Tesla, Inc. et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Administrative Proceeding Court of International Trade, Case No. 1:20-cv-03142-N/A

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2020 at 12:16 PM DT (7.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARK A MORGAN, Plaintiff
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry David Almond +1 202 942 5698 +1 202 942 5999 henry.almond@apks.com
v.
No Logo Robert E. Lighthizer, Defendant
United States Customs & Border Protection United States Customs & Border Protection, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Customs and Border Protection"
No Logo Us Trade Representative, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Office New York
Filed 9/21/2020
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020 Dismissal 41(a)(1)(A)(i)
Order entered on 9/30/2020, 41(a)(1)(A)(i) dismissal entered (related document(s)[5]).(Taronji, Steve)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020, Terminated: 9/30/2020 Form 07A Notice of Dismissal 41(a)(1)(A)(i)
    Form 7A notice of dismissal pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(i) . Filed by Henry David Almond of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP on behalf of Tesla, Inc..(Almond, Henry)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement
      Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Henry David Almond of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP on behalf of Tesla, Inc.. (Almond, Henry)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Form 05 Information Statement
        Form 5 Information Statement . Filed by Henry David Almond of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP on behalf of Tesla, Inc.. (Almond, Henry)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Complaint (1581d-i only)
          Complaint and certificate of service against Robert E. Lighthizer, Mark A. Morgan, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Trade Representative, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Answer due by 11/20/2020. Filed by Henry David Almond of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP on behalf of Tesla, Inc..(Almond, Henry)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Summons
            Summons . Filed by Henry David Almond of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP on behalf of Tesla, Inc.. (Almond, Henry)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 890 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?