USA v. Herbalife Nutrition Ltd.
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-cr-00443-GHW

Tags
Last Updated October 7, 2020 at 11:07 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Arditi Naftalis +1 212 637 2310 +1 212 637 2527 joshua.naftalis@usdoj.gov
v.
Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. Herbalife Nutrition Ltd., Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/28/2020
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO VIOLATE THE BOOKS AND RECORDS PROVISIONS OF THE FOREIGN CORRUPT PRACTICES ACT
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 Waiver of Indictment
            WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Herbalife Nutrition Ltd.. (jm)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Exclude
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 information - felony
                INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                  Case Designated ECF as to Herbalife Nutrition Ltd.. (jm)
                    LREF
                    Blank  arraignment
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Defendant present (Henry Wang-General Counsel of Herbalife) with counsel Patrick Stokes, Esq. AUSAs Naftalis and Hartman are present with Jason manning (DOJ). Waiver of Indictment and Information filed. The Defendant waived detailed reading. Arraignment as to Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. (1) Count 1Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. (1) Count 1 held on 8/28/2020., Plea entered by Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. (1) Count 1 Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. (1) Count 1 Not Guilty in connection with a Deferred Prosecution Agreement. Plea entered by Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. (1) Count 1. Time is excluded from the Speedy Trial clock for 3 and a half years, February 27, 2024, in the interests of justice. (Court Reporter Mike McDDaniel) (jm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 Notice of Intent to File Information
                      NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Herbalife Nutrition Ltd.. (jm)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Space Space

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 136 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?