CASTRO v. INS, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-02076-JAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PABLO ANDRES CASTRO, Petitioner
v.
No Logo C. J. DEROSA, Respondent
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
No Logo U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS. et al.,, Respondent
Office Newark
Filed 5/7/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Essex
Terminated 2/18/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Terminated Case
***Civil Case Terminated. (DD, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER on application to proceed IFP is DENIED, as it is incomplete.. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 2/13/04. (MD, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Petition Received
      Petition Received w/Appl to proceed ifp . (dr)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 4 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?