Superior Appellate Supreme
State
Superior Court of California, County of Alameda California Court of Appeals CA Supreme Court

Hothi v. Musk
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20069852

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:31 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hothi, Randeep, Plaintiff
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Elon"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Fossi, Lawrence J., Attorney
No Logo Lifrak, Michael T, Attorney
No Logo Sperlein, D Gill, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Defamation
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None ?
Clerk's Certificate Filed (8 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None ?
    Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None ?
      Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None ?
        Designation of Record Filed (5 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None ?
          Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Elon Musk (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None ?
            Proof of Service by Email Filed (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None ?
              Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                Motion to Strike Complaint Denied (6 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (5 Pages)
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed (11 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/07/2022 09:00 AM D- 301
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 45 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Civil Jury Trial 07/29/2022 10:00 AM D- 520
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/28/2022 10:00 AM D- 520
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                            Case Management Conference Order Issued (4 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                              Proof of Service by Email Filed (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                                Response to Defendants Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Plaintiff Filed (7 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed (41 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    Joint Case Management Statement Filed (7 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      Case Management Statement of Elon Musk Filed (7 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                        Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed (156 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 520 date: 01/27/2021 time: 02:00 PM
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                            Motion to Strike Complaint - Motion Rescheduled (3 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None ?
                                              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted (3 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Dropped
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Entend Date of Case Management Conference (3 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/04/2021 10:00 AM D- 520
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Notice of Errata Filed (4 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Motion to Strike Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 01/07/2021 02:00 PM D- 520
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Motion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant (513 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hearing Confirmed for 12/16/2020 02:00 PM D- 520
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Elon Musk (12 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Case Management Conf Continuance 11/16/2020 10:00 AM D- 520
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Compliance Hearing Hearing Dropped from dept: 15 date: 10/21/2021 time: 01:30 PM
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Case Management Conf Continuance 03/01/2021 10:00 AM D- 520 (2 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Initial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 15 date: 04/27/2021 time: 03:00 PM
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Compliance Hearing 10/21/2021 01:30 PM D- 15
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Granted (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted (2 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Evelio Grillo Filed for Elon Musk (4 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Answer to Complaint Filed for Elon Musk (11 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hearing Confirmed for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM D- 15
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence J. Fossi Filed by Randeep Hothi (8 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Initial Case Management Conference 04/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 15 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Complaint - Defamation Filed (12 Pages)
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Randeep Hothi (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,247 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?