Bush v. Blink Charging Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-23527-KMW
District Judge Kathleen M. Williams, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 21, 2021 at 2:02 PM EDT (4.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard Maurice Bush, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Block & Leviton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Craig Block +1 617 398 5600 +1 617 507 6020 jeff@blockleviton.com
Space Jacob A Walker +1 617 398 5600 +1 617 507 6020 jake@blockleviton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cullin O'Brien Law, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cullin Avram O'Brien +1 561 676 6370 +1 561 320 0285 cullin@cullinobrienlaw.com
v.
Blink Charging Co. Blink Charging Co., Defendant
Officially listed as "Blink Charging Company"
Disclosed Consulting Vendor, Balance Labs, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracy Ann Nichols +1 305 374 8500 +1 305 789 7799 tracy.nichols@hklaw.com
Space Stephen Patrick Warren +1 305 349 2256 +1 305 789 7799 stephen.warren@hklaw.com
No Logo Farkas, Michael D., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael D. Farkas"
Chairman, CEO and Director, Wealthhound Com Inc
Beneficial Owner, Atlas Equity Group Inc
Shareholder, Schoolwurks, Inc.
President, Farkas Group Inc
Officer/Director, EZfill Holdings, Inc.
No Logo Michael P. Rama, Defendant
No Logo Alexander Yu, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckner+Miles

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Buckner +1 786 523 0480 +1 786 523 0485 David@bucknermiles.com
No Logo H. Marc Joseph, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckner+Miles

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Buckner +1 786 523 0480 +1 786 523 0485 David@bucknermiles.com
No Logo Hamit Tamer Adiguzel, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cullin O'Brien Law, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cullin Avram O'Brien +1 561 676 6370 +1 561 320 0285 cullin@cullinobrienlaw.com
No Logo Mark J. Friedman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Tianyou (Steven) Wu, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jayne A. Goldstein +1 954 515 0123 +1 954 515 0124 jgoldstein@sfmslaw.com
No Logo Gina F. Vittoria, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jayne A. Goldstein +1 954 515 0123 +1 954 515 0124 jgoldstein@sfmslaw.com
Office Miami
Filed 8/24/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 12 U.S.C. § 0022 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Miami-Dade (Office - Miami)
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CONS_LEAD,EGT,REF_PTN
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Memorandum
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 49 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: 6/22/2021 OrderCourt Filing
        PAPERLESS SET/RESET Deadlines as to MOTION TO DISMISS [47]. Per DE 35, the reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss [47] shall be filed on or before July 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/22/2021. (shy)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 response in opposition to motion
            RESPONSE in Opposition re (47 in 1:20-cv-23527-KMW) MOTION TO DISMISS (40) Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard Maurice Bush. Attorney David Buckner added to party Richard Maurice Bush(pty:pla). Replies due by 6/28/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - D)Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-23527-KMW, 1:20-cv-23643-KMW(Buckner, David)
            LREF
            Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
            MOTION TO DISMISS [40] Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Blink Charging Company, Michael D. Farkas, Michael P. Rama. Attorney Tracy Ann Nichols added to party Michael D. Farkas(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Ann Nichols added to party Michael P. Rama(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/4/2021 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9)(Nichols, Tracy)
            LREF
            Blank  Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings
            PAPERLESS SET/RE-SET DEADLINES. Per DE 35, Co-Lead Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to the Motion to Dismiss [47] no later than June 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/20/2021. (shy)
              LREF
              Blank 46 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
              Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re Terminate Attorneys. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (mee)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Notice - other
                NOTICE by Blink Charging Company, Michael D. Farkas, Michael P. Rama OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF MICHAEL W. GLENN AS COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM COURT MATRIX AND SERVICE LIST (Nichols, Tracy)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [42] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Unopposed Motion for leave to file excess pages. The Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a single combined motion to dismiss of no more than 30 pages. Co-Lead Plaintiffs shall file a single response of no more than 30 pages. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/13/2021. (shy)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Terminate Attorneys
                    Attorney Michael Wayne Glenn representing Blink Charging Company (Defendant) cannot be terminated without leave of court. Modified text on 4/13/2021 (mee).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name
                      NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jayne Arnold Goldstein. Attorney Jayne Arnold Goldstein added to party Richard Maurice Bush(pty:pla). (Goldstein, Jayne)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/13/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Blink Charging Company, Michael D. Farkas, Michael P. Rama. (Nichols, Tracy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reed Richard Kathrein on behalf of H. Marc Joseph, Tianyou (Steven) Wu, Alexander Yu. Attorney Reed Richard Kathrein added to party H. Marc Joseph(pty:mov), Attorney Reed Richard Kathrein added to party Tianyou (Steven) Wu(pty:mov), Attorney Reed Richard Kathrein added to party Alexander Yu(pty:mov). (Kathrein, Reed)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws against Blink Charging Company, Michael D. Farkas, Michael P. Rama, filed by Alexander Yu, Tianyou (Steven) Wu, H. Marc Joseph.(Buckner, David)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting [38] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Villi A. Shteyn. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Villi A. Shteyn, Esq. as counsel of record for Co-Lead Plaintiffs and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/20/2021. (js02)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021, Terminated: 1/20/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Villi A. Shteyn. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14238275 by H. Marc Joseph, Tianyou (Steven) Wu, Alexander Yu. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Buckner, David)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting [36] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Lucas E. Gilmore. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Lucas E. Gilmore, Esq. as counsel of record for Co-Lead Plaintiffs Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/13/2021. (js02)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lucas E. Gilmore. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14148114 by H. Marc Joseph, Alexander Yu. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Buckner, David)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AmendCourt Filing
                                      PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Amend [34]. The Motion is GRANTED. The Parties shall adhere to the briefing schedule as set forth in the Motion. No further extension will be granted. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/30/2020. (shy)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020, Terminated: 12/30/2020 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend /Consolidate Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Blink Charging Company, Michael D. Farkas, Michael P. Rama. Attorney Stephen Patrick Warren added to party Michael D. Farkas(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Patrick Warren added to party Michael P. Rama(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/11/2021 (Warren, Stephen)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Wayne Glenn on behalf of Blink Charging Company. Attorney Michael Wayne Glenn added to party Blink Charging Company(pty:dft). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-23527-KMW, 1:20-cv-23643-KMW (Glenn, Michael)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting [31] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Brenda Szydlo. The Court finds that the application satisfies the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Brenda Szydlo, Esq. as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/23/2020. (js02)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020, Terminated: 12/23/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brenda Szydlo. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14090693 by H. Marc Joseph, Tianyou (Steven) Wu, Alexander Yu. Attorney David Buckner added to party Tianyou (Steven) Wu(pty:mov). Responses due by 1/6/2021 (Buckner, David)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte. Co-Lead Plaintiffs shall file an Operative Complaint no later than January 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/22/2020. (shy)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead PlaintiffCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying as moot [19] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff; denying as moot [19] MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel; denying as moot [20] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff; denying as moot [20] MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel; granting [21] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff; granting [21] MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel; granting [23] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff; granting [23] MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel. The Court appoints Tianyou Wu, Alexander Yu, and H. Marc Joseph as Co-Lead Plaintiffs, and Pomerantz LLP and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Co-Lead Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (js02)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [21] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP , [23] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Tianyou (Steven) Wu MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Jayne A. Goldstein filed by H. Marc Joseph, Alexander Yu. (Buckner, David)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Response in Support of Motion
                                                      RESPONSE in Support re [21] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP , [23] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Tianyou (Steven) Wu MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Jayne A. Goldstein filed by H. Marc Joseph, Tianyou (Steven) Wu, Alexander Yu. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of David M. Buckner with Exhibits)(Buckner, David)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                        NOTICE by Mark J. Friedman re [20] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Mark J. Friedman MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF MOVANT MARK J. FRIEDMAN TO COMPETING MOTIONS TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVE SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Rosen, Laurence)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                          NOTICE by Hamit Tamer Adiguzel re [20] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Mark J. Friedman MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. , [24] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [22] Memorandum, [21] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP , [23] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Tianyou (Steven) Wu MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Jayne A. Goldstein , [19] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Hamit Tamer Adiguzel MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky LLP (O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [23] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Tianyou (Steven) Wu MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Jayne A. Goldstein filed by Tianyou (Steven) Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Press Release, # (2) Exhibit B - Certification, # (3) Errata C - Loss Chart, # (4) Exhibit D - Wu Declaration, # (5) Exhibit E - Pomerantz Resume, # (6) Exhibit F - SFMS Resume)(Goldstein, Jayne)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020, Terminated: 12/21/2020 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Tianyou (Steven) Wu ( Responses due by 11/6/2020), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Jayne A. Goldstein by Tianyou (Steven) Wu. Attorney Jayne Arnold Goldstein added to party Tianyou (Steven) Wu(pty:mov). (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum)(Goldstein, Jayne)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 MEMORANDUM
