Copeland v. Tesla Companies, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG20067768

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:32 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Copeland , Deantee, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Hsu, Oliver, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Finkel, Jake D., Attorney
No Logo Ochs, Danielle, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Wrongful Termination
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None ?
Notice of Change of Address Filed (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 29 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None ?
    Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
        Notice of Entry of Order Filed (6 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 26 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
          Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Dropped
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (4 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed (12 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (27 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Declaration ISO Opposition Filed by Deantee Copeland (14 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Proposed Order Received (3 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Opposition Filed (10 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 11/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (98 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Dropped
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Order ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Filed (4 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Hearing Reset to Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 11/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Hearing Restored: Civil Law and Motion 10/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Dropped from dept: 24 date: 10/15/2020 time: 09:00 A
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Deantee Copeland (5 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          First Amendment to Complaint Filed (3 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            First Amended Complaint Filed (19 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Hearing Reset to Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 10/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 10/01/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Substitute True Name for Doe Defendant Filed (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                    Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Initial Case Management Conference 12/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 24 (2 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Deantee Copeland (2 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed (17 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?