Gevarges v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20070850

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gevarges, David, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Freiman, Michael, Attorney
No Logo Wasserman, Helene, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Wrongful Termination
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conf Continuance 05/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 22
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ?
        Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ?
          Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None ?
            Proof of Service By E-Mail Filed (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (5 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 17 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 22 date: 02/18/2021 time: 02:30 PM
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Reply Filed (6 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (4 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Rejection Letter Issued on Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 01/21/2021 02:30 PM D- 22
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (60 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration q Filed (21 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc. (9 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Initial Case Management Conference 02/23/2021 02:30 PM D- 22 (2 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Proof of Service Filed (2 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed (9 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for David Gevarges (3 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?