Minus v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20068088

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Minus , Clinton, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brown, Fletcher Bernard, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Wrongful Termination
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None ?
Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None ?
    Order and Joint Stipulation to Submit Action to Binding Arbitration Filed (4 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None ?
      Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - To Submit Action to Binding Arbitration (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 9 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Conf Continuance 04/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 22
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Statement of Clinton Minus Filed (5 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Initial Case Management Conference 11/30/2020 02:30 PM D- 22 (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed (9 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Clinton Minus (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 44 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?