PALLET-MARTINEZ v. INS, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-01627-WJM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BARBARO PALLET-MARTINEZ, Petitioner
v.
No Logo ANDREA QUARANTILLO, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NEIL RODGERS GALLAGHER +1 973 645 2835 neil.gallagher2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NEIL RODGERS GALLAGHER +1 973 645 2835 neil.gallagher2@usdoj.gov
Office Newark
Filed 4/15/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Essex
Terminated 10/22/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BD, CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing as moot [1-1] petition as Petitioner is no longer in the custody of INS and that he has been released from incarceration, etc. ( signed by Judge William J. Martini ) (NM) (jd)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jd)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Miscellaneous Document
      DECLARATION of NEIL R. GALLAGHER for respondents supporting [7-1] writ answer. (ms)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003, Terminated: 10/22/2003 Response to Habeas Petition
        ANSWER to petition for Writ of habeas corpus by respondents (ms)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, setting answer due for 9/22/03 for ANDREA QUARANTILLO, for INS ( signed by Judge William J. Martini ) (NM) (jd)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Remark
            Corresp forwarded to Petitioner ret w/notation "Released" 5/12/03. Corresp placed in Petitioner's file. (dr)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER that the answer to the Petition shall be filed w/in 60 days of the entry of this order. ( signed by Judge William J. Martini ) (NM) (jd)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER directing Res to ans on or beforew, set answer due for 6/23/03 for ANDREA QUARANTILLO, for INS ( signed by Judge William J. Martini ) (NM) (dr)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003, Terminated: 10/22/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge MARTINI - Magistrate Judge HEDGES) (NM) (dr)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDERED that the Clk shall file the letter from BARBARO PALLET-MARTINEZ dated Nov 4, 2002, as a Petition for Pwrithc 28:2241 in a new case captioned PALLET-MARTINEZ v. INS & QUARANTILLO ( signed by Judge William J. Martini ) (NM) (dr)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                      PETITION for writ of habeas corpus FILING FEE $5.00 RECEIPT # 311182 (dr)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 49 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?