PATRON v. ASCROFT, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-01365-WGB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DEO D. PATRON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Uri Rosenthal +1 212 625 8300 +1 212 625 8661 douglas.rosenthal@usa.net
v.
No Logo COMMISSIONER BOARD OF IMMIGRATION APPEALS, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUSAN HANDLER-MENAHEM +1 973 645 2842 susan.menahem@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Respondent
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUSAN HANDLER-MENAHEM +1 973 645 2842 susan.menahem@usdoj.gov
No Logo DISTRICT DIRECTOR OF THE UNITED STATES BUREAU OF CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUSAN HANDLER-MENAHEM +1 973 645 2842 susan.menahem@usdoj.gov
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUSAN HANDLER-MENAHEM +1 973 645 2842 susan.menahem@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOHN ASCROFT, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUSAN HANDLER-MENAHEM +1 973 645 2842 susan.menahem@usdoj.gov
Office Newark
Filed 3/27/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Union
Terminated 9/19/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BM, CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003 Terminated Case
Case closed (DD)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, voluntarily dismissing action in its entirety, w/out prejudice & w/out costs ( signed by Judge William G. Bassler ) (NM) (DD)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE of Attorney's Complaince re: service of process upon U.S. Attorney for Dist of NJ and the Dept. of Homeland Security by DEO D. PATRON (jd)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER granting Patron 30 days from the date of this order to perfect service of process upon US Atty for the Dist. of NJ & the Dept. of Homeland Security as set forth in Rule 4(i). Noncompliance w/this order will result in the dismissal of this action for failure to effect valid service of process upon the government. ( signed by Judge William G. Bassler ) n/m (DD)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Certification
          CERTIFICATION of PATRICE RODMAN on behalf of JOHN ASCROFT, DISTRICT DIRECTOR, IMMIGRATION AND NAT, DOJ Re: [3-1] writ answer (ar)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Response to Habeas Petition
            ANSWER to petition for Writ of habeas corpus by JOHN ASCROFT, DISTRICT DIRECTOR, IMMIGRATION AND NAT, DOJ ' (ar)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003, Terminated: 9/19/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge BASSLER - Magistrate Judge ARLEO) (NM) (dr)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                PETITION for writ of habeas corpus FILING FEE $5.00 RECEIPT # 314561 (dr)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 58 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?