Doe I v. The Gap, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Northern Mariana Islands District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00031

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 6:35 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Doe I, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726

Toggle Switch Represented by Civille and Tang, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Patrick Civille +1 671 472 8868 +1 671 472 2601 pciville@guamattorneys.com
Space Joyce C.H. Tang +1 671 472 8868 +1 671 477 2511 jtang@guamattorneys.com
No Logo Doe II, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe IV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe IX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe V, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe VI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe VII, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe VIII, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
No Logo Doe X, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Teker +1 670 235 1725 +1 670 235 1726
v.
Abercrombie & Fitch Company Abercrombie & Fitch Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Goldberg +1 670 664 2338 +1 670 664 2349
No Logo Advance Textile Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo American Pacific Textile, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo Brooks Brothers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cades Schutte LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Clifton +5219 521 521 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Brylane, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com
No Logo Commonwealth Garment Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo Concorde Garment Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven P Pixley +1 670 233 2898 +1 670 233 4716
No Logo Cutter & Buck Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Dayton Hudson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. McCorriston
No Logo Diorva Saipan Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reynaldo O Yana, Esq. +1 670 234 6529 +1 670 234 8969
No Logo Donna Karan International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Express Manufacturing, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo Global Manufacturing Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven P Pixley +1 670 233 2898 +1 670 233 4716
No Logo Grace International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith and Williams, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vicente T Salas +1 670 234 7455 +1 670 234 7256 vts@pticom.com
No Logo Hansae (Saipan), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo J Crew Group Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo JC Penney Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN H. KUSMISS, ESQ. +1 670 234 1414 +1 670 234 1417

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
No Logo Jones Apparel Group, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, MSC Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Maxwell Shoe Co Inc
Officer/Director, Barneys New York, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Joo Ang Apparel, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reynaldo O Yana, Esq. +1 670 234 6529 +1 670 234 8969
No Logo Lane Bryant, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Goldberg +1 670 664 2338 +1 670 664 2349
No Logo Levi Strauss & Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee T. Nakamura

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith and Williams, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E. Clifford +1 670 235 8846 +1 670 235 8848 tomclifford@pticom.com
No Logo Liz Clairborne, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Mariana Fashions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo Marianas Garment Manufacturing, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo Michigan, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, Inc. (Rifu Corporation), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo Mirage (Saipan), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo N.E.T. Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo Neo Fashion Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo Net Apparel Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo Nordstrom, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Onwel Manufacturing Saipan, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
Oshkosh Oshkosh, Defendant
Officially listed as "Oshkosh B'Gosh Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Pang Jin Sang Sa Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo Phillips-Van Heusen Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
Polo Ralph Lauren Polo Ralph Lauren, Defendant
Officially listed as "Polo Ralph Lauren, Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo Sako Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian W. McMahon +1 670 234 9314 +1 670 234 9316
Sears, Roebuck & Company Sears, Roebuck & Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
Target Corporation Target Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. McCorriston

Toggle Switch Represented by itecnmi.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perry B. Inos +1 670 235 9006 +1 670 235 9007 perryinos@aol.com
No Logo The Associated Merchandising Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. McCorriston

Toggle Switch Represented by itecnmi.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perry B. Inos +1 670 235 9006 +1 670 235 9007 perryinos@aol.com
No Logo The Dress Barn, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
Gap, Inc. Gap, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Gap, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Fitzgerald +1 670 234 7241 +1 670 234 7530 fitzgerald.law@gmail.com
No Logo The Gymboree Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Sylvester +1 808 389 8417 tomsyl22@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo The Limited, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Goldberg +1 670 664 2338 +1 670 664 2349
No Logo The May Department Stores Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Crystal K. Rose

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlsmith Ball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Osborn +1 670 322 3455 +1 670 322 3368 josborn@carlsmith.com
No Logo The Talbots, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Pepper

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith and Williams, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brien Sers Nicholas +6 702 357 1901 +1 670 235 7192 bsnlaw@pticom.com
No Logo Tommy Hilfiger U.s.a., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Renton L.K. Nip +5660 566 566 0999
No Logo Top Fashion Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Dotts +1 670 234 5684 +1 670 234 5683 attorneys@saipan.com
No Logo Trans-Asia Garment Forte Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven P Pixley +1 670 233 2898 +1 670 233 4716
No Logo United International Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo Uno Moda Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rexford C. Kosack +1 670 322 8800 +1 670 322 7800 rex.kosack@kosacklaw.com
No Logo US-CNMI Development Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith and Williams, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric S. Smith +1 670 233 3334 +1 670 233 3336 smithandwilliams@pticom.com
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James H. Hershey
No Logo Warnaco Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Douglas Ing
No Logo Winners Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor Berman Dotts & Banes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard W. Pierce +1 670 235 3425 +1 670 235 3427 rwpierce@saipan.com
No Logo Woolrich, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howell C. Mette
Office NMI
Filed 6/4/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Northern Mariana Islands
Terminated 12/31/2003
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Cases
101-cv-00036, 101-cv-00037
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (1250) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving Distribution of Garment Residual Charitable Funds and Progress Report on Resolution of Tax Matter. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 05/05/2014. (DPB ) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
    REPORT by Garment Oversight Board / Garment Residual Charitable Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copies of Checks with Financial Info. redacted) (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1253 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
