La Liberte v. Reid
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 19-3574

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 15, 2020 at 11:03 AM DT (9.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALM Media LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Movant
Officially listed as "Associated Press"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Buzzfeed Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo California News Publishers Association, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Californians Aware, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo First Look Media Works, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Gannett Co., Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Investigative Reporting Workshop, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Mpa - The Association Of Magazine Media, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo National Freedom Of Information Coalition, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo National Press Photographers Association, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo News Leaders Association, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Politico LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Reveal From The Center For Investigative Reporting, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Society Of Professional Journalists, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo The E.W. Scripps Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo The Media Institute, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Univision Communications Inc., Movant
Unknown Role, Perenchio, A. Jerrold

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Vox Media, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 202 795 9301
Space KatieLynn B. Townsend +1 202 795 9300
No Logo Joy Reid, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Louis Libou +1 212 909 9535
Space John Harold Reichman +1 212 909 9527 +1 212 909 9430 reichman@wmllp.com
No Logo Roslyn La Liberte, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole Jennings Wade +1 404 600 1153
Space G. Taylor Wilson +1 404 600 1153 twilson@wgwlawfirm.com
Space L. Lin Wood +1 678 773 7030
Nature of Suit 4320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=18-cv-5398
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=18-cv-5398
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207708975 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2884622] [19-3574]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207708970 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
    CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 07/15/2020, to EDNY, ISSUED.[2884621] [19-3574]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 00207708963 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None ?
        CASE, before ALK, DJ, JAC, HEARD.[2839706] [19-3574]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207527418 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
          NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 04/08/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2816351] [19-3574]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207525748 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None ?
            NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 04/07/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2815718] [19-3574]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207519109 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None ?
              ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2813216] [19-3574]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/14/2020, A Panel, SET.[2804112] [19-3574]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207480325 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                  REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 03/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2798598] [19-3574]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                    CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, [62], on behalf of Movant ALM Media, LLC, FILED.[2792784] [19-3574]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207465012 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief, [61], on behalf of Movant ALM Media, LLC, Associated Press, Buzzfeed, Inc., California News Publishers Association, Californians Aware, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., Investigative Reporting Workshop, MPA - the Association of Magazine Media, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Photographers Association and News Leaders Association, FILED.[2792766] [19-3574]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207464961 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney G. Taylor Wilson, Esq. for Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 03/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2792758] [19-3574]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                          CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/11/2020, PANEL A, PROPOSED.[2788840] [19-3574]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207446556 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jason Louis Libou, Esq. for Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 02/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2785736] [19-3574]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207443978 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                              MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief the panel that will determine the merits of the appeal, [61],[62], FILED. [2784744][72] [19-3574]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207442911 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file the reply brief to 03/11/2020, [67] filed by Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. [2784338][70] [19-3574]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207439742 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 02/20/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2783145] [19-3574]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207439256 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, informing the Court that the contact information for counsel of record has changed, RECEIVED. Service date 02/20/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2782968] [19-3574]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by JB]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      NEW PARTY, Movant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, ALM Media, LLC, Associated Press, Buzzfeed, Inc., California News Publishers Association, Californians Aware, First Look Media Works, Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company, Gannett Co., Inc., Investigative Reporting Workshop, The Media Institute, MPA - the Association of Magazine Media, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Photographers Association, The New York Times Company, News Leaders Association, POLITICO LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Society of Professional Journalists, Univision Communications Inc. and Vox Media, ADDED.[2782608] [19-3574]
