VILLEGAS v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-02975-JAG-GDH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DANILO VILLEGAS, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Respondent
Officially listed as "DEPT. OF JUSTICE"
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
No Logo INMATE SYSTEMS MANAGMENT, Respondent
No Logo JOHN D. ASHCROFT, Respondent
Office Newark
Filed 6/16/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Essex
Terminated 10/19/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 OpinionCourt Filing
OPINION fld.. Signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. on 10/18/04. (sr, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Terminated Case
    ***Civil Case Terminated. (sr, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER dismissing the first amended complt. for declaratory judgment and petition for mandamus and closing case . Signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. on 10/18/04. (nr, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Remark
        Partial payment fee as to DANILO VILLEGAS Receipt No. 334978 Amount Paid Today $52.08 Total Amount Paid to Date $150.00 (SA, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Remark
          Partial payment fee as to DANILO VILLEGAS Receipt No. 334440 Amount Paid Today $45.50 Total Amount Paid to Date $97.92 (SA, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Amended Complaint
            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN D. ASHCROFT, DEPT. OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION & NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INMATE SYSTEMS MANAGMENT , filed by DANILO VILLEGAS.(nr, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Remark
              Partial payment fee as to DANILO VILLEGAS Receipt No. 333099 Amount Paid Today $52.42 Total Amount Paid to Date $52.42(SA, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDERED that pla's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall file the complaint w/o prepayment of fees or security; Ordered that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order by regular mail upon the U.S. Attorney for the District of NJ and the Warden of the Federal Correctional Institution at Fort Dix; Ordered that pla. may file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies of his complaint within 45 days of the date this order is entered; Ordered that if pla. does not file an amended complaint within the 45-day period, the court will enter an order dismissing the complaint w/o prejudice and ordering the Clerk to close the Court's file for this action; Ordered that, the clerk shall notify pla. of the opportunity to apply in writing to the assigned Judge for the appointment of pro bono counsel; Ordered that pla is assessed a filing fee of $150.00 regardless the outcome of the litigation; Ordered that pla is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $52.42.. Signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. on 02/27/04. (ce, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 OpinionCourt Filing
                  OPINION . Signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. on 02/27/04. (ce, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against JOHN D. ASHCROFT, DEPT. OF JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION & NATURALIZATION SERVICE, INMATE SYSTEMS MANAGMENT (Filing fee $ ifp.) , filed by DANILO VILLEGAS.(ce, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Letter
                      LETTER By DANILO VILLEGAS submitting the proper papers in regard to his applciation for informa pauperis, regarding his account activity. etc. (cc: chambers)./ (JB) Modified on 08/04/2003
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDERED that, within 60 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff shall either remit the $150.00 filing fee or submit his institutional account statements for the period from January 2003 through June 2003; Ordered that, if pla. does not pay the filing fee or submit his institutional account statement within the 60 day period; pla's in forma pauperis application shall be denied and the complaint shall be deemed withdrawn ( signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. ) (NM) (ce)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Complaint Received
                          Complaint Received w/Appl to proceed ifp and Brief . (dr)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 9 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?