LY v. IMMIGRATION AND NATU, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-01118-JWB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BO VAN LY, Petitioner
v.
No Logo ANDREA J. QUARANTILLO, Respondent
No Logo DAVID VENTURELLA, Respondent
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
No Logo JAMES W. ZIGLAR, Respondent
No Logo JOHN D. ASHCROFT, Respondent
No Logo JOSE C. SIMAO, Respondent
No Logo RONALD BONAFORTE, Respondent
Office Newark
Filed 3/12/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Essex
Terminated 5/16/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Remark
Mail - Returned Re Copy of order of dismissal (nr)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed (nr)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, dismissing action as moot ( signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell ) (NM) (nr)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Miscellaneous Document
        Returned Receipt filed RE: 3/28/03 order received (nr)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Miscellaneous Document
          Returned Receipt filed RE: 3/24/03 order received (nr)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Miscellaneous Document
            Returned Receipt filed RE: 3/24/03 order received at INS (nr)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER, directing Respondents to answer on or before, set answer due for 5/5/03 for JOHN D. ASHCROFT, for ANDREA J. QUARANTILLO, for JOSE C. SIMAO, for RONALD BONAFORTE, for JAMES W. ZIGLAR, for DAVID VENTURELLA, for IMMIGRATION AND NATU ( signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell ) (NM) (dc)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 5/16/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge John W. Bissell ) (NM) (dc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                  PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS w/APPLICATION to process IFP & supporting Decl filed. FILING FEE $5.00 RECEIPT #314175 (dc) Modified on 03/21/2003
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?