JUMPP v. IMMIGRATION & NATURA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00833-KSH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VANDORA A. JUMPP, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
No Logo RALPH GREEN, Respondent
Office Newark
Filed 2/25/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Hudson
Terminated 8/13/2004
Origin 4
Reopened 7/1/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BB, CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus w/out prejudice, and that a Certificate of Appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 8/13/04. (dc, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 OpinionCourt Filing
    OPINION . Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 8/13/04. (dc, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Case Reopened
      Case reopened (DD)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER, for Case Reopen ; ORDERED that he be permitted to proceed w/out prepayment of fees or costs or security ( signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden ) (NM) (DD)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Letter
          LETTER By VANDORA A. JUMPP requesting that this matter be reopen and informa pauperis granted. (Copy to chambers) (nr)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Terminated Case
            Case closed (nr)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER, that, because Petitioner has failed to prepay the $5.00 filing fee, the Clerk of the Court is directed to deem the petition withdrawn and to close the file without filing the petition or assessing a filing fee. ( signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden ) (NM) (dc)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Petition Received
                Petition Received. (dc)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 13 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?