Woodings v. Tesla Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG20069533

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:28 PM DT (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Woodings, Jeffrey, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lovasz, Christopher M., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 14 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
      Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
        Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (3 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
          Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
            Compliance Hearing 04/07/2021 02:30 PM D- 22
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed (7 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Inc Filed (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 22 (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeffrey Woodings (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (10 Pages)

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?