      First MOTION Approval of Interim Fees and Costs and Interim Accounting Garment Residual Charitable Fund Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Defendant The Gap, Inc. (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1246 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER 1245 1. Approving Final Report of Trustees; 2. Relieving Trustees of Further Duties; and, 3. Closing File. Signed by Senior Judge Alex R. Munson on 06/04/2010. (TVW) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION Final Report of Garment Workers Trust Fund Trustees and Motion to be Relieved as Trustees Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A and B) (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION Interim Report Confirming Disbursement of Trust Funds Pursuant to Previous Order of This Court Entered on January 15th, 2010 Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1243 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Denying 1242 ExParte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injuction. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 1/29/2010. (TVW) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Approving 1240 Disbursement of Trust Funds Pursuant to Recommendation of Garment Worker Trust Fund Trustees and Accounting of Trust Funds and Fourth Interim Request for for Approval of Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 01/15/2010. (TVW) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                  MOTION Request to Approve Proposed Disbursement of Trust Funds Pursuant to Recommendation of Garment Worker Trust Fund Trustees and Accounting of Trust Funds and Fourth Interim Request for Approval of Fees and Expenses Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1239 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER Approving 1236 Accounting of Trust Funds and Third Interim Request for Attorneys Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 12/04/2009. (TVW) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1238 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Alex R. Munson: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2009 re 1236 Request to Aprrove Disbursement of Trust Funds Pursuant to Recommendation of Garment Workers Trust Fund Trustees and Accounting of Trust Funds and Third Interim Request for Approval of Fees and Expenses filed by Garment Oversight Board. Court Granted the Motion. (Court Reporter PAG) (TPM) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        HEARING in Request to Approve Proposed Disbursement of Trust Funds Pursuant to Recommendation of Garment Worker Trustees and Accounting of Trust Funds and Third Interim Request for Approval of Fees and Expenses. Motion Hearing is set for 12/3/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom before Chief Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 11/24/2009. (TVW) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION Request to Aprrove Disbursement of Trust Funds Pursuant to Recommendation of Garment Workers Trust Fund Trustees and Accounting of Trust Funds and Third Interim Request for Approval of Fees and Expenses Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to D) (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Approving Accounting and 1234 Second Interim Request for Approval of Fees and Expenses and Accounting of Trust Funds for Garment Worker Trust Fund. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 08/06/09. (ACH) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                              Second MOTION Second Interim Request for Approval of Fees and Expenses and Accounting of Trust Funds for Garment Worker Trust Fund Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Approving Accounting and First 1225 Interim Request for Attorney Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 05/01/2009. (TVW) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1232 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                  First MOTION First Interim Request for Approval of Fees and Expenses and Accounting of Trust Funds for Garment Worker Trust Fund Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER Granting Motion to be Appointed Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 2/27/09. (ACH) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1230 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Alex R. Munson: Status Hearing held on 2/27/2009. (Court Reporter PAG) (ACH) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1229 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT filed by all plaintiffs re 1228 Order, Set Hearings Notice of Telephonic Hearing. (Tang, Joyce) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Finances of GWTF and Appointment of Attorney. Status Hearing is set for 2/27/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom before Chief Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 02/13/2009. (TVW) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                            REPORT by Garment Oversight Board of Transfer of Funds to GWTF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER Approving "Interim Accounting Upon Closure of the Garment Oversight Board and Proposed Plan for Caretaker Operations Post Closing and Trust Fund". Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 12/18/08. (ACH) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                Interim MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement, MOTION Interim Accounting Upon Closure of the Garment Oversight Board and Proposed Plan for Caretaker Operations Post Closing and Trust Fund Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Bellas, Timothy) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1224 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER Granting Fourth [1223] Motion for Final Extension of GOB Term. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 07/21/08. (ACH)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1223 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Fourth MOTION Final Application for Extension of GOB Term Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Timothy H. Bellas in Support of Garment Oversight Board Final Application for Extension of Term) (Bellas, Timothy)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1222 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER Approving [1217] Plan of Garment Oversight Board for Distribution of Residual Funds. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 1/22/08. (TPM)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1221 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Granting Claim Administrator's [1213] Request for Payment of Settlement-Related Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 1/18/2008. (TPM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1220 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Third ORDER Extending Term of Garment Oversight Board. Signed by Chief Judge Alex R. Munson on 1/15/08. (ACH)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1219 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Alex R. Munson: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2008 re [1217] First MOTION Approval of Distribution Plan. (Court Reporter SNS) (ACH)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1218 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV re [1214] Order,, Set Hearings, of Telephonic Hearing (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1217 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 1/22/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                First MOTION Approval of Distribution Plan by GOB Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Summary Accounting of Funds On Hand, # (2) Exhibit B -Garment Workers Trust Fund, # (3) Supplement Suggestion on Date of Hearing; Request to Appear Telephonically) (Bellas, Timothy)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1216 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER Granting [1215] Second Motion for Extension of Term. Extension of Term Granted up to and including 3/31/2008. Signed by U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson on 12/10/07. (TPM)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1215 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007, Terminated: 12/10/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Second MOTION Extension of GOB term to March 31, 2008 Timothy H. Bellas appearing for Interested Party Garment Oversight Board (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Timothy H. Bellas) (Bellas, Timothy)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1214 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Rescheduling Hearing re [1213] REPORT by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV Request for Payment of Claims Administrator's Remaining Outstanding Invoices for Settlement-Related Fees and Expenses; Declaration of Keith F. Park, Declaration of Dennis A. Gilardi. Hearing set for 12/27/2007 is rescheduled to 1/10/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson on 11/30/07. (ACH)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1213 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2008 Report
                                                                        REPORT by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV Request for Payment of Claims Administrator's Remaining Outstanding Invoices for Settlement-Related Fees and Expenses; Declaration of Keith F. Park, Declaration of Dennis A. Gilardi. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement, # (2) Supplement, # (3) Supplement, # (4) Supplement, # (5) Supplement, # (6) Supplement, # (7) Supplement, # (8) Supplement) (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1212 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Regarding Reduction of Withheld Tax Reserve - Garment Oversight Hearing (status hearing)set for 10/4/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 9/28/07. (ACH)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1211 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Amended Document
