Syed Husain v. Tesla Motors, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20CV368444

Tags
Last Updated September 14, 2021 at 2:21 PM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Husain, Syed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jin Kook Edward Kim
v.
No Logo Tesla Motors Burlingame, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by thetafirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Soheyl Tahsildoost st@thetafirm.com
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
    Blank 18 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
    8-5-21 Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration
      Blank 17 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
      8-5-21 9am dept.19 Opposition to Def's Motion to Compel
        Blank 16 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Notice
        8-5-21 Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration
          Blank 15 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Motion-Compel
          8-5-21 9am dept.19 Motion to compel Binding Arbitration
            Blank 14 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
            8-5-21 Declaration of Raymond Kim ISO Def Tesla's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration
              Blank 13 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support
              8-5-21 Declaration of Soheyl Tahsildoost ISO Def Tesla's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration
                Blank 12 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                8-5-21 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Def Tesla's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                      Case Management Statement
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                          Case Management Statement
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                            Case Management Statement
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                              Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                Proof of Service
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?