District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Acres Bonusing, Inc, et al v. Lester Marston, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 20-15959

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 19, 2020 at 9:22 PM DT (7.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Acres Bonusing, Inc, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald H. Blumberg +1 858 509 0600
No Logo James Raymond Acres, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Raymond Acres +1 541 760 7503
No Logo Amelia F. Burroughs, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Smith +1 310 447 9000
No Logo Amy O'neill, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lerch, Jerome N +1 415 217 6341
Space Sturmer, Debra Steel +1 415 217 6342
No Logo Anita Huff, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Arla Ramsey, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Ashley Burrell, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Boutin Jones, A California Corporation, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lerch, Jerome N +1 415 217 6341
Space Sturmer, Debra Steel +1 415 217 6342
No Logo Cooper Demarse, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Daniel Stouder, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lerch, Jerome N +1 415 217 6341
Space Sturmer, Debra Steel +1 415 217 6342
No Logo Darcy Vaughn, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo David Joseph Rapport, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Janssen Malloy Llp, An Associations Of Attorneys, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Smith +1 310 447 9000
No Logo Lathouris Kostan, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Lester John Marston, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Meghan Yarnall, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Smith +1 310 447 9000
No Logo Michael E. Chase, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lerch, Jerome N +1 415 217 6341
Space Sturmer, Debra Steel +1 415 217 6342
No Logo Rapport And Marston, An Association Of Attorneys', Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
No Logo Thomas, Frank, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Forman +1 415 491 2310 george@gformanlaw.com
Space Allison Lenore Jones +1 619 696 6700
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 415 491 2310 +1 415 491 2313 jay@gformanlaw.com
Nature of Suit 3470 - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations (RICO)
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:19-cv-05418-WHO
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:19-cv-05418-WHO
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None ?
Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [10] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellants Mr. James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc. [11792809] (KWG)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None ?
    Received correction to deficient excerpts of record [10] from Appellants Mr. James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc: consecutively paginated replacement copies. [11792808] (KWG)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None ?
      Streamlined request [14] by Appellees Boutin Jones, Michael E. Chase, Amy O'Neill and Daniel Stouder to extend time to file the brief is approved for all Appellees. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Boutin Jones, Ashley Burrell, Amelia F. Burroughs, Michael E. Chase, Cooper Demarse, Thomas Frank, Anita Huff, Janssen Malloy LLP, Lathouris Kostan, Lester John Marston, Amy O'Neill, Arla Ramsey, David Joseph Rapport, Rapport and Marston, Daniel Stouder, Darcy Vaughn and Meghan Yarnall answering brief due 09/28/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11789381] (JN)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None ?
        Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Boutin Jones, Michael E. Chase, Amy O'Neill and Daniel Stouder. New requested due date is 09/28/2020. [11788174] [20-15959] (Sturmer, Debra)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032003783 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None ?
          Received Appellants Mr. James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [10] in 2 volume(s). Deficiency: volume 2 of the excerpts are missing consecutive page numbers (numbers are cut off). Corrections required (see attached notice). [11777397] (KWG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None ?
            Received 6 paper copies of Joint Opening Brief [9] filed by Mr. James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc. [11777130] (DB)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031986443 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None ?
              Filed clerk order: The joint opening brief [9] submitted by Mr. James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [10] submitted by Mr. James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11769587] (KT)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031983540 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Acres Bonusing, Inc and Mr. James Raymond Acres. Date of service: 07/27/2020. [11768127] [20-15959] (Acres, James)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031983511 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Acres Bonusing, Inc and Mr. James Raymond Acres. Date of service: 07/27/2020. [11768117] [20-15959]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of opening brief. 07/28/2020 by KT] (Acres, James)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Attorneys Stephanie Berman Schneider substituted by Attorneys Howard Smith [11756703] (JFF)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Howard J Smith (BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER & LOWARY, LLP, 11900 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 600, Los Angeles, CA 90064) for Appellees Janssen Malloy LLP, Meghan Yarnall and Amelia F. Burroughs. Substitution for Attorney Stephanie Berman Schneider for Appellees Amelia F. Burroughs, Janssen Malloy LLP and Meghan Yarnall. Date of service: 07/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11756628] [20-15959] (Smith, Howard)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) [5] is rejected. Filer is not permitted to file on behalf of another attorney. Each attorney must file their own notice of appearance. [11755437] (RL)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Howard J. Smith (BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER & LOWARY LLP, 11900 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 600, Los Angeles, CA 90064) for Appellees Janssen Malloy LLP, Meghan Yarnall and Amelia F. Burroughs. Substitution for Attorney Stephanie Berman Schneider for Appellees Amelia F. Burroughs, Janssen Malloy LLP and Meghan Yarnall. Date of service: 07/16/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11755434] [20-15959] (Schneider, Stephanie)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031850161 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                            MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11709303] (VS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                              The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/26/2020.
                              To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.
                              Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11701727]. [20-15959] (AD)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031833110 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. James Raymond Acres Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/26/2020. [11701705] [20-15959] (Acres, James)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031819508 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/26/2020. Appellants James Raymond Acres and Acres Bonusing, Inc opening brief due 07/28/2020. Appellees Boutin Jones, Ashley Burrell, Amelia F. Burroughs, Michael E. Chase, Cooper Demarse, Thomas Frank, Anita Huff, Janssen Malloy LLP, Lathouris Kostan, Lester John Marston, Amy O'Neill, Arla Ramsey, David Joseph Rapport, Rapport and Marston, Daniel Stouder, Darcy Vaughn and Meghan Yarnall answering brief due 08/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11696069] (RT)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?