                                                                          AMENDED DOCUMENT by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV. Amendment to [1207] Report, [1210] Letter, [1208] Status Conference, Set Hearings [Proposed] Order Regarding Reduction of Withheld Tax Reserve. (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1210 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Letter
                                                                            Letter from Pamela Parker. (ACH)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1209 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER After Status Conference. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 9/27/07. (ACH)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1208 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alex R. Munson : Garment Oversight Hearing held on 9/27/2007. Status Conference set for 10/4/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. (Court Reporter SNS.) (ACH)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1207 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Report
                                                                                  REPORT by all plaintiffs in support of [1205] Order, Set Hearings, [1203] Order, [1202] Order,, Set Hearings,, [1204] Stipulation MARIANAS SETTLEMENT FUND REPORT REGARDING POTENTIAL TAX PENALTIES AND THE WITHHELD TAX RESERVE. (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1206 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    NOTICE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1205 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Rescheduling / Setting Status Hearing - Status Hearing set for 9/14/2007 is rescheduled to 9/27/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 9/14/07. (ACH)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1204 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                        STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV. (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1203 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER After Status Conference. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 7/13/07. (ACH)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1202 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re [1201] Stipulation to Continue Status Conference - Status Conference set for 7/06/2007 is vacated and the next status conference is scheduled for 9/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 7/6/07. (ACH)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1201 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                              STIPULATION re [1199] Order, Set Hearings to Continue Status Conference by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV. (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1200 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV re [1199] Order, Set Hearings of Telephonic Hearing (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1199 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Status Hearing - Status Hearing set for 7/6/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 7/3/07. (ACH)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1198 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alex R. Munson: Status Hearing held on 6/12/2007. (Court Reporter SNS) (TPM)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1197 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Report
                                                                                                      REPORT by all plaintiffs in support of [1194] Order, Set Hearings to Court Regarding Settlement Administration Per Court's May 23, 2007 Order, And Request for Reimbursement of Claim Administrator's Costs. (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1196 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV re [1194] Order, Set Hearings of Telephonic Hearing (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1195 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Proof of ServiceCourt Filing
                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Law Office of Timothy Bellas re [1194] ORDER for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 6/12/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Served upon Pamela Parker, keith Parks, Michael Rubin, Robert O'Connor, Richard Pierce, Colin Thompson, Glenn Jewell, and Joyce Tang. (ACH)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1194 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 6/12/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 5/23/2007. (TPM)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1193 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Regarding Check Distribution Issues. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 11/22/2006. (TPM)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1192 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alex R. Munson : Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2006 re [1187] MOTION Directions from Court filed by United International Corporation. (Court Reporter SNS.) (ACH)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1191 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Report
                                                                                                                  REPORT by all plaintiffs OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL ON CHECK DISTRIBUTION ISSUES AND RESPONSE TO FACTORIES' REQUESTS FOR GUIDANCE. (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1190 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV OF TELEPHONIC HEARING (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1189 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006, Terminated: 11/22/2006 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Joinder In Request for Guidance on Letters Received filed by Marianas Garment Manufacturing, Inc., Hansae (Saipan), Inc., Mirage (Saipan), Inc., Top Fashion Corporation, Commonwealth Garment Manufacturing Corporation, Michigan, Inc., Onwel Manufacturing Saipan, Inc.. (Horey, Joseph)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1188 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on [1187] Request for Guidance on Letters Received: Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2006 08:30 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 10/25/26. (ACH)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1187 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006, Terminated: 11/22/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                          MOTION Directions from Court filed by United International Corporation. (Pierce, Richard)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1186 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER After Status Conference. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 10/3/2006. (TPM)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1185 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alex R. Munson: Status Conference held on 9/29/2006. (Court Reporter SNS) (TPM)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1184 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE re [1181] ORDER Continuing Status Conference. Served upon Pamela Parker, Lisa Poncia, and Michael Rubin. (ACH)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1183 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Doe I, Doe II, Doe III, Doe V, Doe VI, Doe VII, Doe VIII, Doe IX, Doe X, Doe IV OF TELEPHONIC HEARING (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1182 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Report
                                                                                                                                    REPORT by all plaintiffs of Status of Distribution of Settlement Payments. (Tang, Joyce)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1181 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Continuing Status Conference. Status Conference set for 9/29/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 9/1/06. (TPM)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1180 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alex R. Munson : Status Conference held on 8/30/2006. Status Conference set for 9/29/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. (Court Reporter SNS.) (MCM)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1179 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting [1178] Request for Approval of Reserve Fund, Pursuant to Order of September 9, 2004. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 8/11/06. (TPM)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1178 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 8/11/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            MOTION Request for Approval of Reserve Fund Pursuant to Sept 9, 2004 Order filed by all plaintiffs. (Civille, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1177 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER After Status Conference - Status Conference set for 8/30/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 06/14/06. (ACH)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1176 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Relating to Withheld MFN Funds. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 6/12/2006. (TPM)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1175 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alex R. Munson : Status Conference held on 6/6/2006. (Court Reporter SNS)(TPM)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1174 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing, filed by all plaintiffs. (TPM)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1173 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE of Status Conference. Status Conference Rescheduled from 6/6/2006 04:30 PM to 6/6/2006 09:30 AM in Chambers before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 6/1/2006. (TPM)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1172 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Report
