Epic Games, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:20-cv-05640-YGR
District Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2021 at 7:43 PM DT (18.4 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Epic Games, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brent Byars +1 212 474 1000 mbyars@cravath.com
Space PAUL JEFFREY RIEHLE +1 415 781 2635 paul.riehle@faegredrinker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY A. BORNSTEIN +1 212 474 1000 gbornstein@cravath.com
Space Yonatan Even +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 yeven@cravath.com
Space Katherine B. Forrest +1 212 474 1155 +1 212 474 3700 kforrest@cravath.com
Space Christine Anne Varney +1 212 474 1140 cvarney@cravath.com
v.
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/13/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (828) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 813 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: 9/10/2021 Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/10/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 812 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: 9/10/2021 OrderCourt Filing
      RULE 52 ORDER AFTER TRIAL ON THE MERITS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/10/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 9/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Certificate of service
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [810] Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic's Supplemental Administrative Motion to Seal Limited Portions of DX-3993 and DX-4219") (Karin, John) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None USCA Case Number
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
              Epic's Supplemental Administrative Motion to Seal Limited Portions of DX-3993 and DX-4219 filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Joseph Kreiner, # (2) Exhibit A [Filed Under Seal], # (3) Exhibit B [Filed Under Seal], # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # (6) Proposed Order)(Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 8/27/2021) Modified on 8/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 9/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: 8/24/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [808] Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to Access Sealed Filings in Related Cases ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Srinivasan, # (2) Declaration A, J. Srinivasan Decl'n)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Trial Sheet
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: 8/20/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                      Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to Access Sealed Filings in Related Cases filed by Epic Games, Inc. Responses due by 8/24/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Proposed Order)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 8/20/2021) Modified on 8/20/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3-24/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: 8/9/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/24/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 Notice of change of address
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicole Lauren Castle , Peter J. Sacripanti, John J. Calandra and Michael R. Huttenlocher (Castle, Nicole) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/16/2021 Statement of Recent Decision
                                STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM GLU MOBILE INC. by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting (440) Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting (330) Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting (695) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSUMER PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDERS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;granting (436) Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting (325) Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: 6/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM ZYNGA, INC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: 6/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM WALT DISNEY COMPANY. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: 6/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: 6/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM NIANTIC, INC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: 6/25/2021 statement
                                              Statement of Recent Decision by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: 6/11/2021 Errata
                                                Joint Trial Transcript Errata by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 6/11/2021) Modified on 6/11/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [788] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael R. Huttenlocher. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    POSTTRIAL ORDER NO. 1 RE: (1) ORDER GRANTING PENDING STIPULATION; (2) SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CLARIFY; (3) FINAL SEALING REQUESTS; AND (4) DEFERRED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/9/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                      APPLE INC.S RESPONSE TO [791] OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Apple Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 6/9/2021) Modified on 6/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - 5/24/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Objection
                                                          Epic Games, Inc.'s Objections to Apple Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 6/8/2021) Modified on 6/9/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/24/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Michael R. Huttenlocher (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16042357) filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Huttenlocher, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2021) Modified on 6/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: 6/3/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Dwight Craig Donovan (Donovan, Dwight) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                    Declaration of Don Sechler in Support of [778] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s)[778]) (Cove, John) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                      Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of [778] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s)[778]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                        Declaration of Asim M. Bhansali in Support of [778] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[778]) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 5/29/2021, Entered: 5/29/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                          Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis in Support of [778] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s)[778]) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 5/29/2021)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                            CORRECTED Transcript of Proceedings held on May 11, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 5/28/2021 (oh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re [778] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [777] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law") (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by Apple Inc. . (Attachments: # (1) Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (4) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                      Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of M. Brent Byars, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Redacted), # (4) Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Unredacted))(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 6/1/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 776 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                        Notice of Submission of Full Set of Expert Written Direct Testimony re [509] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 1, # (2) Ex. Expert 1 (Sealed), # (3) Ex. Expert 2, # (4) Ex. Expert 2 (Sealed), # (5) Ex. Expert 3, # (6) Ex. Expert 3 (Sealed), # (7) Ex. Expert 4, # (8) Ex. Expert 5, # (9) Ex. Expert 13, # (10) Ex. Expert 13 (Sealed), # (11) Ex. Expert 16, # (12) Ex. Expert 16 (Sealed))(Related document(s)[509]) (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 5/28/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3 - 24/2021 Full Trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/17 & 18/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/6 & 7/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/21- 5/24/21 All Trial Days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/21 - 5/24/21 Trial Days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 770 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 21, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 769 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 14, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 768 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 13, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                          REPLY (re [708] MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) ) filed byApple Inc.. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3, 5/21 & 5/24 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Stute, William) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 765 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 11, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 764 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 6, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 763 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 5, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman Pamela Hebel, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 762 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 4, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 761 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 SEALED TRANSCRIPTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 3, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on May 24, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on May 21, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on May 20, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on May 19, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) [427]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on May 18, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on May 17, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/6/21 and transcripts going forward until the end of the trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/20/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Bench Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held and completed on 5/24/2021.Total Time in Court: 3:33. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT TO DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN RESPONSE TO [699] EPIC GAMES, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF EX. EXPERT 1 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 1)(Related document(s)[699]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021) Modified on 5/25/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of RACHEL S. BRASS in Support of [699] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ex. Expert 1 filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[699]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits PX-1017 and PX-2946 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) PX-1017, # (4) PX-2946, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Errata Regarding Filing of Unredacted Final Versions of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 6, # (2) Ex. Expert 12)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021) Modified on 5/25/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 5/23/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Unredacted Written Direct Testimony filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 6, # (2) Ex. Expert 7, # (3) Ex. Expert 8, # (4) Ex. Expert 11)(Related document(s)[489]) (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 5/23/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 6, # (2) Ex. Expert 7, # (3) Ex. Expert 8, # (4) Ex. Expert 10, # (5) Ex. Expert 11, # (6) Ex. Expert 12)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 5/23/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Withdrawal of Exhibits from Evidence filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 5/23/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit PX-1047 and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) PX-1047, # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 5/23/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Clarification re [715] Order ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF NON-PARTY SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT FOR CLARIFICATION RE: TRIAL ORDER NO. 7 [ECF 715] filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2021. (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 5/23/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [725] STIPULATION RE: ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 5/23/2021, Entered: 5/23/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Opposition to [708] Apple Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/21/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Monday, 5/24/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 5:14. