Rosenblum v. John Does 1-10 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-01161-HZ
District Judge Marco A. Hernandez, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 16, 2020 at 7:38 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ellen F Rosenblum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila H. Potter +1 971 673 1880 +1 971 673 5000 sheila.potter@doj.state.or.us
v.
No Logo FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"
United States Customs & Border Protection United States Customs & Border Protection, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Customs and Border Protection Service"
No Logo United States Marshals Service, Defendant
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal of Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None order on motion for temporary restraining order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Complaint
          Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7002755 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ellen F Rosenblum against FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, John Does 1-10, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, United States Customs and Border Protection Service, United States Marshals Service (Attachments: # (1) Attachment Declaration or Mark Pettibone, # (2) Proposed Summons United States Department of Homeland Security, # (3) Proposed Summons United States Customs and Border Protection, # (4) Proposed Summons United States Marshals Service, # (5) Proposed Summons Federal Protective Service, # (6) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Potter, Sheila)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 214 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?