                                                                                                                                                        SETTLEMENT FUND Accounting Per Court's March 29, 2006 [1169] Order, filed by Does I, et al. Confidential-Filed Under Seal, For In Camera Review Only. (TPM)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1171 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing, filed by Does I, et al. (TPM)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1170 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Continuance of Status Conference - Status Conference set for 5/24/2006 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled to 6/6/2006 at 4:30 PM in Chambers before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 05/23/06. (ACH)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1169 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER for Status Conference - Status Conference set for 5/24/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom before U.S. District Judge Alex R. Munson. Signed by Judge Alex R. Munson on 03/29/06. (ACH)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1168 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Rerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP. (ACH)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1167 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Name Change (as to Civille & Tang); [ACH EOD 05/20/2005] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1734-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1166 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Firm Address (Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 12/14/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1733-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1165 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Report to Court on Status of Settlement Administration; [MCM EOD 09/10/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1732-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1164 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Name (Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 09/01/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1731-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1163 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT Of Proceeding (Status Report on Setttlement Administration Hearing; August 13, 2004 at 8:35 a.m.); [TTP EOD 08/20/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1730-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1162 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 08/16/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1729-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1161 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Firm Name (Lerach Coughlin Stoia & Robbins LLP has Changed its Name to Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 08/16/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1728-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1160 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY 8:30 a.m. DOES I, et al vs. THE GAP INC., et al PRESENT: Hon., Alex R. Munson, Chief Judge Presiding Sanae Shmull, Court Reporter Peggy Campbell, Law Clerk K. Lynn Lemieux, Courtroom Deputy Joyce Tang, Attorney for Plaintiffs Pamela Parker, Attorney for Plaintiffs Michael Rubin, Attorney for Plaintiffs (via telephone) Joseph Horey, Attorney for Defendants Robert O'Connor, Attorney for Defendant PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON STATUS REPORT Attorney Pamela Parker was present on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Robert O'Connor and Joseph Horey appeared for Defendants. Also appearing on the phone were Elle Chaseton, Kim Wagner, Tony Selyem, Ron Heard, and Ana Salazar. Attorney Parker reported to the Court on the distribution progress. Adjourned at 8:50 a.m. ; [KLL EOD 08/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1727-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1159 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 08/12/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1726-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1158 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBSTITUTION of Counsel for Defendants Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, Inc. (NKA RIFU Corp.); Winners Corp; United International Corp., and NET Apparal Company; [MCM EOD 08/06/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1725-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1157 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Re Telephone Conference (Request for Telephone Participation in the Hearing Scheduled for Friday, August 13, 2004 at 8:30 a.m.); [TTP EOD 08/05/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1724-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1156 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Telephonic Participation in August 13, 2004 Conference; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 08/04/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1723-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1155 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 07/23/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1722-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1154 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFFS' Report to Court on Status of Settlement Administration; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 07/07/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1721-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1153 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation (Counsel for Plaintiffs, Formerly with Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP, now affiliated with Lerach Coughlin Stoia & Robins LLP); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 05/10/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1720-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1152 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER on Distribution of Disallowed Attorney Costs; [TTP EOD 03/03/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1719-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1151 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Re: Information to Properly Calculate Refund; [MGM EOD 02/20/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1718-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1150 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER from the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Dismissing Case per Stipulation of Parties; [MGM EOD 02/20/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1717-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1149 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF of Service; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [MGM EOD 02/18/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1716-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1148 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service of: (CONVERTED TO PDF FOR CMECF CONVERSION 7/23/2005 5:48AM) (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1715-2) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1147 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service of "STATEMENT of the early settlers group re: distribution of disallowed costs"; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1714-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1146 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Tommy Hilfiger USA, Inc. in reponse to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT Tommy Hilfiger Usa, Inc. [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1713-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1145 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of defendant The Gymboree Corporation, J. Crew Group, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., and Cutter & Buck, Inc. in reponse to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1712-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1144 