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207436523 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, ALM Media, LLC, Associated Press, Buzzfeed, Inc., California News Publishers Association, Californians Aware, First Look Media Works, Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company, Gannett Co., Inc., Investigative Reporting Workshop, The Media Institute, MPA - the Association of Magazine Media, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Photographers Association, The New York Times Company, News Leaders Association, POLITICO LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Society of Professional Journalists, Univision Communications Inc. and Vox Media, FILED. Service date 02/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2781917] [19-3574]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by JB]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207436503 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, ALM Media, LLC, Associated Press, Buzzfeed, Inc., California News Publishers Association, Californians Aware, First Look Media Works, Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company, Gannett Co., Inc., Investigative Reporting Workshop, The Media Institute, MPA - the Association of Magazine Media, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Photographers Association, The New York Times Company, News Leaders Association, POLITICO LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Society of Professional Journalists, Univision Communications Inc. and Vox Media, FILED. Service date 02/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2781911] [19-3574]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by JB]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, ALM Media, LLC, Associated Press, Buzzfeed, Inc., California News Publishers Association, Californians Aware, First Look Media Works, Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company, Gannett Co., Inc., Investigative Reporting Workshop, The Media Institute, MPA - the Association of Magazine Media, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Photographers Association, The New York Times Company, News Leaders Association, POLITICO LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Society of Professional Journalists, Univision Communications Inc. and Vox Media, FILED. Service date02/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2781866] [19-3574]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by JB]
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207436378 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, ALM Media, LLC, Associated Press, Buzzfeed, Inc., California News Publishers Association, Californians Aware, First Look Media Works, Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company, Gannett Co., Inc., Investigative Reporting Workshop, The Media Institute, MPA - the Association of Magazine Media, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Photographers Association, The New York Times Company, News Leaders Association, POLITICO LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Society of Professional Journalists, Univision Communications Inc. and Vox Media, FILED. Service date 02/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2781860] [19-3574]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by JB]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207422965 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 02/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2776760] [19-3574]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207364809 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file the responsive brief to 02/12/2020, [52] filed by Appellee Joy Reid, by RKW, FILED. [2754690][56] [19-3574]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207344626 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 01/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2747073] [19-3574]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      CURED DEFECTIVE, JOINT APPENDIX, [44], on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED.[2738181] [19-3574]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207307144 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-283), on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 12/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2733039] [19-3574]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207306945 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Joint Appendix, [41], on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED.[2732962] [19-3574]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207306801 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 12/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2732913] [19-3574]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-283), on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 12/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2732907] [19-3574]
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [39], on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED.[2708480] [19-3574]
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207242532 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 11/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2708457] [19-3574]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207240746 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [37], on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED.[2707758] [19-3574]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 11/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2707748] [19-3574]
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        ATTORNEY, Jason Louis Libou for Joy Reid, in case 19-3574 , [34], ADDED.[2707601] [19-3574]
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [34], on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED.[2707597] [19-3574]
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207240266 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 11/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2707589] [19-3574]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207240198 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [32], on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED.[2707560] [19-3574]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Joy Reid, FILED. Service date 11/15/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2707472] [19-3574]
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207234786 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 12/18/2019, appellee's brief due date as 01/22/2020,TRANSMITTED.[2705512] [19-3574]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207234716 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2705494] [19-3574]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      CURED DEFECTIVE, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [25], on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED.[2705017] [19-3574]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207233174 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/13/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2704869] [19-3574]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207231885 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [17], on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED.[2704365] [19-3574]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207231704 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2704305] [19-3574]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207231698 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2704303] [19-3574]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2704296] [19-3574]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  CURED DEFECTIVE, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [12], [13], on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED.[2704219] [19-3574]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Nicole Jennings Wade for Roslyn La Liberte, in case 19-3574, [13], ADDED.[2704210] [19-3574]
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, L. Lin Wood for Roslyn La Liberte, in case 19-3574, [12], ADDED.[2704207] [19-3574]
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207231348 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2704187] [19-3574]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207231306 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2704171] [19-3574]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207231273 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED.[2704150] [19-3574]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207231249 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [8], on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED.[2704139] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2703936] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2703900] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207204961 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2694130] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney George T. Wilson, Esq. for Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2693879] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, district court receipt # ANYEDC-11991428, FILED.[2693795] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207204117 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2693794] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207204100 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Roslyn La Liberte, FILED. [2693790] [19-3574]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?