Anna Marie Piersimoni, et al. v. Ka-leung Chan
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 20STCV19435

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 13, 2020 at 3:14 AM DT (9.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anna Marie Piersimoni As Successor In Interest To Decedent Larry David Brooks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shea Adam
No Logo Books Marc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shea Adam
No Logo Brooks Nina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shea Adam
No Logo Piersimoni Anna Marie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shea Adam
v.
No Logo Chan Ka-leung, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Baratta James M.
Type Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Notice Of Posting Of Jury Fees
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 Answer
      Blank 10 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: 6/1/2020 Proof Of Personal Service
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Certificate of Mailing for
        [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
          Blank 8 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 PI General Order
            Blank 7 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Summons
            on 1st Amended Complaint
              Blank 6 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 First Amended Complaint
                Blank 5 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Summons
                  on Complaint
                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Declaration
                    DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST
                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet
                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Complaint

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 105 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?