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Sears Reobuck & Company in reponse to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT Sears Roebuck & Company [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1711-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1143 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of defendant Jones Apparel Group Inc. in reponse to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT Jones Apparel Group, Inc. [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1710-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1142 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of defendant Oshkosh B'Gosh, Inc. in reponse to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT Oshkosh B'gosh Inc. [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1709-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1141 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of defendant Liz Claiborne Inc. in reponse to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT Liz Clairborne, Inc. [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1708-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1140 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of defendant The May Department Stores Co. in reponse to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1707-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1139 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of defendants Brylane L.P., Donna Karan International, Inc., Polo Ralph Lauren Corp., Phillips-Van Heusen Corp., Brooks Brothers, Inc. and Calvin Klein, Inc. in response to the courts order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT Brylane, L.p., DFT Donna Karan Inter [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1706-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1138 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of defendant The Dress Barn Inc. in response to the court's order of January 21, 2004.; Filed by: DFT The Dress Barn, Inc. [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1705-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1137 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of the early settlers group re: distribution of disallowed costs; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1704-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1136 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT of contribution to settlement by the September 2002 settling defendants.; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [MGM EOD 03/02/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1703-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1135 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT re: contribution to settlement fund; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [MGM EOD 02/13/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1702-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1134 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Motion for Clarification; [TTP EOD 02/04/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1701-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1133 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF of Service; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 02/02/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1700-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1132 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Clarification; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT Hansae (saipan), Inc., DFT Mirage (saipan), Inc., DFT Top Fashion Corporation, DFT Commonwealth Garment Manufacturing Corporation, DFT Michigan, Inc., DFT Onwel Manufacturing Saipan, Inc., DFT N.E.T. Corporation, DFT Mariana Fashions, Inc. [TTP EOD 01/28/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1699-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1131 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [TTP EOD 01/23/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1698-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1130 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of Service "Position of the Late Settlers Re Refund of Disallowed Costs" on January 22, 2004; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 01/23/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1697-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1129 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on Distribution of $912,348.03 Refund; [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1696-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1128 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                POSITION of the Late Settlers Re Refund of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1695-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1127 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Jones Apparel Group, Inc. in Response to the Court's Order of December 31, 2003; Filed by: DFT Jones Apparel Group, Inc. [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1694-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1126 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of The May Department Stores Co. in Response to the Court's Order of December 31, 2003; Filed by: DFT The May Department Stores Company [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1693-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1125 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Certain Settling Defendants in Response to the Court's Order of December 31, 2003; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1692-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1124 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT OF CERTAIN SETTLING DEFENDANTS IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF DECEMBER 31, 2003; Filed by: DFT Brylane, L.p., DFT Brooks Brothers, [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1691-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1123 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Liz Claiborne, Inc. in Response to the Court's Order of December 31, 2003; Filed by: DFT Liz Clairborne, Inc. [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1690-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1122 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Oshkosh B'Gosh in Response to the Court's Order of December 31, 2003; Filed by: DFT Oshkosh B'gosh Inc. [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1689-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1121 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of The Dress Barn, Inc. Re: Refund of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT The Dress Barn, Inc. [TTP EOD 01/21/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1688-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1120 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT on Distribution of the $912,348.03 Refund Monies; [TTP EOD 01/15/2004] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1687-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1119 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Remaining Claims, Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(ii); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 12/31/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1686-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1118 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER on Defendants' Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; [MCM EOD 12/31/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1685-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1117 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY 9:15 (CONVERTED TO PDF FOR CMECF CONVERSION 7/23/2005 5:48AM) (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1684-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1116 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1683-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1115 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1682-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1114 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1681-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1113 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1680-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1112 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1679-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1111 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1678-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1110 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1677-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1109 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1676-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1108 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; [MCM EOD 12/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1675-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1107 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance (Ellen R. Nadler); Filed by: DFT Liz Clairborne, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/16/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1674-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1106 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance (Antonio R. Sarabia II); Filed by: DFT The Gymboree Corporation [TTP EOD 12/16/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1673-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1105 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance (Stephen Hasegawa); Filed by: DFT J. Crew Group, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/16/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1672-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1104 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance (Rudy A. Englund); Filed by: DFT Nordstrom Inc. [TTP EOD 12/16/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1671-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1103 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance (Guy N. Halgren); Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/16/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1670-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1102 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance (Joel W. Sternman); Filed by: DFT Brylane, L.p., DFT Donna Karan International, Inc., DFT Polo Ralph Lauren, Corporation, DFT Phillips-van Heusen Corporation, DFT Brooks Brothers, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/16/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1669-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1101 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance (Robert V. Kuenzel and Ken Downs); Filed by: DFT The Dress Barn, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/16/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1668-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1100 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service "Request of Dress Barn to Join in Refund; Filed by: DFT The Dress Barn, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/15/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1667-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1099 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST of Defendant The Dress Barn, Inc. to Join in Refund; Filed by: DFT The Dress Barn, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/15/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1666-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1098 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE Of Svc of "MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in response to briefs filed by plaintiff and other settling defendants"; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [MGM EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1665-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1097 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in response to briefs filed by plaintiff and other settling defendant; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MGM EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1664-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1096 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE Of Svc that copy of "NOTICE of supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses"; "SUPPLEMENTAL application for reimbursement of expenses"; "MEMORANDUM in support of supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses and in partial opposition to defendants' motion for return of disallowed costs"; "DECLARATION of Michael Rubin filed on behalf of Altshuler, Berzon, Nassbaum, Rubin, and Demain, in support application for award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses"; "DECLARATION of Keith F. Park in support of supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses and in partial opposition to defendants' motion for return of disallowed costs"; "IN CAMERA submission of expense detail in support of plaintiffs' counsel's supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses"; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MGM EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1663-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1095 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE Of Svc that copy of "NOTICE of supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses"; "SUPPLEMENTAL application for reimbursement of expenses"; "MEMORANDUM in support of supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses and in partial opposition to defendants' motion for return of disallowed costs"; "DECLARATION of Michael Rubin filed on behalf of Altshuler, Berzon, Nassbaum, Rubin, and Demain, in support application for award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses"; "DECLARATION of Keith F. Park in support of supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses and in partial opposition to defendants' motion for return of disallowed costs"; "IN CAMERA submission of expense detail in support of plaintiffs' counsel's supplemental application for reimbursement of expenses"; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MGM EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1662-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1094 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1661-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1093 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service "1. Notice of Motion for Approval of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Remaining Claims 2. Motion for Approval of Stipulation Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Remaining Claims 3. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Approval of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Remaining Claims"; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1660-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1092 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service "1. Notice of Telephonic Hearing 2. Plaintiff' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Partial Opposition..."; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1659-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1091 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Response to Motions of Brylane Group and Other Prior-Settling Defendants for Refunds of Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1658-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1090 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Supplemental Application for Reimbursement of Expenses; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 12/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1657-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1089 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF of Service upon Lawrence J. Teker, Esq. and John D. Osborn, Esq. "Response to 1.) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Application for Reimbursement of Expenses; 2.) MFN Defendants' Motion for Refund on December 4, 2003; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 12/10/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1656-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1088 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Gregory S. Gilchrist in Support of Levi Strauss & Co.'s Joinder in Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [TTP EOD 12/10/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1655-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1087 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER Levi Strauss & Co.'s Joinder in Motion to Dismiss (Hearing on December 18, 2003 at 9:00 a.m.); Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [TTP EOD 12/10/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1654-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1086 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Shortening Time to Hear Motion for Refund on 12/18/03 @ 9am; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1653-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1085 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Ex Parte Motion under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1652-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1084 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Ex Parte Motion under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1651-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1083 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE Motion under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1650-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1082 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Shortening time to Hear Motion for Refund on 12/18/03 @ 9am; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1649-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1081 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Ex Parte Motion under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1648-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1080 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Ex Parte Motion under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1647-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1079 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE Motion under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1646-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1078 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Shortening Time to Hear Motion for Refund on 12/18/03 @ 