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Shane M. Palmer in Support of [707] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Epic's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s)[707]) (Palmer, Shane) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN SUPPORT OF [729] DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PARTIALLY SEAL PORTIONS OF THE PARTIES TRIAL EXHIBITS AND LIVE TRIAL TESTIMONY RELATED THERETO filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Epic Ex. Depo. 8, # (2) Epic Ex. Depo. 9, # (3) Epic Ex. Depo. 11, # (4) Epic Ex. Depo. 12, # (5) Epic Ex. Depo. 13, # (6) Epic Ex. Depo. 19, # (7) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[729]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [731] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed (Karin, John) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Don Sechler in Support of [731] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s)[731]) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Cynthia Williams in Support of [731] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s)[731]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Joseph Kreiner in Support of Epic's Motion to Seal, # (2) Exhibit A of Joseph Kreiner Declaration, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Proposed Order)(Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN SUPPORT OF [729] DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PARTIALLY SEAL PORTIONS OF THE PARTIES TRIAL EXHIBITS AND LIVE TRIAL TESTIMONY RELATED THERETO filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) DX-4089A, # (2) PX-0101, # (3) PX-0191, # (4) PX-1085, # (5) PX-1086, # (6) PX-1901, # (7) PX-1922, # (8) PX-2090, # (9) PX-2174, # (10) PX-2302, # (11) PX-2303, # (12) PX-2309, # (13) PX-2337, # (14) PX-2350, # (15) PX-2366, # (16) PX-2367, # (17) PX-2378, # (18) PX-2389, # (19) PX-2390)(Related document(s)[729]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/21/21 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                      Class Plaintiffs' Schedule Re: In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 24, 2021 by Donald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                        Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 24, 2021 by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/20/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Friday, 5/21/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:24. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021, Terminated: 5/23/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Admission of Exhibits and Deposition Designations filed by Epic Games, Inc. Apple Inc. (Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Joint Filing Pursuant to Stipulation Governing Objections to Deposition Testimony by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc (Attachments: # (1) Deposition Objections Chart and Rulings Thereon)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Submission of Amended and Redacted Versions of Certain Expert Written Direct Testimony and Withdrawal of Certain Expert Written Direct Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 1, # (2) Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief Regarding Susan Athey's Direct Written Testimony filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Declaration of Yonatan Even, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Dr. Susan Athey's Written and Oral Expert Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/21/2021. Replies due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of M. Perry, # (2) Exhibit A, Perry Decl., # (3) Exhibit B, Perry Decl., # (4) Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Epic Games Inc.'s Response to Declaration of Kyle Andeer in Support of Apple's Joint Letter Submission Regarding Clawback of Document by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Kyle Andeer in Support of [717] Order in Support of Apple's Joint Letter Submission Regarding Clawback of Document filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s)[717]) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 Discovery orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery Order re: [714] Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple Inc.'s Clawback of Document. Apple's clawback is SUSTAINED. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/20/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER re [716] Order. The Court orders Apple to file the Andeer Declaration and orders Epic to file its response. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/20/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER re [714] Discovery Letter Brief. The Court orders Apple to email the document by 1:00 p.m. today for in camera review, along with any declarations in support of its claims of attorney-client privilege and work product. Epic may file any response to those declarations by 4:00 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/20/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL ORDER NO. 7 RE: (1) PENDING STIPULATIONS; (2) BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PARTIAL FINDINGS; AND (3) WEEK 2 SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/20/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [708] MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c): Responses due by 5/23/2021 by 12:00 PM PDT. Replies due by 5/26/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple Inc.'s Clawback of Document filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 5/19/2021) Modified on 5/20/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Submission of Amended and Redacted Versions of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Expert 6, # (2) Exhibit Expert 7, # (3) Exhibit Expert 8)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/19/2021) Modified on 5/20/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [602] MOTION Regarding Adverse Credibility Finding ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Calandra, # (2) Declaration of J. Srinivasan)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/19/2021. Further Bench Trial on Thursday, 5/20/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:38. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [699] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ex. Expert 1 (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/18/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Wednesday, 5/19/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:15. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Motion for Judgment on Partial FindingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/20/2021. Replies due by 5/21/2021. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg - SEALED/UNREDACTED, # (2) Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg - PUBLIC/REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit A SEALED/UNREDACTED, # (4) Exhibit A PUBLIC/REDACTED, # (5) Declaration of Samuel A. Stuckey in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Exhibits to Its Administrative Motion for Leave To File Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, # (6) Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate of Service)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Responses due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Yonatan Even in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion for Leave To File Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, # (2) Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response To Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, # (3) Declaration of Yonatan Even in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response To Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Proposed Order)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Redlined Content Licence and Distribution Agreement filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit, # (3) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Trial Exhibit by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/18/2021) Modified on 5/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF re Testimony of Dr. Cragg by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Exhibit A)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Brief re Cragg Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Reply Brief), # (3) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Reply Brief), # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 10, 11, 12, 13 & 14, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ex. Expert 1 filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Expert 1 [UNREDACTED], # (2) Exhibit Expert 1 [REDACTED], # (3) Declaration of M. Brent Byars in Support of Epic Games Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal, # (4) Proposed Order on Administrative Motion to Seal)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Submission of Redacted Versions of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 1, # (2) Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 13, # (3) Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 14, # (4) Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 15, # (5) Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2021) Modified on 5/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/17/2021. Further Bench Trial Tuesday, 5/18/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:19. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [657] Trial Brief Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of S. Stuckey in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike, # (2) Exhibit A to Decl. of S. Stuckey, # (3) Exhibit B to Decl. of S. Stuckey, # (4) Exhibit C to Decl. of S. Stuckey, # (5) Exhibit D to Decl. of S. Stuckey, # (6) Exhibit E to Decl. of S. Stuckey, # (7) Proposed Order Denying Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, # (2) Exhibit B - Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg (REDACTED), # (3) Declaration of S. Stuckey in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (4) Proposed Order Granting Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion to file Under Seal, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021, Terminated: 6/28/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulated [Proposed] Supplemental Protective Order Governing Discovery From Glu Mobile, Inc. filed by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (DeJong, Brittany) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Steven Singer in Support of [650] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits To J. Wesley Earnhardt's Declaration In Support Of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion Fo filed byNintendo of America Inc.. (Related document(s)[650]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of [650] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits To J. Wesley Earnhardt's Declaration In Support Of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion Fo filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Related document(s)[650]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SPOT-EPIC-00001047 filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin Kung, # (2) Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [602] MOTION Regarding Adverse Credibility Finding ) filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brandon Kressin, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Jenna Hardy in Support of [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byThe Gearbox Entertainment. (Related document(s)[660], [659]) (Ball, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL ORDER NO. 6 RE: EXHIBITS ONLY CONTAINING HEARSAY RE: [604] and [608]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/17/2021. