District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 20-17285
    Filed 11/20/2020
  2. Case No. 21-15813
    Filed 5/4/2021
  3. Case No. 21-15822
    Filed 5/6/2021
United States Supreme Court

CoreCivic Inc v. Candide Group LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-03792-WHA
District Judge William Alsup, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 2, 2021 at 6:30 PM DT (3.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

CoreCivic, Inc. CoreCivic, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon B. Timmann +1 202 899 3872 shannon@clarelocke.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Megan A. Meier (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Marie Locke +1 202 628 7402 libby@clarelocke.com
Space Megan A. Meier megan@clarelocke.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Newmeyer & Dillon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brandon McClellan +1 949 854 7000 +1 949 854 7099 michael.mcclellan@ndlf.com
Space Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht +1 949 854 7000 +1 949 854 7099 kendie.schlecht@ndlf.com
v.
No Logo Candide Group LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burke +1 415 276 6500 +1 415 276 6599 thomasburke@dwt.com
Space Abigail Bain Everdell +1 212 603 6468 abigaileverdell@dwt.com
No Logo Morgan Simon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burke +1 415 276 6500 +1 415 276 6599 thomasburke@dwt.com
Space Abigail Bain Everdell +1 212 603 6468 abigaileverdell@dwt.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 7/7/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 11/19/2020
Origin 5
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Cases 2:20-cv-02128[California Central], USCA#:20-17285[]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,APPEAL,CLOSED,PROTO
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number 21-15822 for 89 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by CoreCivic Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 USCA Case Number
          USCA Case Number 21-15813 for 88 Notice of Appeal filed by Morgan Simon, Candide Group LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by CoreCivic Inc. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 85 (Appeal fee of $505; receipt number 0971-15928995 paid) (McClellan, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 85 - (Appeal Fee of $505.00, receipt number 0971-15919598 paid) (Burke, Thomas) (USCA Case No. 21-15813)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 stipulation
                STIPULATION re [85] Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL. By Judge Alsup.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS FEES BUT HOLDING IN ABEYANCE FINAL CALCULATION. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                      Transcript of Telephonic Proceedings held on 3/24/2021 before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ana Dub, RDR, RMR, CRR, CSR No. 7445, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [80] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2021. (Related documents(s) [80]) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                        REPLY in Support (re [79] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [79] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byCoreCivic Inc. (McClellan, Michael) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/2021 before Judge William Alsup by Candide Group LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/2021 before Judge William Alsup by CoreCivic Inc, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Meier, Megan) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021, Terminated: 4/7/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibits B-K (Redacted), # (4) Exhibits B-K (Filed Under Seal), # (5) Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 78 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Motion Hearing
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER TO PROVIDE BILLING INVOICES. By Judge Alsup on 3/23/21. (whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 76 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 75 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: 2/10/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: 2/9/2021 statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 appendix
                                                Appendix re [70] Opposition/Response to Motion, in Support of Opposition to Motion for Attorneys Fees & Costs filed byCoreCivic Inc. (Related document(s)[70]) (McClellan, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020, Terminated: 4/6/2021 Motion for attorney fees
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Order on Stipulation
                                                      Order Granting Extension for Fees Motion Deadline. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                        Transcript of Telephonic Proceedings held on 11/19/2020, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [62] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2021. (Related documents(s) [62]) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020, Terminated: 12/14/2020 stipulation
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 USCA Case Number
                                                              USCA Case Number 20-17285 for [63] Notice of Appeal filed by CoreCivic Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by CoreCivic Inc. Appeal of Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, [46], Judgment[61], Order on Motion to Strike[60] (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-15222381 paid.) (McClellan, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2020) USCA No. 20-17285 Modified on 11/23/2020 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Judge William Alsup by CoreCivic Inc, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Meier, Megan) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                    JUDGMENT in favor of defendants CANDIDE GROUP, LLC, and MORGAN SIMON, and against plaintiff CORECIVIC, INC. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/19/2020. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting [41] Motion to Strike]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2020 by AT&T Conference line re [41] Special MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court heard oral arguments and took the motion under submission. Initial Case Management Conference not held. Total Time in Court: 1 hour 20 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Chanmaly Schlect / Libby Locke / Megan Meier / Shannon Timmann. Defendant Attorney: Thomas Burke / Abigail Everdell. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2020)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER APPROVING [54] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference. The Motion Hearing as to [41] Special MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint and Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 are continued to 11/19/2020 at 8:00 AM before Judge William Alsup.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) [41]) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The Motion Hearing as to [41] Special MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint set for 10/22/2020 is continued to 10/29/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 is also continued to 10/29/2020 at 08:00 AM. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) [41]) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020, Terminated: 11/19/2020 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge by CoreCivic Inc filed by CoreCivic Inc. (Meier, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020, Terminated: 11/10/2020 stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by CoreCivic Inc. (Meier, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CoreCivic Inc. (Meier, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McClellan, Michael) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                        REPLY in Support (re [41] Special MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Reply in Support of Its Request for Judicial Notice, # (2) Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [41] Special MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byCoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Request for Judicial Notice)(Schlecht, Chanmaly) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: 9/1/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Bain Everdell (Everdell, Abigail) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting [47] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Abigail B. Everdell. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020, Terminated: 8/24/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14781935.