9am; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1645-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1077 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Ex Parte Motion Under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1644-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1076 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Ex Parte Motion under Local Rule 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for an order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1643-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1075 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE Motion Under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for Order Shortening Time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1642-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1074 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Shortening Time to Hear Motion for Refund on 12/18/03; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1641-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1073 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Ex Parte Motion Under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for Order Shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1640-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1072 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Ex Parte Motion Under Local Rule 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for an order shortening time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1639-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1071 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE Motion Under Local Rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for Order Shortening Time; [MCM EOD 12/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1638-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1070 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Defendant Brooks Brothers, Inc.'s Motion for Refund; Filed by: DFT Brooks Brothers, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/05/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1637-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1069 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Defendant Calvin Klein, Inc.'s Motion for Refund; [TTP EOD 12/05/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1636-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1068 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE To: 1) Plaintiff's Supplemental Application for Reimbursement of Expenses; 2) MFN Defendants' Motion for Refund; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT Hansae (saipan), Inc., DFT Marianas Garment Manufacturing, Inc., DFT Mirage (saipan), Inc., DFT Top Fashion Corporation, DFT Commonwealth Garment Manufacturing Corporation, DFT Michigan, Inc., DFT Onwel Manufacturing Saipan, Inc., DFT N.E.T. Corporation, DFT Mariana Fashions, Inc. [TTP EOD 12/04/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1635-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1067 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Partial Opposition to Manufacturing Defendants' Motion for Refund; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 12/04/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1634-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1066 Filed: 11/28/2003, Entered: 11/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of Service by Personal Delivery upon Tecker Civille Torres & Tang "Joinder to Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs" on November 13, 2003; Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [TTP EOD 11/28/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1633-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1065 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1632-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1064 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service "Notice of Hearing on Motion for Refund & MFN Defendants' Motion for Refund" on November 13, 2003; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [TTP EOD 11/20/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1631-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1063 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Defendant Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Participate in December 18, 2003 Hearing by Telephone; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [TTP EOD 11/19/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1630-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1062 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Participate in December 18, 2003 Hearing by Telepone; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [TTP EOD 11/19/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1629-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1061 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Approval of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Remaining of Remaining Claims; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 11/18/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1628-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1060 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Approval of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Remaining Claims; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/18/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1627-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1059 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion for Approval of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Remaining Claims (Set for December 18, 2003 at 9:00 a.m.); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 11/18/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1626-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1058 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Continue December 4, 2003 Hearing Date to December 18, 2003; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 11/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1625-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1057 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [TTP EOD 11/14/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1624-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1056 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [TTP EOD 11/14/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1623-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1055 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER Joo Ang Apparel's Joinder to Motion for Return fo Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT Joo Ang Apparel, Inc. [TTP EOD 11/14/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1622-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1054 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service "Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Motion for Return of Disalllowed Costs" on November 3, 2003; Filed by: DFT Concorde Garment Manufacturing Corpo [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1621-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1053 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IN CAMERA SUBMISSION of Expense Detail in Support of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Supplemental Application for Reimbursement of Expenses; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1620-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1052 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Keith F. Park in Support of Supplemental Application for Reimbursement of Expenses and in Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1619-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1051 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Rubin Filed on Behalf of Altshuler, Berzon, Nussbaum, Rubin, and Demain, in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1618-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1050 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Supplemental Application for Reimbursement of Expenses and In Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1617-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1049 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION for Reimbursement of Expenses; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1616-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1048 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Supplemental Application for Reimbursement of Expenses (Set for December 11, 2003 at 9:00 a.m.); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1615-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1047 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION MFN Defendants' Motion for Refund; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1614-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1046 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Refund (December 11, 2003 at 9:00 a.m.); Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [TTP EOD 11/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1613-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1045 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER Notice of Joinder in Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [TTP EOD 