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on May 14, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on May 13, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on May 12, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on May 10, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Batalo-Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (oh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic filing error. REMINDER: No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] No further action is necessary. Re: [678] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 5/16/2021, Entered: 5/16/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/16/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal accompanying Declaration of Benjamin Kung (Dkt. No. 680) filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A (DX-5549), # (2) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B (DX-5550))(Related document(s)[660]) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Benjamin Kung in Support of [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s)[660]) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Shane M. Palmer in Support of [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s)[659]) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Sony Interactive's Proposed Redactions to PX-2456, accompanying Declaration of Don Sechler (ECF 677) filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: # (1) PX-2456 (redacted), # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[660]) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Don Sechler in Support of [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of PX-2456 filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s)[660]) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/15/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of PETER WARMAN in Support of [662] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s)[662], [659]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of JONATHAN ROSS CHRISTIE in Support of [662] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s)[662], [659]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Cynthia Williams in Support of [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties Trial Exhibits and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s)[660]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ryan Takemoto in Support of [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byVisa Inc.. (Related document(s)[659]) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corrected EXHIBITS re [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) DX-4800 (corrected), # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[659]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/15/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Brian Sims in Support of [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byPayPal, Inc.. (Related document(s)[659]) (Yang, Yi) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Asim M. Bhansali in Support of [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[659]) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: 5/15/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s)[659]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/14/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Monday, 5/17/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:22. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Four-Hour Deposition Designations Pursuant to Trial Order No. 2 by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations Pursuant to Trial Order No. 2 by Apple Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Kyle Batter in Support of [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [662] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s)[660], [662]) (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re [662] Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Don Sechler in support of motion, # (2) Declaration of Patrick Colsher in support of motion, # (3) Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # (7) Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # (8) Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # (9) Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # (10) Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # (11) Redacted Version of Exhibit E, # (12) Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # (13) Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # (14) Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # (15) Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # (16) Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # (17) Redacted Version of Exhibit H, # (18) Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # (19) Redacted Version of Exhibit I, # (20) Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, # (21) Redacted Version of Exhibit J, # (22) Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, # (23) Proposed Order, # (24) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cove, John) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [659] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Cragg Direct Demonstrative, # (2) DX-3122, # (3) DX-3174, # (4) DX-3248, # (5) DX-3465, # (6) DX-4089, # (7) DX-4094, # (8) DX-4170, # (9) DX-4199, # (10) DX-4312, # (11) DX-4495, # (12) DX-4760, # (13) DX-4793, # (14) DX-4794, # (15) DX-4795, # (16) DX-4796, # (17) DX-4797, # (18) DX-4800, # (19) DX-4807, # (20) DX-4809, # (21) DX-4815, # (22) DX-5338, # (23) PDX-0041, # (24) PX-0432, # (25) PX-0526, # (26) PX-0602, # (27) PX-0603, # (28) PX-0604, # (29) PX-0605, # (30) PX-0606, # (31) PX-0607, # (32) PX-0608, # (33) PX-0609, # (34) PX-0610, # (35) PX-0611, # (36) PX-0612, # (37) PX-0747, # (38) PX-1000, # (39) PX-1001, # (40) PX-1003, # (41) PX-1026, # (42) PX-1036, # (43) PX-1049, # (44) PX-1050, # (45) PX-1066, # (46) PX-1077, # (47) PX-2126, # (48) PX-2142, # (49) PX-2176, # (50) PX-2326, # (51) PX-2328, # (52) PX-2385, # (53) PX-2391, # (54) PX-2392)(Related document(s)[659]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re [660] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Epic Games, Inc.. (Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 660 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Joseph Kreiner, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph Kreiner, # (3) DX-5549 (Sealed), # (4) DX-5550 (Sealed), # (5) DX-3233 (Sealed), # (6) DX-3233 (Redacted), # (7) DX-3297 (Sealed), # (8) DX-3297 (Redacted), # (9) DX-4362 (Sealed), # (10) DX-4362 (Redacted), # (11) DX-4800 (Sealed), # (12) DX-4800 (Redacted), # (13) Hitt Demonstratives (Sealed), # (14) Hitt Demonstratives (Redacted), # (15) PX-2456 (Sealed), # (16) PX-2456 (Redacted), # (17) PX-2469 (Sealed), # (18) PX-2469 (Redacted))(Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May, 12, 13 & 14, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF re Testimony of Dr. Cragg by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Brief re Testimony of Dr. Cragg filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Trial Brief), # (4) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Declaration of R. Brass), # (5) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Trial Brief), # (6) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Declaration of R. Brass), # (7) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 17, 2021 by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Class Plaintiffs' Schedule re In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 17, 2021 by Donald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/13/2021. Further Bench Trial set Friday, 5/14/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:16. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Valve Corporation. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/12/2021. Further Bench Trial set Thursday, 5/13/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:16. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits To J. Wesley Earnhardt's Declaration In Support Of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion For An Adverse Credibility Finding") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit H, # (4) Exhibit I, # (5) Exhibit B (Redacted), # (6) Proposed Order)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SPOT-EPIC-00000925 and SPOT-EPIC-00001023 filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin Kung, # (2) Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (6) Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # (7) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion For An Adverse Credibility Finding And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B (Redacted Version), # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Proposed Order)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 6, 7, 10, 11, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [586] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer K. Bracht. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [581] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Harry Phillips. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [559] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Steven L. Holley. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL ORDER NO. 5 RE: (1) MOTION FOR ADVERSE CREDIBILITY FINDING; (2) SEALING REQUESTS; (3) STIPULATIONS; AND (4) RELATED CASES COUNSEL ACCESS TO SEALED DOCUMENTS AND TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/12/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - 5/12/2021 and all future dates of trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021, Terminated: 5/20/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Corrected) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts, filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. SEALED AT FILERS REQUEST. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/13/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/11/2021. Further Bench Trial set Wednesday, 5/12/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:14. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SPOT-EPIC-00000932 filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin Kung, # (2) Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding App Store App Categories filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) DX-5552)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/11/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/11/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/1/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3,4,5/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - All trial days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - All trial days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Arpine Lawyer for Defendant Apple Inc. (Lawyer, Arpine) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/10/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Tuesday, 5/11/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:32. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Testimony Submitted With Four-Hour Deposition Designations filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2021) Modified on 5/11/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Li for Defendant Apple Inc. (Li, Dana) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration in Support of [596] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed Declaration of Brian Sims in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal filed byPayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[596]) (Yang, Yi) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting [510] Stipulation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Non-Party Nintendo of America Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration. filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order Granting Non-Party Nintendo's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration, # (2) Declaration Declaration of Steven Singer Non-Party Nintendo's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Nintendo of America Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of DX-3464 filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 1, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Declaration Steven Singer)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/10/2021) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 5/10/2021 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 and full trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on May 5, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on May 7, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on May 6, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on May 4, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on May 3, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [427] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, [425] Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) [427], [425]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2021: # (1) Supplement Master Index) (oh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 5/9/2021, Entered: 5/9/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re Samsung Request to Seal May 4, 2021 Trial Transcript by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/9/2021) Modified on 5/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 5/9/2021, Entered: 5/9/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE: (1) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL; AND (2) PARTIAL RULING ON EXPERT OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 5/9/2021, Entered: 5/9/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL ORDER NO. 3 RE: BENCH TRIAL WEEK 1 PARTY SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 5/8/2021, Entered: 5/8/2021 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Motion [611] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 5/8/2021, Entered: 5/8/2021, Terminated: 5/8/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) DX-4178, # (4) PX-0059, # (5) PX-0201, # (6) PX-0314, # (7) PX-0413, # (8) PX-0414)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 5/8/2021, Entered: 5/8/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Steven Singer in Support of [596] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed Portions of DX-4365, DX-4485, PX-2456, and PX-2442 I, filed byNintendo of America Inc.. (Related document(s)[596]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/7/2021. Further Bench Trial set Monday, 5/10/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:13. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE: (1) [598] [601] FACEBOOK INC. ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CLARIFY; AND (2) [491] [505] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/7/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief re: Exhibits Containing inadmissible Hearsay filed byApple Inc.. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Class Plaintiffs' Schedule Re: In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 10, 2021 by Donald R. Cameron re [485] Pretrial Order. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/7/2021) Modified on 5/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/5/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 10, 2021 by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations re [485] Pretrial Order. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/7/2021) Modified on 5/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Epic Games, Inc.'s Brief Regarding Apple Inc.'s Rule 802 Objections To Third Party Statements To Apple filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 5/7/2021) Modified on 5/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/6/2021. Further Bench Trial set Friday, 5/7/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:17. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021, Terminated: 5/6/2021 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Regarding Adverse Credibility Finding filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/20/2021. Replies due by 5/27/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021, Terminated: 5/7/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Clarification re: Trial Order No. 1 (ECF [594]) (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [598]) filed by Facebook, Inc. Responses due by 5/10/2021. (Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 5/6/2021) Modified on 5/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Motion for Clarification re: Trial Order No.1 [594] (Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Sanghoon Park in Support of [596] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s)[596]) (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Joseph Kreiner, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The proper event is a motion. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: [598] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF NON-PARTY FACEBOOK, INC. FOR CLARIFICATION RE: TRIAL ORDER NO. 1 [ECF 594] filed by Facebook, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/5/2021. Further Bench Trial set 5/6/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6 hours. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information: ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/4/2021 and 5/5/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by NVIDIA Corporation, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL ORDER NO.1 RE: STIPULATIONS, MEDIA REQUEST, AND REMAINING THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Macdonald on behalf of Non-Party Netflix, Inc. (Macdonald, Matthew) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic filing error. REMINDER: No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] No further action is necessary. Re: [580] UNREDACTED EXHIBIT H to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected [592] Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/4/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***SEE DOCKET [599] FOR CORRECTED ENTRY*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/4/2021. Further Bench Trial set Wednesday, 5/5/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:13. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information: ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bracht for Defendant Apple Inc. (Bracht, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Dansey for Defendant Apple Inc. (Dansey, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Netflix, Inc. re [588] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits PX-0197 and PX-2140 (Harding, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits PX-0197 and PX-2140 filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Harding, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Harding on behalf of Non-Party Netflix, Inc. (Harding, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by J. Bracht for Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15926040.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Bracht, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Soolean Choy for Defendant Apple Inc. (Choy, Soolean) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Doc Bedel for Defendant Apple Inc. (Bedel, Anthony) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time to Respond to [562] Consumer Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Entry of Supplemental Protective Orders filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of E. Dettmer)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt for Defendant Apple Inc. (Kleinbrodt, Julian) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by H. Phillips for Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15924156.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Phillips, Harry) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNREDACTED EXHIBIT H re [576] Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal (Related Docket Entries [453], [489] and [505]) (CORRECTION OF DOCKET [576-17] EXHIBIT H) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s)[576]) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request to Modify List of Pre-Authorized Pool Reporters re [485] Pretrial Order, [475] Response by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected [572] Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/3/2021. [minutes corrected to reflect correct exhibit number on the minute sheet.] (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal [Related Docket Entries [453], [489] and [505] filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (SEE DOCKET ENTRY [580] FOR CORRECTED VERSION OF ATTACHMNENT 17) (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of John F. Cove, Jr., # (2) Exhibit A (Redacted), # (3) Exhibit A (Unredacted), # (4) Exhibit B (Redacted), # (5) Exhibit B (Unredacted), # (6) Exhibit C (Redacted), # (7) Exhibit C (Unredacted), # (8) Exhibit D (Redacted), # (9) Exhibit D (Unredacted), # (10) Exhibit E (Redacted), # (11) Exhibit E (Unredacted), # (12) Exhibit F (Redacted), # (13) Exhibit F (Unredacted), # (14) Exhibit G (Redacted), # (15) Exhibit G (Unredacted), # (16) Exhibit H (Redacted), # (17) Exhibit H (Unredacted), # (18) Exhibit I (Redacted), # (19) Exhibit I (Unredacted), # (20) Exhibit J (Redacted), # (21) Exhibit J (Unredacted), # (22) Declaration of Don Sechler, # (23) Proposed Order, # (24) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cove, John) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Benjamin Kung in Support of [509] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s)[509]) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Benjamin Kung in Support of [489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s)[489]) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Partially Seal Written Direct Testimony filed by Roblox, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Mark Barbolak in support of Apple Inc.'s and Epic Games, Inc.'s Motions to Seal Certain Expert Testimony, # (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Partially Seal Written Direct Testimony, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***SEE DOCKET [578] FOR CORRECTED ENTRY*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/3/2021. Further Bench Trial Tuesday, 5/4/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 4:22. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Joinder In [514] Defendant Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal PX-2339 filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrew Bennet in Support of Joinder, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Andrew Bennet, # (3) Proposed Order)(Tullman, Molly) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Adrian Ong in Support of [509] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Match Group, Inc.. (Related document(s)[509]) (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Karl Quackenbush in Support of [489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, [509] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Valve Corporation. (Related document(s)[489], [509]) (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Steven Singer in Support of [489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, [505] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Related document(s)[489], [505]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David P. Chiappetta in Opposition to [489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, [505] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations (to Partially Seal)filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Cynthia Williams)(Related document(s)[489], [505]) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Henry H. Cornillie for Defendant Apple Inc. (Cornillie, Henry) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J. Rho for Defendant Apple Inc. (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 5/2/2021, Entered: 5/2/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 9 RE: ADDITIONAL THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL Re: [551] and [561]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/2/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Access to Sealed Portions of Trial Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 6/25/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consumer Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Entry of Supplemental Protective Orders filed by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. Responses due by 5/4/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Brittany N. DeJong, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Proposed Order, # (5) Proposed Order, # (6) Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeJong, Brittany) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit)(Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin Kung, # (2) Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Steven L. Holley ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15914706.) filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Holley, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Michael Palmer on Behalf of Spotify USA Inc. (Palmer, Shane) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan P. Cullen on Behalf of Spotify USA Inc. