Tesla, Inc. v. Pascale, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20CV368472

Tags
Last Updated October 4, 2021 at 11:00 PM DT (2.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Caleb Alm +1 650 681 5000 jalm@tesla.com
Space Sean P. Gates +1 626 508 1717 +1 626 508 1730 sgates@charislex.com
v.
No Logo BERO, SAVAYIA, Defendant
No Logo BRADLEY, CARRINGTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Copeland +1 415 984 8200 +1 415 984 8300 bcopeland@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo PASCALE, TAMI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vendio Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vankatesan, Jaideep +1 650 293 3471
No Logo PASCALE, VINCE, Defendant
No Logo Rivian Automotive, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard G Frenkel +1 408 525 5673 rfrenkel@irell.com
Space Kristine W Hanson +1 213 443 4355 +1 213 443 4310 khanson@kslaw.com
Space Doug E. Lamish +1 650 328 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard G Frenkel +1 408 525 5673 rfrenkel@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristine W Hanson +1 213 443 4355 +1 213 443 4310 khanson@kslaw.com
No Logo Rivian Automotive, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel S. Horn
No Logo SIRON, JESSICA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Martin Penhallegon
No Logo TANNER-DURAN, VINCE, Defendant
No Logo Wong, Kim, Defendant
No Logo YOSTE, JESSIE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca Formanek Furman +1 415 591 1000 rfurman@winston.com
No Logo ZECHMANN, ANDREA, Defendant
No Logo Superior Court of California, Notice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara +1 831 454 2400
Case Type Business Tort/Unfair Bus Prac Unlimited (07)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (160) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 160 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
    Legal Document 159 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
      Legal Document 158 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
        Legal Document 157 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
          Legal Document 156 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
            Legal Document 155 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
            re: 9-28-21 Plt's Motion for leave to file 4th amended complaint - GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
              Legal Document 154 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Notice-Ruling
              Notice of Ruling
                Legal Document 153 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                Proof of Service
                  Legal Document 152 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                  re: reporter Kelly McCarthy for 9-28-21 - GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
                    Legal Document 151 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                    Proof of Service
                      Legal Document 150 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                      Proof of Service
                        Legal Document 149 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                        9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Reply to Def Rivian's Opposition to Plt Tesla's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint
                          Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                          9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Reply to Ind Defs' Opposition to Plt Tesla's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint
                            Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Notice
                            Rivian's Notice of Lodging of Documents Conditionally Under Seal
                              Legal Document 146 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                              Proof of Service
                                Legal Document 145 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                9-28-21 9am dept. 20 (REDACTED) Reply ISO Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                  Blank 144 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                  9-28-21 9am dept. 20 (UNREDACTED) Reply ISO Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                    Legal Document 143 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                    Notice of Telephonic Appearance
                                      Legal Document 142 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                      9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Defs Rivian's Opposition to Plt Tesla's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint
                                        Legal Document 141 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                        9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Individual Defs Opposition to Plt Tesla's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint
                                          Legal Document 140 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                          9-28-21 9am dept. 20 POS re; Individual Defs Opposition to Plt Tesla's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint
                                            Legal Document 139 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Motion: Joinder
                                            9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Def Yoste's Joinder to Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                              Legal Document 138 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Motion-Leave
                                              9-28-21 9am dept.20 Motion for Leave to file 4th Amended Complaint
                                                Legal Document 137 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                9-28-21 9am dept.20 Memo ISO Motion for Leave to file 4th Amended Complaint
                                                  Legal Document 136 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                  9-28-21 9am dept.20 Declaration of A. Gershenson ISO Motion for Leave to file 4th Amended Complaint
                                                    Legal Document 135 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                    9-28-21 9am dept.20 POS re; Motion for Leave to file 4th Amended Complaint
                                                      Legal Document 134 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                      re: 2-27-21 informal discovery mtn to amend complaint and mtn to compel set for 9-28-21 Signed by Judge Manoukian
                                                        Legal Document 133 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                        Proof of Service
                                                          Legal Document 132 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Notice: Association/Co-Counsel
                                                          Associates Cooley LLP as Co Counsel
                                                            Legal Document 131 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Motion: Seal
                                                            TBD BY COURT
                                                              Legal Document 130 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                Legal Document 129 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                  Legal Document 128 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                    Legal Document 127 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                      Legal Document 126 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                        Legal Document 125 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                          Legal Document 124 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                          of Sean P. Gates in response to def's request for IDC
                                                                            Legal Document 123 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                                            Notice re: telephonic appearance
                                                                              Legal Document 122 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Motion: Joinder
                                                                              9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Def Carrington Bradley's Joinder to Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                Legal Document 121 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                  Legal Document 120 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                    Legal Document 119 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                    re: Joinder to Motion to Compel - $60.00 filing fee required
                                                                                      Legal Document 118 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Motion: Joinder
                                                                                        9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Def's Bero, Pascale, Tanner-Duran, Wong and Zechmann's Joinder to Def Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                          9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                            9-28-21 9am dept. 20 (REDACTED) Memo ISO Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                              9-28-21 9am dept. 20 (UNREDACTED) Memo ISO Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                9-28-21 9am dept. 20 (UNREDACTED) Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel ISO Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                  9-28-21 9am dept. 20 (REDACTED) Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel ISO Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                    9-28-21 9am dept. 20 Notice of Lodging of Documents Conditionally Under Seal re; Defs Rivian's Motion to Compel Further Identification of Trade Secrets
                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                        Defendants' Fourth Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          Third : Atty Boven
                                                                                                            Legal Document 107 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Third : Atty Fayad
                                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                                                                                                              Third : Atty Lumish
                                                                                                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                Andrea Zechmann Answer To Plaintiff Tesla, Inc. Third Amended Complaint with POS : Atty Venkatesan
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  Third : Atty Penhallegon
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None other
                                                                                                                      Ntc of August 10 hearing returned to Court.
