Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc. v. Binance Holdings Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-06445-MMC
District Judge Maxine M. Chesney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2021 at 12:44 PM EDT (4.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Elliott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Horne Cooper, Jr. +1 614 481 6000 +1 614 481 6001 chipc@cooperelliott.com
Space Charles Benjamin Cooper +1 614 481 6000 +1 614 481 6001 benc@cooperelliott.com
Space Rex H Elliott +1 614 481 6000 +1 614 481 6001 rexe@cooperelliott.com
Space BARTON RYAN KEYES +1 614 481 6000 +1 614 481 6001 bartk@cooperelliott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Edelson McGuire LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lily E. Hough +1 415 212 9300 lhough@edelson.com
v.
Binance Holdings Limited Binance Holdings Limited, Defendant
Officially listed as "Binance Holdings Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter R. Boutin +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 peter.boutin@kyl.com
Space Christopher A. Stecher +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 christopher.stecher@kyl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roberto Gonzalez +1 202 223 7316 rgonzalez@paulweiss.com
Space Karen R. King +1 212 373 3784 +1 212 492 0784 kking@paulweiss.com
Space THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 9/14/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $9400000
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Outside US
Terminated 1/19/2021
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021 Notice of voluntary dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SPECIALLY-APPEARING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Defendant shall file its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by January 20, 2021. Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss shall be due February 19, 2021. Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition shall be due March 11, 2021. The deadline to meet and confer and file an ADR Certification is continued to March 18, 2021. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from March 12, 2021, to April 30, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
      Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re [33] Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,, Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 4/30/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020, Terminated: 12/18/2020 stipulation
        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [1] Complaint (Extension of Time to Respond) filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of K. King)(Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 12/17/2020) Modified on 12/17/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Roberto J. Gonzalez is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Theodore V. Wells, Jr. is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Karen R. King is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020, Terminated: 12/15/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15318536.) filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (King, Karen) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020, Terminated: 12/15/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15318519.) filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Wells, Theodore) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020, Terminated: 12/15/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15318498.) filed by Binance Holdings Ltd.. (Gonzalez, Roberto) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Notice of appearance
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Stecher Notice of Appearance of Appearance of Christopher A. Stecher on behalf of Specially Appearance Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd. (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Notice of appearance
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Boutin Notice of Appearance of Peter R. Boutin on Behalf of Specially Appearing Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd. (Boutin, Peter) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Affidavit of Service
                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on 1 on 11/30/2020, filed by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE SCHEDULE. The deadline to meet and confer and file an ADR Certification is continued from November 27, 2020, to February 19, 2021. The deadline to file a 26(f) Report, complete initial disclosures, and file a Case Management Statement is continued from December 11, 2020, to March 5, 2021. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from December 18, 2020, to March 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                              Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re [22] Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 3/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020, Terminated: 12/1/2020 Motion to Continue
                                MOTION to Continue Case Schedule; [Proposed] Order filed by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of C. Benjamin Cooper)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Clerks Notice
                                  CLERK'S NOTICE - DECEMBER 18, 2020 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel participating in the conference call are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings, counsel are directed to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fisco Digital Asset Group aka Fisco Digital Asset Group Co., Ltd. for Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Rex H. Elliott is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Charles H. Cooper is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Barton R. Keyes is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of C. Benjamin Cooper is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020, Terminated: 10/1/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice C. Benjamin Cooper ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15005472.) filed by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020, Terminated: 10/1/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Barton R. Keyes ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15005296.) filed by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Keyes, Barton) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/30/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020, Terminated: 10/1/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Charles H. Cooper, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15005257.) filed by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020, Terminated: 10/1/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Rex Elliott ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15005114.) filed by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Elliott, Rex) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                        Case REASSIGNED to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 Order Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ)Court Filing
                                                          This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc... (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Summons issued
                                                                Summons Issued as to Binance Holdings Ltd.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                    Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Binance Holdings Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14938719.). Filed byFisco Cryptocurrency Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Hough, Lily) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?