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REDACTED VERSION OF WRITTEN DIRECT TESTIMONY OF NED S. BARNES, CPA by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Expert 2, WRITTEN DIRECT TESTIMONY OF NED S. BARNES, CPA)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Trial Exhibits of Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc. filed by Kabam, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marc E. Mayer, # (2) Declaration of Erick Chang, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 redacted version, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1 sealed version, # (3) Declaration Declaration of Steven Singer in Spport of Non Party Nintendo of America's Administrative Motion to Seal, # (4) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Mayer on behalf of Non-Party Kabam, Inc. (Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Chiappetta For Non-Party Nintendo of America Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, # (3) Declaration of David Hampton in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, # (4) Redacted Hampton Ex. A PX-2477 DX-5523, # (5) Unredacted Hampton Ex. A PX-2477 DX-5523, # (6) Declaration of Herbert Holzer in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, # (7) Redacted Holzer Ex. A PX-2478, # (8) Unredacted Holzer Ex. A PX-2478, # (9) Redacted Holzer Ex. B DX-5528, # (10) Unredacted Holzer Ex. B DX-5528, # (11) Declaration of David Los in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, # (12) Redacted Los Ex. A DX-3110 5402, # (13) Unredacted Los Ex. A DX-3110 5402, # (14) Declaration of Stephanie Louie in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, # (15) Redacted Louie Ex. A DX-3918, # (16) Unredacted Louie Ex. A DX-3918, # (17) Declaration of Cynthia Williams in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, # (18) Redacted Williams Ex. A PX-2475 DX-5521, # (19) Unredacted Williams Ex. A PX-2475 DX-5521 Part 1, # (20) Unredacted Williams Ex. A PX-2475 DX-5521 Part 2, # (21) Redacted Williams Ex. B PX-2476 DX-5522, # (22) Unredacted Williams Ex. B PX-2476 DX-5522, # (23) Redacted Williams Ex. C DX-3437, # (24) Unredacted Williams Ex. C DX-3437, # (25) Redacted Williams Ex. D DX-3587, # (26) Unredacted Williams Ex. D DX-3587, # (27) Redacted Williams Ex. E DX-3764, # (28) Unredacted Williams Ex. E DX-3764)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Exhibits filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Ellen London in Support of Non-Party Lyft, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Exhibits, # (2) Declaration Declaration of Mojin Chen in Support of Non-Party Lyft, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Exhibits, # (3) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Lyft, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Information Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 & 79.5, # (4) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (6) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # (7) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # (8) Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # (9) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen London on Behalf of Non-Party Lyft, Inc. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8 RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL THE COURTROOM DURING PRESENTATION OF CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: RE THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -Trial Exhibits- filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Exh 1, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exh 1, # (5) Redacted Version of Exh 2, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exh 2, # (7) Redacted Version of Exh 3, # (8) Unredacted Version of Exh 3, # (9) Redacted Placeholder of Exh 4, # (10) Unredacted Version of Exh 4)(Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION OF BRIAN SIMS IN SUPPORT OF [515] APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL filed by PayPal, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Yang, Yi) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION OF BRIAN SIMS IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (re [515] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Partially Seal the Courtroom) filed by PayPal, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Yang, Yi) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED EXHIBIT re [489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Expert Written Direct Testimony, [490] Notice (Other), (Replacement for 489-3 and 490-1 (Expert #6)) filed by Apple Inc. (Related document(s)[489], [490]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN RESPONSE TO EPIC GAMES, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS EXPERT WRITTEN DIRECT EXAMINATIONS filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 1), # (3) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 2), # (4) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 3), # (5) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 13), # (6) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 14), # (7) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 15), # (8) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 16), # (9) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[509]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [515] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Partially Seal the Courtroom ) filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE TRIAL STIPULATIONS filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, [505] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations, [491] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation, [509] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations by Google LLC. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Epic Games, Inc.'s Statement Responding to Pretrial Order No. 6 & Apple Inc.'s Objections to Expert Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION OF ANDREW ROPE IN SUPPORT OF SEALING PORTIONS PROPOSED TRIAL TESTIMONY re [509] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations, [489] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, [505] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations, [491] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[509], [489], [505], [491]) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER RE: OBJECTIONS TO EXPERT TESTIMONY re [520] Statement, [521] Order on Objections to Expert Testimony by Apple Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Class Plaintiffs' Schedule Re: In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 3, 2021 re [485] Pretrial Order by Donald R. Cameron.(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 3, 2021 re [485] Pretrial Order by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [509] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Adrian Ong in Support of [491] Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation filed byMatch Group, Inc.. (Related document(s)[491]) (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Match Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # (7) Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # (8) Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # (9) Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # (10) Unredacted Version of Exhibit, # (11) Redacted Version of Exhibit E, # (12) Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # (13) Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # (14) Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # (15) Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # (16) Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # (17) Unredacted Version of Exhibit H)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Submission of Redacted Version of Written Direct Testimony of Dr. David S. Evans (Ex. Expert 1) by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 1)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Trial Exhibits filed by Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Karl Quackenbush in Support of Non-Party Valve Corporation's Administrative Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits of Defendant Apple, Inc., # (2) Proposed Order Granting Non-Party Valve Corporation's Administrative Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits of Defendant Apple, Inc., # (3) Exhibit A Unredacted DX3585, # (4) Exhibit B Unredacted DX5333, # (5) Exhibit C Unredacted DX3931, # (6) Exhibit D Unredacted DX4202, # (7) Exhibit E Unredacted DX4388, # (8) Exhibit F Unredacted DX3746, # (9) Exhibit G Unredacted DX3868 DX5322, # (10) Exhibit H Unredacted DX4514 DX5321, # (11) Exhibit I Unredacted DX4200 DX5365)(Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal filed by Roblox, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Hans Gunawan Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e)(1) In Support of Roblox Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Maben Hammon. (Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Yoga Buddhi Co.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Douglas J. Dixon, # (2) Declaration of Benjamin Simon, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (6) Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # (7) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # (8) Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # (9) Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # (10) Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # (11) Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # (12) Redacted Version of Exhibit E, # (13) Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # (14) Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # (15) Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # (16) Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # (17) Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # (18) Redacted Version of Exhibit H, # (19) Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # (20) Redacted Version of Exhibit I, # (21) Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, # (22) Redacted Version of Exhibit J, # (23) Unredacted Version of Exhibit J)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 RE: OBJECTIONS TO EXPERT WRITTEN DIRECT TESTIMONY [517] [518] [520]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Objections to Apple Expert's Written Direct Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021, Terminated: 5/12/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Rebuttal Expert Direct Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to Expert Testimony by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of M. Perry, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Objections to Expert Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of M. Perry, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Objections to Expert Testimony), # (4) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Athey Deposition), # (5) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Objections to Expert Testimony), # (6) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Athey Deposition), # (7) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Don Sechler, # (2) Declaration of John F. Cove, Jr., # (3) Exhibit Exhibit A (Redacted), # (4) Exhibit Exhibit A (Unredacted), # (5) Exhibit Exhibit B (Redacted), # (6) Exhibit Exhibit B (Unredacted), # (7) Exhibit Exhibit C (Redacted), # (8) Exhibit Exhibit C (Unredacted), # (9) Proposed Order, # (10) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cove, John) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Partially Seal the Courtroom filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PX-2339 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (4) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third Party ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 TO SEAL TRIAL EXHIBITS IN THEIR ENTIRETY filed by App Annie Inc.. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Benjamin M. Crosson, # (2) Declaration of Ketaki Rao, # (3) Proposed Order)(Crosson, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Discovery orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery Order re [493] Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/28/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERDEFENDANT EPIC GAMES, INC.S RESPONSE TO DECLARATIONS OF PHILLIP W. SCHILLER AND SEAN CAMERON IN SUPPORT OF APPLES OPPOSITION TO EPICS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Epic Games, Inc. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021, Terminated: 5/10/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Expert Direct Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021, Terminated: 5/9/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Declaration of M. Brent Byars, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 1, # (5) Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 1, # (6) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 2, # (7) Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 2, # (8) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 3, # (9) Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 3, # (10) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 13, # (11) Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 13, # (12) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 14, # (13) Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 14, # (14) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 15, # (15) Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 15, # (16) Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 16, # (17) Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of submission of written direct testimony of expert witnesses by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 1, # (2) Ex. Expert 2, # (3) Ex. Expert 3, # (4) Ex. Expert 4, # (5) Ex. Expert 5, # (6) Ex. Expert 13, # (7) Ex. Expert 14, # (8) Ex. Expert 15, # (9) Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [506] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, # (2) Unredacted Version of Exhibit L, # (3) Unredacted Version of Exhibit M, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit N, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exhibit P, # (7) Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q, # (8) Unredacted Version of Exhibit R, # (9) Unredacted Version of Exhibit S)(Related document(s)[506]) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrew Rope, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # (7) Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # (8) Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # (9) Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # (10) Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # (11) Unredacted Version of Exhibit I)(Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021, Terminated: 5/7/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel Brass, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to seal portions of trial exhibits and testimony , Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by NVIDIA Corporation. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aashish Patel, # (2) Declaration of Marc David Peters, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Exhibit Redacted Version of Patel Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Patel Exhibit A, # (6) Exhibit Redacted Version of Patel Exhibit B, # (7) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Patel Exhibit B, # (8) Exhibit Redacted Version of Patel Exhibit C, # (9) Exhibit Unredacted Version of Patel Exhibit C)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021, Terminated: 5/10/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Testimony in Support of Apple Inc.'s Position in [493] Joint Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of E. Dettmer, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit A, Dettmer Decl'n, # (4) Exhibit A, Dettmer Decl'n)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Supporting Materials Cited in [493] Letter Brief by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Attachment 2, # (3) Attachment 3, # (4) Attachment 4, # (5) Attachment 5, # (6) Attachment 6, # (7) Attachment 7)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of PHILLIP W. SCHILLER in Opposition to [493] to Epic's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s)[493]) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Marc David Peters for Non-Party NVIDIA Corporation (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of SEAN CAMERON in Opposition to [493] to Epic's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Apple Inc. (Related document(s)[493]) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Admissibility of Documents Submitted With Four-Hour Deposition Designations filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ENTRY OF DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S TRIAL EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [493] Letter Brief filed by Epic Games, Inc. The Court orders Apple to submit the documents by emailing them by 5p.m. today. The Court orders Apple to file any declarations in support of its claim of privilege by 11:59 p.m. today. Epic may file a response to these declarations by noon tomorrow. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/27/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations by Apple Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ENTRY OF EPIC GAMES INC.'S TRIAL EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 LETTER BRIEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Clawback Of Documents filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Epic Games, Inc.'s Four-Hour Deposition Designation (Redacted) by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021, Terminated: 5/7/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of M. Brent Byars, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Epic Games, Inc.'s Four-Hour Deposition Designation, # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. Expert 6, # (2) Ex. Expert 7, # (3) Ex. Expert 8, # (4) Ex. Expert 9, # (5) Ex. Expert 10, # (6) Ex. Expert 11, # (7) Ex. Expert 12)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021, Terminated: 5/9/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 6), # (4) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 7), # (5) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 8), # (6) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 11), # (7) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 6), # (8) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 7), # (9) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 8), # (10) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 11), # (11) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Epic Games, Inc.'s Tentative Updated Trial Witness List by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/26/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second Revised Tentative Witness List by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/26/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DX-3891 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit DX-3891, # (4) Exhibit DX-3891 (unredacted), # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/26/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Authorizing Entry of Apple's Trial Equipment by Apple Inc.. (Lo, Jason) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 4/25/2021, Entered: 4/25/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Supplemental List of Summary Exhibits by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/25/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 4/25/2021, Entered: 4/25/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/25/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 4/25/2021, Entered: 4/25/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S UPDATED LIST OF DISCOVERY EXCERPTS, AUDIO, AND VIDEO LIKELY TO BE USED AT TRIAL by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/25/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Authorizing the Entry of Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Trial Equipment Into Courthouse by Epic Games, Inc.. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [464] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew John Reynolds. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [463] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Karl Huth. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Class Plaintiffs' Response to Court's Order re In-Person Attendance at Trial re [468] Pretrial Order by Donald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Protocol for Press Pool Trial Coverage re [468] Pretrial Order by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [473] Stipulation re Breach of Contract Counterclaim. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021, Terminated: 4/23/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Claim for Breach of Contract filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/22/2021) Modified on 4/23/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on April 21, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [469] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2021. (Related documents(s) [469]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Pretrial Conference held via Zoom Webinar Videoconference on 4/21/2021 and via the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. Total Time in Court: 1:30. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2021) Modified on 4/22/2021 (fs, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/21/21 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/21/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021, Terminated: 4/21/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Objections to Deposition Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/20/2021 Modified on 4/21/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021, Terminated: 4/23/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Matthew John Reynolds of Huth Reynolds LLP ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15862505.) filed by Shelley Gould. (Reynolds, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021, Terminated: 4/23/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Karl Huth of Huth Reynolds LLP ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15862001.) Filed by Shelley Gould. (Huth, Karl) (Filed on 4/20/2021) Modified on 4/21/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response re [457] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Trial Access byEpic Games, Inc.. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 461 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR VIDEOCONFERENCE HEARING FOR THE Pretrial Conference set for Wednesday, 4/21/2021 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) [460]Live Audio Stream: www.youtube.com/user/USDCCAND (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 460 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE :This court is a participant in the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. See www.uscourts.gov/about-federal-courts/judicial-administration/district-court-audio-streaming-pilot. The parties in this case have consented to audio streaming the Wednesday, April 21, 2021 at 9:00 AM Pretrial Conference. Members of the press and public may listen to the live audio stream of the hearing at the court's YouTube channel: www.youtube.com/user/USDCCAND. Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, 4/21/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Response to [458] April 16, 2021 Order by Epic Games, Inc., Apple, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [457] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Trial Access filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. Filing due no later than 12:30 PM PDT on April 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/16/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021, Terminated: 4/21/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Trial Access filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. Responses due by 4/20/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Katie Townsend as Counsel, filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Epic Games, Inc.'s Tentative Revised Trial Witness List by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021, Terminated: 4/21/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation and Proposed Order re Trial Stipulations filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Tentative Revised Trial Witness List by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Expert Witness List by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Audio Visual Exhibit List by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Exhibit List by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List of Discovery Excerpts Audio Video Likely To Be Used At Trial by Apple Inc... (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Status Conference held via Zoom platform on 4/13/2021.Total Time in Court: 08 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [441] MOTION to Appoint Special Master ) filed byApple Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 445 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting [440] Stipulation for Expedited Briefing. The Court will set a hearing, if necessary, after receipt and review of Apple's Responsive Brief. Entered by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal re [410] Proposed Findings of Fact, [408] Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of D. Sechler Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e)(1) in Response to Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Partially Seal its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal)(Cove, John) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Cove, Jr (Cove, John) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021, Terminated: 4/21/2021 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Responses due by 4/26/2021. Replies due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Justin C. Clarke in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion to Appoint Special Master, # (2) Proposed Order Appointing Special Master for Pre-Trial Rulings)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021, Terminated: 4/13/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Expedited Briefing and Hearing regarding Epic's Motion for Special Master filed by Epic Games, Inc. Apple, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021, Terminated: 4/21/2021 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION by Class Plaintiffs for Permission to View Trial via Zoom filed by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. Responses due by 4/16/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Of Rachele R. Byrd, # (2) Proposed Order)(Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of R. Brass in Support of [404] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[404]) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S MOTION FOR PRETRIAL SANCTIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;denying [419] Motion. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 LETTER BRIEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief re [419] MOTION For Pre-Trial Sanctions Against Epic Games, Inc. re [418] Order on Stipulation filed byYoga Buddhi Co.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[419]) (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of ANDREW ROPE in Support of [408] Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed by Google LLC. (Related document(s)[408]) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Asim M. Bhansali (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Douglas J. Dixon in Response (re [404] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Match Group, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Adrian Ong)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/9/21, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [424] Transcript Order, [415] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2021. (Related documents(s) [424], [415]) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [419] MOTION For Pre-Trial Sanctions Against Epic Games, Inc. re [418] Order on Stipulation ) filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt, # (2) Exhibit A to Earnhardt Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Earnhardt Declaration, # (4) Exhibit C to Earnhardt Declaration, # (5) Exhibit D to Earnhardt Declaration, # (6) Exhibit E to Earnhardt Declaration, # (7) Exhibit F to Earnhardt Declaration, # (8) Exhibit G to Earnhardt Declaration, # (9) Declaration of Nathan E. Denning, # (10) Exhibit A to Denning Declaration, # (11) Exhibit B to Denning Declaration, # (12) Proposed Order)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas James Dixon (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Sanghoon Park in Support of [408] Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s)[408]) (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by Epic Games, Inc.,Apple Inc.. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/9/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Apple Inc.. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [409] Declaration in Support, [408] Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected), [404] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Epic Games, Inc.. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (432) Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting (318) Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting (416) Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [409] Declaration in Support, [408] Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected), [404] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [401] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brandon Kressin. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [402] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Kanter. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/12/2021 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION For Pre-Trial Sanctions Against Epic Games, Inc. re [418] Order on Stipulation filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 4/12/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Of Karen Hoffman Lent and Exhibits A-C, # (2) Declaration Of Jay P. Srinivasan and Exhibits A-F, # (3) Declaration Of Michelle Lowery and Exhibits A-D, # (4) Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [417] Stipulation for Expedited Briefing Schedule. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/9/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing Regarding Apple's Motion for Pre-Trial Sanctions, filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games Inc. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/9/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/9/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROPOSED Supplemental Protective Order Governing Discovery From Google filed by Apple Inc., Yoga Buddhi Co., Valve Corporation, Stephen H. Schwartz, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Robert Pepper, Microsoft Corporation, Edward Lawrence, Edward W. Hayter, Facebook Inc, Epic Games Inc, Donald R. Cameron. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/9/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Discovery orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Order re: [403] Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic Expert Productions filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/9/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 413 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 4/9/2021 at 8:00 a.m., by Zoom Video Conference.Total Time in Court: 8:00-8:31/ Total Time: 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Lauren Moskowitz. Defendant Attorney: Jay Srinivasan. Proceedings: Discovery hearing held, argument heard, matter submitted. Court to issue Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re [409] Declaration in Support, [408] Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected), [404] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 411 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing re ECF Docket No. 403, set for 4/9/2021 at 8:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Today, 4/8/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for 4/9/2021 at 8:00 a.m., Zoom Discovery hearing, re ECF Docket No. 403. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera hearing set for 4/9/2021 08:00 AM. (Related documents(s) [403]) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact by Apple Inc. and Conclusions of Law (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [405]). (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of M. Brent Byars in Support of [404] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[404]) (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (4) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/8/2021) Modified on 4/9/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of R. Brass, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (4) Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY [410] FOR CORRECTED PDF WITH CAPTION PAGE*** Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Apple Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021, Terminated: 4/9/2021 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic Expert Productions filed by Apple Inc. Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021, Terminated: 4/9/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jonathan Kanter (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15800892) filed by Yoga Buddhi Co. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/6/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021, Terminated: 4/9/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Brandon Kressin (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15800347) filed by Yoga Buddhi Co. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Kressin, Brandon) (Filed on 4/6/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas James Dixon (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 Discovery orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery Order re: (395 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc., (428 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc., (314 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/6/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from J. Wes Earnhardt to Magistrate Judge Hixson in response to Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. (Docket No. 395) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Judith Bond Jennison for Non-Party Microsoft Corporation (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Chiappetta for Non-Party Microsoft Corporation (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021, Terminated: 4/6/2021 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc., Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/5/2021) Modified on 4/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Justin Paul Raphael for 3d Party Respondent Facebook, Inc.. (Raphael, Justin) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Rosemarie Theresa Ring as Counsel for 3d Party Respondent Facebook, Inc.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Emily Claire Curran-Huberty as Counsel for 3d Party Respondent Facebook, Inc.. (Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/30/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Pretrial Conference held via Zoom Webinar Videoconference on 3/26/2021. The 4/2/2021 at 9:01AM Compliance Deadline is vacated.Total Time in Court: 1:03. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/26/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 26, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/26/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 385 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/26/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar s (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) [371]) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [378] Joint Discovery Letter Brief for Apple Inc. and Epic Games filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/24/2021. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [382] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Evan R. Kreiner. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021, Terminated: 3/24/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Evan R. Kreiner (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15740652) filed by Apple Inc. (Kreiner, Evan) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/23/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER re ECF No. [378]. As the joint discovery letter brief is hard to evaluate without seeing both sides' expert reports, the Court will review them in camera. The Court orders the parties to email their expert reports by March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/22/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 379 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 3/25/2021 at 10:00 AM, re ECF Docket No. 378, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.On 3/24/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 3/25/2021, 10:00 a.m., Zoom Discovery Hearing re Docket No. 378, Joint Letter Brief. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera hearing set for 3/25/2021 10:00 AM, re ECF Docket No. 378. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021, Terminated: 3/24/2021 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. and Epic Games. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 3/22/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/21/2021, Entered: 3/21/2021, Terminated: 3/23/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Pretrial Schedule filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 3/21/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List by Epic Games, Inc. ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Tentative Trial Witness List"). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Apple Inc. (Tentative Initial). (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: 3/17/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [373] Stipulation re Case Schedule. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021, Terminated: 3/17/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULE filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2021) Modified on 3/16/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [349] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gavin W. Skok. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/2/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/01/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on March 1, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [365] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2021. (Related documents(s) [365]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF INPUTING ALL BENCH TRIAL DATES FOR THE 5/3/2021 BENCH TRIAL SO THAT DATES WILL BE REFLECTED ON COURT'S CALENDAR:Set Hearing Dates : Bench Trial set for 5/3/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez. Bench Trial set for 5/4/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez. Bench Trial set for 5/5/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/6/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/7/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/10/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/11/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/12/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/13/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/14/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/17/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/18/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/19/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/20/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/21/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/24/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further CMC and Pretrial Conference held on 3/1/2021 via Zoom Webinar. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/26/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 1:02. Court Reporter: Duane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unsealed Exhibit to Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions re [343] Order filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Related document(s)[343]) (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 3/1/2021) Modified on 3/2/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/1/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 1, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 364 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Further Case Management Conference set for Monday, 3/1/2021 09:30 AM Via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference (Related documents(s) [132]) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 363 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE: This Court is a participant in the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. See : https://www.uscourts.gov/about-federal-courts/judicial-administration/district-court-audio-streaming-pilotWith the consent of the parties, the Monday, March 1, 2021 at 9:30am Case Management Conference hearing has been approved for participation in the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. Members of the press and public may listen to the live audio stream of this hearing at the courts YouTube channel: www.youtube.com/user/USDCCAND. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Regarding Audio Streaming Pilot Project filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***AMENDED**** Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2021, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [359] Transcript Order, [358] Transcript Order, [353] Transcript Order, [354] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2021. (Related documents(s) [359], [358], [353], [354]) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF AUDIO STREAMING PILOT PROJECT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Valve Corporation, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET # [361]) *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2021, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (353 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order, (354 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021) Modified on 2/26/2021 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021 Discovery orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discovery Order re: (346 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., (413 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., (292 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/24/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 355 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 2/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m., by Zoom Video Conference.Total Time in Court: 49 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Appearances:Gavin Skok (Pro Hac Vice Counsel, Pending), Rep. Non-Party Valve Corp.Jaemin Chang, Local Co-Counsel, Rep. Non-Party Valve Corp.Robert F. Lopez, Representing for Developer PlaintiffsJay P. Srinivasan and Michelle Lowery, Representing Def. Apple, Inc. Proceedings: Discovery hearing held. Argument heard, matter submitted. Court to issue Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 24, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 2/22/2021) Modified on 2/23/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 351 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting [350] Stipulation Re Extension of Deposition Date. Entered by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021, Terminated: 2/22/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Further Stipulation and Proposed Order Permitting Non-Party Deposition of Adrian Ong of Match Group, Inc. After the Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Wesley)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 2/22/2021) Modified on 2/23/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021, Terminated: 3/2/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Gavin W. Skok (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15602806) filed by Valve Corporation. (Skok, Gavin) (Filed on 2/22/2021) Modified on 2/23/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 LETTER BRIEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unsealed Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Outstanding Document Requests and Supporting Exhibits filed byEpic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Related document(s)[335]) (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 2/19/2021) Modified on 2/22/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 347 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 9:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. On 2/23/20, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 2/24/2021, at 9:00 a.m., Zoom Discovery Hearing re the Joint Letter brief, re ECF Docket Nos.: 11-6714 Doc. No. 413, 19-3074 Doc. No. 292, 20-5640 Doc. No. 346. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 9:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021, Terminated: 2/24/2021 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Non-Party Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Lowery, Michelle) (Filed on 2/18/2021) Modified on 2/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [340] Stipulation between Epic Games Inc. and Apple Inc. re: case schedule. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [341] Stipulation Permitting Non-Party Deposition of Adrian Ong. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re (261 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (241 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (371 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, Robert Pepper, Harry Bass, Crystal Boykin, Epic Games, Inc., Edward Lawrence, Edward W. Hayter, Kevin Fahey. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/18/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT re Motions to Seal by Apple Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: 2/15/2021, Terminated: 2/18/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Non-Party Deposition of Adrian Ong of Match Group, Inc. After the Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Epic Games, Inc., and Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 2/15/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: 2/15/2021, Terminated: 2/18/2021 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Case Schedule filed by Apple Inc., and Epic Games, Inc.. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 2/15/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: 2/15/2021 Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying [338] Discovery Letter Brief. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/14/2021, Entered: 2/14/2021, Terminated: 2/15/2021 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Request for an Extension filed by Apple Inc., and Epic Games. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 2/14/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/12/2021. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report from Apple due by 2/17/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/12/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part [297] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM SPOTIFY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting as modified by the Court (402) Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting as modified by the Court (276) Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting as modified by the Court (320) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [330] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Darin P. McAtee. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [321] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Omid Nasab. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Brass (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021, Terminated: 2/11/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Darin P. McAtee (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15549330) filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(McAtee, Darin) (Filed on 2/8/2021) Modified on 2/9/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 Discovery orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery Order re [319] Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/8/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/6/2021, Entered: 2/6/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/5/21, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Official Reporter, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [323] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2021. (Related documents(s) [323]) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unsealed Exhibits to [290] Joint Discovery Letter Briefs Regarding Cook, Cue, and Federighi filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Related document(s)[290]) (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief of Amici Curiae Developer Plaintiffs Regarding Trial Elements filed byDonald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consumer Plaintiffs' Amicus Brief Regarding Trial Elements, Legal Framework and Remedies re [276] Statement by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 5, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/05/21 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,085 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?