Rashad Evans v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Fresno, Case No. 20CECG01352

Tags
Last Updated July 15, 2020 at 2:29 PM DT (10.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Evans, Rashad, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None
Conditional Settlement Reached: Projected Completion Date: 02/15/2021
    Blank 16 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None
    Order Received for Signature: PENDING HEARING DATE (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Binding Arbitration
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None
      Request for Judicial Notice: In Support of DefendantTesla, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Binding Arbitration
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None
        Declaration Filed: Declaration of Raymond Kim In Support of DefendantTesla, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Binding Arbitration
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None
          Declaration Filed: Declaration of Soheyl Tahsildoost In Support of DefendantTesla, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Binding Arbitration
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None
            Notice of Motion: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee and Motion to: Compel Binding Arbitration Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support
              Blank 11 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None
              Minute Order Attachment
                Blank 10 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None
                Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard
                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None
                  Deposit, payment,disbursment
                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None
                    Case Management Statement Filed
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None
                      Notice of Hearing
                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None
                        Summons and Complaint
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None
                          Proof of Service
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Notice of Hearing: CMC set for 9/29/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None
                              Summons issued and filed
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None
                                Civil case cover sheet
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None
                                  Civil Complaint filed

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?