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/06/2020 filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING [43] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONFIRM DENIAL OF SUBSTANTIVE MOTION AND FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY BUT EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINES. By Judge Alsup. Response now due by 9/10/2020, reply by 9/24/2020. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                    REPLY in Support (re [43] First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Confirm Denial of Defendants' Untimely Special Motion to Strike and in the alternative Conduct Limited Discovery in Response to Special Motion to Strike & Enlarge Time to Oppose Special Motion to Strike re [41] Spec) filed by CoreCivic Inc. (McClellan, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [43] First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Confirm Denial of Defendants' Untimely Special Motion to Strike and in the alternative Conduct Limited Discovery in Response to Special Motion to Strike & Enlarge Time to Oppose Special Motion to Strike re [41] Spec ) filed byCandide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, # (2) Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020, Terminated: 8/17/2020 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                        First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Confirm Denial of Defendants' Untimely Special Motion to Strike and in the alternative Conduct Limited Discovery in Response to Special Motion to Strike & Enlarge Time to Oppose Special Motion to Strike re [41] Special MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CoreCivic Inc. Responses due by 8/17/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion, # (2) Proposed Order re Administrative Motion)(McClellan, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 is continued to 10/22/2020 at 8:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020, Terminated: 11/19/2020 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Special MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 8/20/2020. Replies due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Request for Judicial Notice)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/7/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING [36] STIPULATION FOR SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Order by Judge William Alsup denying [38] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Abigail B. Everdell. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020, Terminated: 8/6/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Abigail B. Everdell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14781935.) filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                    Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon identifying Other Affiliate Aner Ben-Ami for Candide Group LLC. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: 7/24/2020, Terminated: 8/6/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER L.R. 6-1: and Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Deadline for Defendants' Special Motion to Strike and Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CoreCivic Inc (Timmann, Shannon) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CoreCivic Inc.. (Locke, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting [28] Motion for Pro Hac Vice Megan L. Meier.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting [27] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M. Locke.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting [26] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Shannon Timmann.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020, Terminated: 7/9/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14667002.) filed by CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Meier, Megan) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020, Terminated: 7/9/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14666863.) filed by CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Locke, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020, Terminated: 7/9/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14666784.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/8/20 filed by CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Timmann, Shannon) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S Letter regarding case transferred in from Central District of California. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                              Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 case transferred in - district transfer
                                                                                                                                                Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-02128. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/7/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE OF THIS ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO28 USC1404(a) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case electronically transferred to USDC Northern District, Oakland Division (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Morgan Simon answer now due 7/8/2020; Candide Group LLC answer now due 7/8/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Defendants Morgan Simon; Candide Group LLC.(Burke, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: 6/2/2020 Remark
                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION to Change Venue to USDC, Northern District of California filed by Defendants Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: 6/2/2020 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke on behalf of Defendants Candide Group LLC, Morgan Simon (Attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke added to party Candide Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke added to party Morgan Simon(pty:dft))(Burke, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. upon Candide Group LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Candide Group, LLC. (Schlecht, Chanmaly)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. upon Morgan Simon waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Morgan Simon. (Schlecht, Chanmaly)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shannon B. Timmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. and designating Michael B. McCellan as local counsel[13] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. Meier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. and designating Michael B. McCellan as local counsel[12] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth M. Locke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. and designating Michael B. McCellan as local counsel by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020, Terminated: 3/17/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shannon B. Timmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25682070) filed by plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (McClellan, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020, Terminated: 3/17/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. Meier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25681927) filed by plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (McClellan, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020, Terminated: 3/17/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth M. Locke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25681769) filed by plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (McClellan, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht on behalf of Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc (Attorney Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht added to party CoreCivic Inc (pty:pla))(Schlecht, Chanmaly)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                            21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint )[1] as to defendant Candide Group LLC. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth M Locke. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint [1] as to defendant Morgan Simon. (esa) Modified on 3/5/2020 (esa).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 ADR Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Summons)(McClellan, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc, identifying Plaintiff: CoreCivic, Inc.; Defendants: Morgan Simon and Candide Group, LLC. (McClellan, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. (McClellan, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25614793 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff CoreCivic Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - G) (Attorney Michael B McClellan added to party CoreCivic Inc (pty:pla))(McClellan, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?