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [21] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP by H. Marc Joseph, Alexander Yu. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Declaration of David M. Buckner in Support of Motion of Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel)(Buckner, David)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020, Terminated: 12/21/2020 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph ( Responses due by 11/6/2020), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP by Alexander Yu, H. Marc Joseph. Attorney David Buckner added to party Alexander Yu(pty:mov), Attorney David Buckner added to party H. Marc Joseph(pty:mov). (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion of Alexander Yu and H. Marc Joseph for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel)(Buckner, David)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020, Terminated: 12/21/2020 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Mark J. Friedman ( Responses due by 11/6/2020), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. by Mark J. Friedman. Attorney Laurence Matthew Rosen added to party Mark J. Friedman(pty:mov). (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, # (2) Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Notice, # (3) Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020, Terminated: 12/21/2020 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff
                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Hamit Tamer Adiguzel ( Responses due by 11/6/2020), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky LLP by Hamit Tamer Adiguzel. Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party Hamit Tamer Adiguzel(pty:mov). (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF HAMIT TAMER ADIGUZELS MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL, # (2) Affidavit DECLARATION OF CULLIN OBRIEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF HAMIT TAMER ADIGUZEL FOR CONSOLIDATION OF THE ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration - PSLRA Certification, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration - Loss Chart, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration - PSLRA Notice, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration - Firm Resume of Levi & Korsinsky, LLP, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration - Firm Resume of Cullin O'Brien Law, P.A., # (8) Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF HAMIT TAMER ADIGUZEL FOR CONSOLIDATION OF THE ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL)(O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [14] Motion to Consolidate Cases for all purposes, including pretrial proceedings and Trial. Case 20cv23643-KMW is hereby consolidated. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020 Response to order to show cause
                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re [15] Order to Show Cause,, by Richard Maurice Bush. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PSLRA Notice)(O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy Ann Nichols on behalf of Blink Charging Company. Attorney Tracy Ann Nichols added to party Blink Charging Company(pty:dft). (Nichols, Tracy)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020, Terminated: 9/30/2020 Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                                Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Schedule to File Amended Complaint by Blink Charging Company. Attorney Stephen Patrick Warren added to party Blink Charging Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/14/2020 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Stephen)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 waiver of service executed
                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Maurice Bush. Michael P. Rama waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 waiver of service executed
                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Maurice Bush. Michael D. Farkas waiver sent on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Richard Maurice Bush. Blink Charging Company served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: 8/27/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER granting [8] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jeffrey Block; granting [9] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jacob Walker. The Court finds that the applications satisfy the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Jeffrey Block and Jacob Walker as counsel of record for Plaintiff and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/27/2020. (js02)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020, Terminated: 8/27/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jacob A. Walker. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13417587 by Richard Maurice Bush. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: # (1) Certification CERTIFICATION OF JACOB A. WALKER, # (2) Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING)(O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020, Terminated: 8/27/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey C. Block. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13417566 by Richard Maurice Bush. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: # (1) Certification CERTIFICATION OF JEFFREY C. BLOCK, # (2) Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING)(O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Bar Letter
                                                                                                Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jeffrey C. Block and Jacob A. Walker, mailing date August 25, 2020, (pt)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Michael P. Rama. (mee)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Michael D. Farkas. (mee)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Blink Charging Company. (mee)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Clerk's Notice of Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number BFLSDC-13403533, filed by Richard Maurice Bush. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summon(s) Summons to Defendant Blink Charging Company, # (3) Summon(s) Summons to Defendant Michael D. Farkas, # (4) Summon(s) Summons to Defendant Michael P. Rama, # (5) Certification Plaintiff Certification)(O'Brien, Cullin)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 218 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?