Nicole Wade, Jonathan Grunberg, Taylor Wilson, Wade, Grunberg & Wilson, LLC v. L. Linn Wood, L. Lin Wood, P.C.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of Fulton County, Case No. 2020CV339937

Tags
Last Updated September 2, 2020 at 2:40 PM DT (9.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Grunberg, Jonathan, Plaintiff
No Logo Wade, Grunberg & Wilson, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Wade, Nicole, Plaintiff
No Logo Wilson, Taylor, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo L. Lin Wood, PC, Defendant
No Logo Wood, L. Linn, Defendant
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None
ORDER
    Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None
    RESPONSE
      Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
        Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None
        MOTION
          Blank 71 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None
          JUDGMENT ORDER ON REMITTITUR
            Blank 70 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None
            SUPREME COURT REMITTITUR
              Blank 69 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None
              LEAVE OF ABSENCE
                Blank 68 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL
                  Blank 67 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None
                    NOTICE
                      Blank 65 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None
                      LEAVE OF ABSENCE
                        Blank 64 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None
                        LEAVE OF ABSENCE
                          Blank 63 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None
                          MOTION
                            Blank 62 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None
                            SUPREME COURT NOTICE OF DOCKETING
                              Blank 61 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                              MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                Blank 60 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                                BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
                                  Blank 59 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                                  STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
                                    Blank 58 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF FILING
                                      Blank 57 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT
                                        Blank 56 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT
                                          Blank 55 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT
                                            Blank 54 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF FILING
                                              Blank 53 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None
                                              COURT OF APPEALS ORDER
                                                Blank 52 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None
                                                MOTION TO STRIKE
                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER
                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION
                                                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None
                                                        HEARING TRANSCRIPT
                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None
                                                          HEARING TRANSCRIPT
                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None
                                                            HEARING TRANSCRIPT
                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
                                                                BRIEF
                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER
                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                    RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALS Party: DEFENDANT L. Lin Wood, P.C.; DEFENDANT Wood, L. Linn
                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                      APPELLATE INDEX Party: DEFENDANT L. Lin Wood, P.C.; DEFENDANT Wood, L. Linn
                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None
                                                                        COURT OF APPEALS NOTICE OF DOCKETING
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None
                                                                          RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALS Party: DEFENDANT L. Lin Wood, P.C.; DEFENDANT Wood, L. Linn
                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None
                                                                            APPELLATE INDEX Party: DEFENDANT L. Lin Wood, P.C.; DEFENDANT Wood, L. Linn
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION TRANSCRIPT
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                          RETURN RECEIPT OF CERT MAIL
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                            COST BILL PAID
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                COURT OF APPEALS ORDER
                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ORDER
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                    BRIEF IN OPPOSITION OF MOTION
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION
                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER
                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION
                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER
                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL
                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ORDER
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ORDER
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ORAL HEARING
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RULE NISI
                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                WAIVER
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CASE INITIATION FORM: CONTRACT
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION: Verified Complaint

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 798 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?