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 101 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Notice: Appearance
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 100 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
                                                                                                                          Third Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 99 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Stipulation for leave to file a third amended complaint is GRANTED, signed Judge Manoukian. [Env# 6421042]
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              re: 3-30-21 Demurrers:; Def Rivian's Demurrer to plt Tesla's SAC is OVERRULED in part/SUSTAINED without leave to amend in part.; Defs Bero, Pascale, Duran, and Wongs demurrer to Tesla's SAC - OVERRULED; Def Bradley's demurrer to Tesla's SAC - OVERRULED; Def Siron's demurrer to Tesla's SAC - OVERRULED; Def Yoste's demurrer to Tesla's SAC - OVERRULED; - signed by Judge Monahan
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  re: reporter Kelly McCarthy for 3-30-21 - GRANTED by Judge Monahan
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 92 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 91 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Defendants' Third Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None other
                                                                                                                                                    Compendium of Non-California and Federal Authorities cited in support of Demurrer to second amended complaint and Reply 3-30-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 82 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 81 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                re: Kelly McCarthy for 2-23-21 hearing - GRANTED by Judge Kirwan
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  Rivian Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 79 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants Savayia Bero, Tami Pascale, Vince Tanner-Duran, and Kim Wong???s Reply in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff???s Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      Reply
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                          Def Jessie Yoste's Reply in support of Demurrer 2-23-21 9am dept. 20
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                            Def Carrington Bradley's Reply in support of Demurrer to second amended complaint 2-23-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                              Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION OF TESLA INC. TO DEMURRERS BY SAVAYIA BERO; TAMI PASCALE, VINCE TANNERDURAN, AND KIM WONG; JESSICA SIRON; JESSIE YOSTE; AND CARRINGTON BRADLEY1
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition to demurrer by defs Rivian Automotive Inc.and Rivian Automotive LLC 2-23-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated Protective Order - GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/3/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                        HRG 1-5-2021 Defendants Savayia Bero, Tami Pascale, Vince Tanner-Duran, And Kim Wong???s Request To Appear At CMC Through Video Conferencing Via Court???s Zoom Portal
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' Second Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              ** pending rejection** sv Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Consolidating Demurrer Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof of Service of Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Consolidating Demurrer Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Taken on Demurrer.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Def Jessie Yoste's Demurrer to second amended complaint and Joinder to Other Def's Demurrers 3-30-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        $20 filing fee for stip & order and signature page must contain text / Env# 5437523
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    3/9/21 by court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Duplicate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        in support of demurrer to second amended complaint 3-30-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *duplicate*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Permitting Brett James Frazer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants is GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              on Pro Hac Vice Application of Brett James Frazer is GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                of Jaideep Venkatesan ISO Demurrer.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Taken on Demurrer.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENV#5296424 / Demurrer: $435.00 first paper fee required for Defendant Siron
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Demurrer & Demurrer to SAC. Hearing 02/23/2021, Atty Copeland
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Demurrer to SAC. Hearing 02/23/2021, Atty Vankatesan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Demurrer & Demurrer to SAC. Hearing 02/23/2021, Atty Frenkel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Richard G. Frenkel in support of Defs Savayia Bero, Tami Pascale, Vince Tanner-Duran and Kim Wong's Notice of Demurrer to second amended complaint 2-23-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Def Rivian Automotive Inc. and Rivian Automotive LLC Demurrer to second amended complaint 2-23-21 9am dept. 20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memo of P's and A's in support of Defs Savayia Bero, Tami Pascale, Vince Tanner-Duran and Kim Wong's Demurrer to second amended complaint 2-23-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Stacy M. Boven in support of Def Carrington Bradley's demurrer to second amended complaint 2-23-21 9am Dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defs Savayia Bero, Tami Pascale, Vince Tanner-Duran and Kim Wong's Notice of Demurrer to second amended complaint 2-23-21 9am dept.20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants Savayia Bero, Tami Pascale, Vince Tanner-Duran, and Kim Wong's Notice of Court Call Appearance for Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            11 17 2020 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants' Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Brett James Frazer In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          re: leave to amend complaint - GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                for Leave to Amend Complaint (Atty Gates)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  of Charles Finfrock (Atty Gates)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    of Sean P. Gates (Atty Gates)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **wfp j3lm 10/22** Re: Extending Time for Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order required to file SAC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Civil Supervising Judge's Order Returning Assignment to D20. ENV #4792598.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Order: Deeming Case Not ComplexCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    signed/PML (matter is referred to Civil Supervising Judge for reassignment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Reassigning Case to D3, the Hon. Patricia M. Lucas presiding, pending complexity review - signed/Civil Supervising Judge Beth McGowen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Demurrer & Demurrer. Hearing: 10/27/20, 9am, D20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of Richard G. Frenkel ISO Demurrer.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED, Complex.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Apperance Fees & Complex Fees taken on Pro Hac Vice Application.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRETT JAMES FRAZER. Hearing: 10/27/20, 9am, D20
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Order: Proposed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***PENDING*** Re: Pro Hac Vice Application.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of Appearance of Counsel.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Complex.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Civil Lawsuit Notice

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 1,175 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?