Cauich v. Tesla, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG20071886

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:28 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cauich , Jannette, Plaintiff
No Logo Zapata, Gustavo, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Barry Esq, David N., Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/17/2022 09:00 AM D- 303
    Blank 17 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conf Continuance 04/04/2022 03:00 PM D- 20
      Blank 16 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
      Civil Jury Trial 04/11/2022 08:30 AM D- 20
        Blank 15 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Conf Continuance 02/14/2022 03:00 PM D- 20
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Conference Order Issued (4 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None ?
            Declaration of David N. Barry, Esq. Regarding Failure to Appear Filed (4 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc Filed (6 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc (12 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc Filed (6 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Conf Continuance 04/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 20
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc Filed (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                            Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Initial Case Management Conference 03/17/2021 03:00 PM D- 20 (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jannette Cauich (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (9 Pages)

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?