Not Guilty. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan:Arraignment as to Ghislaine Maxwell (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s,5s-6s held on 7/14/2020. Defendant Ghislaine Maxwell present by video conference with attorney Mark Cohen present by video conference, AUSA Alison Moe, Alex Rossmiller and Maurene Comey for the government present by video conference, Pretrial Service Officer Lea Harmon present by telephone and Court Reporter Kristine Caraannante. Defendant enters a plea of Not Guilty to the S1 indictment. Trial set for July 12, 2021. See Order. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act from today until July 12, 2021. Bail is denied. Defendant is remanded. See Transcript. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell re: [4] MOTION to detain defendant . . (Moe, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [15] Motion for Jeffrey Pagliuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ghislaine Maxwell (1). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/13/2020) (kwi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christian R. Everdell appearing for Ghislaine Maxwell. Appearance Type: Retained. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Stewart Cohen appearing for Ghislaine Maxwell. Appearance Type: Retained. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Ghislaine Maxwell re [4] MOTION to detain defendant .. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [15] MOTION for Jeffrey S. Pagliuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20605229. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Ghislaine Maxwell (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s-6s. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020, Terminated: 7/13/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Jeffrey S. Pagliuca to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20605229. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ghislaine Maxwell. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey S. Pagliuca, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pagliuca, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Laura A. Menninger appearing for Ghislaine Maxwell. Appearance Type: Retained. (Menninger, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christian R. Everdell appearing for Ghislaine Maxwell. Appearance Type: Retained. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Stewart Cohen appearing for Ghislaine Maxwell. Appearance Type: Retained. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ghislaine Maxwell on [9] LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alex Rossmiller dated July 7, 2020 re: scheduling. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule. The Defense response is due by 1:00 p.m. on July 10, 2020. The Government reply is due by 1:00 p.m. on July 13, 2020. Additionally, defense counsel is ordered to file notices of appearance on the docket by the end of the day today. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 7/10/2020. Replies due by 7/13/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/8/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alex Rossmiller dated July 7, 2020 re: scheduling Document filed by USA. (Rossmiller, Alex)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Mark S. Cohen dated July 6, 2020 re: Scheduling (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ghislaine Maxwell. This matter has been assigned to me for all purposes. In its July 5, 2020 letter, the Government on behalf of the parties requested that the Court schedule an arraignment, initial appearance, and bail hearing in this matter in the afternoon of Friday, July 10. See Dkt. No. 5. In light of the COVID public health crisis, there are significant safety issues related to in-court proceedings. If the Defendant is willing to waive her physical presence, this proceeding will be conducted remotely. To that end, defense counsel should confer with the Defendant regarding waiving her physical presence. If the Defendant wishes to waive her physical presence for this proceeding, she and her counsel should sign the attached form in advance of the proceeding if feasible.If this proceeding is to be conducted remotely, there are protocols at the Metropolitan Detention Center that limit the times at which the Defendant could be produced so that she could appear by video. In the next week, the Defendant could be produced by video at either 9:00 a.m. on July 9, 2020 or sometime during the morning of July 14, 2020. Counsel are hereby ordered to meet and confer regarding scheduling for this initial proceeding in light of these constraints. If counsel does anticipate proceeding remotely, by 9:00 p.m. tonight, counsel should file a joint letter proposing a date and time for the proceeding consistent with this scheduling information, as well as a revised briefing schedule for the Defendant's bail application.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/6/2020)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Ghislaine Maxwell from the United States District Court - District of New Hampshire. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/5/2020, Entered: 7/5/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSAs Maurene Comey, Alison Moe, and Alex Rossmiller dated July 5, 2020 re: Request to Schedule Initial Appearance Document filed by USA. (Comey, Maurene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to detain defendant . Document filed by USA as to Ghislaine Maxwell. (Moe, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/2/20)(jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest of Ghislaine Maxwell in the United States District Court - District of New Hampshire. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Ghislaine Maxwell. Attorney Alex Rossmiller,Maurene Ryan Comey,Alison Gainfort Moe for USA added. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case as to Ghislaine Maxwell ASSIGNED to Judge Alison J. Nathan. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to Ghislaine Maxwell. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Ghislaine Maxwell. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-6. (jm) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/2/2020) (jm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 587 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?