Ahumada v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20071491

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ahumada, Mariano, Plaintiff
No Logo Pinedo, Lorena, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Aberle Concrete, Defendant
No Logo Aberle Concrete Excavating And Grading, Inc's, Defendant
No Logo Exacavating & Grading, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safety Compliance Management, Inc., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Aberle Concret Excavating And Grading, Inc., Cross Complainant
No Logo Aberle Concrete Excavating And Grading, Inc's, Cross Complainant
No Logo Aberle Concrete Excavating And Grading, Inc's, Cross Defendant
No Logo Davis, Jonathan E., Attorney
No Logo Donald, James Scott, Attorney
No Logo Goldberg, Lori, Attorney
No Logo Meyer Jr., Raymond, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other PI/PD/WD Tort
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
Answer to Complaint Filed for Safety Compliance Management, Inc. (12 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
    Answer to Complaint Filed for Safety Compliance Management, Inc. (12 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None ?
      Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
        Proof of Service Filed (5 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?
          Summons on Cross Complaint Issued (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?
            Cross-Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc. (11 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None ?
              Notice of Lien of Lien Claimant Pursuant to Labor Code 3850-3865; Request to be Placed on Proof of S (4 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed (3 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Answer to Complaint Filed for Safety Compliance Management, Inc. (9 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Answer to Complaint Filed for Aberle Concrete Excavating And Grading, Inc's (7 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Cross-Complaint Filed for Aberle Concrete Excavating And Grading, Inc's (20 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Cross-Complaint Filed for Aberle Concret Excavating and Grading, Inc. (18 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc. (7 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aberle Concrete Filed (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Initial Case Management Conference 07/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 15 (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mariano Ahumada (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (12 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?