Buttinger v. Tesla INC
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20070011

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Buttinger, Janice, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Koss, Richard N, Attorney
No Logo Svanfeldt, Jennifer P., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None ?
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Vacate Order Stay Proceedings Filed (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None ?
    Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Vacate Order Staying Proceedings (5 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 13 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None ?
      Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Hearing Confirmed for 04/02/2021 09:00 AM D- 20
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None ?
        Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Filed (68 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None ?
          Notice of Entry of Order Filed (27 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 10 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None ?
            Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/17/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Granted (23 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Tesla INC (11 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla INC Filed (3 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Initial Case Management Conference 01/20/2021 03:00 PM D- 20 (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Janice Buttinger (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Complaint - Other Employment Filed (13 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?