FOOD & WATER WATCH v. FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD OF GOVERNORS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-01840-ABJ
District Judge Amy Berman Jackson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 24, 2021 at 3:46 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Food & Water Watch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Scott Carlesco +1 202 683 4925 +1 202 683 2501 acarlesco@fwwatch.org
v.
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant
Officially listed as "BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darrell C. Valdez +1 202 307 2843 darrell.valdez@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/8/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 11001
Terminated 9/21/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,TYPE I-FOIA
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 ///Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Valdez, Darrell)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, by 9/22/2020. (jth)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before September 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/25/2020. (lcabj3)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Answer to Complaint
        ANSWER to Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM.(Valdez, Darrell)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Notice of appearance
          NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Valdez, Darrell)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
            SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(adh, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD OF GOVERNORS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7314358) filed by FOOD & WATER WATCH. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Summons, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons)(Carlesco, Adam)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 84 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?