Cohen v. Barr et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-05614

Tags
Last Updated January 26, 2021 at 3:41 PM ST (8.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cohen, Michael Dean, Petitioner
Officially listed as "Michael D. Cohen"

Toggle Switch Represented by perryguha.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E. Danya Perry +1 917 543 1866 dperry@perryguha.com
v.
No Logo James Petrucci, Respondent
No Logo Michael Carvajal, Respondent
Barr, William P. Barr, William P., Respondent
Officially listed as "William Barr"
Officer/Director, BELL ATLANTIC CORP
Officer/Director, AOL Time Warner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dominion Resources Inc /va/
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/20/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241fd Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Orange
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag HABEAS
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [4] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Michael D. Cohen..(Perry, E. Danya)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Motion for TRO
                                                                  EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Michael D. Cohen..(Perry, E. Danya)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Barr, re: [1] Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by William Barr..(Perry, E. Danya)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perry, E. Danya)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                        PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00). Document filed by Michael D. Cohen..(Perry, E. Danya)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?