USA v. PINA
Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00473-HAA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT ANDREW KIRSCH +1 201 645 2846 robert.kirsch@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Newark
Filed 6/23/2003
County Passaic
Terminated 11/30/2004
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-08101
Citation
Offense Level
181029(b) CREDIT CARD FRAUD [ 202-m -8101 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1029B.F
Offense Level 4
181029(b)(2). ATTEMPTS TO COMMIT AN OFFENSE(unauthorized access devices)(dof 1/02-7/02)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, PRIOR
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to CESAR PINA (1), Count(s) 1, of Information: Imprisonment, 16 months. Supervised Release: 3 years, (36 months) w/conditions. Restitution: $71,228.62. Special Assessment: $100.00 due immediately. . Signed by Judge Harold A. Ackerman on 12/20/04. (jn, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 SentencingCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harold A. Ackerman :5K motion by government granted. Sentencing held on 11/30/2004 for CESAR PINA (1), Count(s) 1, of Information: Imprisonment, 16 months. Supervised Release: 3 years, (36 months) w/conditions. Restitution: $71,228.62. Special Assessment: $100.00 due immediately. Ordered defendant shall surrender for service of sentence on 1/3/05. Ordered bail continued. (Court Reporter Molly Giordano.) (jn, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Statement
      FED.R.CRIM.P.12.4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USA (tl)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Plea Agreement
        Plea Agreement as to CESAR PINA (tl)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Plea Application of Guilty
          Application for permission to enter Plea of guilty by CESAR PINA (tl)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Waiver of Indictment
            WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by CESAR PINA (tl)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              Minutes of 6/23/03 before Judge Harold A. Ackerman as to CESAR PINA, Initial Appearance held. (Defendant informed of rights.) , Dft plead guilty to a 1 cnt info setting Sentencing for 12:00 9/29/03 for CESAR PINA Ordered Bail Contd (Court Reporter/ESR: Tom Brazaitis) (tl)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Notice of Allocation and AssignmentCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF ALLOCATION AND ASSIGNMENT in Courtroom 02 Newark ( before Judge Harold A. Ackerman ) (tl)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Information - Felony
                  INFORMATION as to CESAR PINA (1) count(s) 1 (Preliminary Hearing cancelled.) (tl)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Plea Entered
                    PLEA of Guilty: ; Court accepts plea. (tl)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                      ORDER as to CESAR PINA, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 3/4/03 to 5/3/03 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo ) [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                        ORDER as to CESAR PINA, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 1/3/03 to 3/4/03 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo ) [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                          ORDER as to CESAR PINA, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 11/4/02 to 1/3/03 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo ) [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                            ORDER as to CESAR PINA, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 9/3/02 to 11/4/02 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo ) [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                              Text not available.
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                ORDER as to CESAR PINA, Appointing Federal Public Defender ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo ) [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                  CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by CESAR PINA [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    Minutes of 8/2/02 before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo as to CESAR PINA, Initial Appearance held. Preliminary Hearing set for 2:00 8/9/02 for CESAR PINA ; (Defendant informed of rights.) , Appointing Federal Public Defender Bail set at $50,000 Secured by 10% cash bond cosigned by deft's mother and father, travel restricted to NJ, PTS reporting, drug testing and treatment, surrender/obtain no passport. Preliminary hearing set before Judge Falk on August 9, 2002 at 2 p.m. (Court Reporter/ESR: Tape 02-40k) [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT as to CESAR PINA, LUIS PINA [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Arrest
                                        ARREST of CESAR PINA, LUIS PINA [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Warrant Issued
                                          ARREST WARRANT issued as to CESAR PINA, LUIS PINA [ 2:02-m -8101 ] (mr)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 1,487 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?