Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Healey
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-11572-NMG
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 23, 2021 at 4:41 PM DT (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Carroll +1 617 573 4800 +1 617 573 4822 James.Carroll@skadden.com
Space Anand S Raman +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 9023 anand.raman@skadden.com
Space Patrick George Rideout +1 212 735 2702 +1 917 777 3702 patrick.rideout@skadden.com
v.
No Logo Maura T. Healey, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 8/21/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Suffolk
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [12] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Carroll, James)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Notice requesting courtesy copy
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [13] Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Notice of appearance
          NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan T. Jarboe on behalf of Maura T. Healey (Jarboe, Brendan)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 memorandum in support of motion
            MEMORANDUM in Support re [12] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Maura T. Healey. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of AAG Diana Hooley)(Haskell, Eric)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Maura T. Healey.(Haskell, Eric)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                NOTICE of Appearance by Diana K. Hooley on behalf of Maura T. Healey (Hooley, Diana)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                  Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1] Complaint Maura T. Healey answer due 9/25/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020, Terminated: 9/14/2020 motion for extension of time to file answer
                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/25/20 to File Response/Reply as to [1] Complaint by Maura T. Healey.(Haskell, Eric) Modified on 9/14/2020 to fix event type (Vieira, Leonardo).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Haskell on behalf of Maura T. Healey (Haskell, Eric)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 summons returned executed
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Maura T. Healey served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Carroll, James)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING [3] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anand S. Raman and Patrick G. Rideout. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Summons issued
                            Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Notice of Case AssignmentCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020, Terminated: 8/24/2020 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anand S. Raman, Patrick G. Rideout Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8385197 by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) (Certification of Anand S. Raman), # (2) (Certification of Patrick G. Rideout))(Carroll, James)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Carroll, James)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against Maura T. Healey Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8385185 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Category Form)(Carroll, James)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 364 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?