11/12/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1612-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1044 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER to Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [TTP EOD 11/12/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1611-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1043 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF Of Service ; [MCM EOD 11/07/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1610-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1042 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Filed by: DFT Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, I [TTP EOD 11/07/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1609-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1041 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT Express Manufacturing, Inc., DFT Sak [TTP EOD 11/07/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1608-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1040 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE upon Teker Civille Torres & Tang and Carlsmith Ball LLP "Notice of Hearing" and "Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs" on October 30, 2003; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 11/06/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1607-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1039 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Motion for Return on Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT Grace International, Inc. [TTP EOD 11/06/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1606-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1038 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER to Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, I [TTP EOD 11/05/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1605-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1037 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT Concorde Garment Manufacturing Corpo [TTP EOD 11/03/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1604-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1036 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Return of Disallowed Costs; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 10/30/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1603-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1035 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING (Motion for Return of Disallowed Costs Set for Hearing on December 4, 2003 at 9:00 a.m.); Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [TTP EOD 10/30/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1602-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1034 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs; [TTP EOD 09/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1601-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1033 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE of Plaintiffs' Counsel to Duan & Duan and Williams Kastner & Gibbs' Modified Motion for Court Approval of Fees and Costs Set for Hearing on September 11, 2003 at 9:00 a.m.; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 08/12/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1600-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1032 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted.; [MCM EOD 07/30/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1599-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1031 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFFS' In Camera Submission in Further Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Filed Under Seal); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [TTP EOD 07/18/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1598-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1030 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - The briefing schedule previously set by the Court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before 7/15/03; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before 9/15/03; appellant may file an optional reply brief within 14 days from the service date of the answering brief. The case is released from the Mediation Program.; [MCM EOD 06/10/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1597-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1029 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS Report on Settlement Agreement with Regard to the Third Oversight Board Member and Monitoring Bodies; [MCM EOD 06/05/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1596-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1028 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Requesting Status Report on Settlement Agreement with Regards to the Third Oversight Board Member and the Monitoring Body; [MCM EOD 05/23/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1595-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1027 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER from the Ninth Circuit re: This appeal is selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The Court will initiate a further conference by telephone on 5/13/03 @ 11am Pacific (San Francisco) Time; [MCM EOD 05/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1594-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1026 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER and Final Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Actions with Prejudice as to Various Settling Parties (Gap Group); [MCM EOD 04/23/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1593-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1025 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER and Final Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Actions with Prejudice as to Various Settling Parties (Brylane Group); [MCM EOD 04/23/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1592-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1024 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER and Final Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Actions with Prejudice as to Various Settling Parties (Most Favored Nations Defendants); [MCM EOD 04/23/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1591-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1023 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT Of Proceeding of Application for Attorney's Fees and Cost/Motion for Final Settlement Approval / Fairness Hearing and Case Management Conference held on 3/22/03; [MCM EOD 04/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1590-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1022 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBSTITUTION of Attorneys - The Gap, Inc. , et., al. defendants in this action, hereby substitutes James N. Penrod, Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP, in the place of James N. Penrod, Brobeck, Phleger & Harrsion LLP; [MCM EOD 04/09/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1589-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1021 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re Case Management Conference: 11/5/04 - Status Conference @ 9am 1/21/05 - Settlement Conference @ 9am 2/25/05 - Final Pretrial Conference @ 9am 2/28/05 - Trial @ 9am; [MCM EOD 03/24/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1588-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1020 Filed: 3/22/2003, Entered: 3/22/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES & COSTS/ MOTION FOR FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL / FAIRNESS HEARING / CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Plaintiffs were represented by Attorneys Michael Rubin, Pamela Parker and Joyce Tang. Also present on behalf of the plaintiffs via telephonically were Keith Park, Roger Adelman, and Shawn Hays. Defendants were represented as listed above. Parties submitted their arguments regarding the motions. Plaintiffs are instructed to submit documentation in detail regarding attorney fees and costs. Plaintiff stated that they will provide such documents. Plaintiffs will also submit a proposed judgment with regards to the settlement approval. Upon completion of the court proceedings, a case management conference was held with the plaintiffs and Attorney Clifford and Gregory Gilchrist on behalf of Levi Strauss. ; [TTP EOD 03/24/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1587-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1019 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Original Declaration of Pamela Parker in Support of Motion for final Settlement Approval and Application for Attorney Fees and Expenses; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1586-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1018 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Telephonic Conference; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1585-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1017 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1584-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1016 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1583-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1015 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance for March 22, 2003 Hearing: Suzanne Woodard - The May Department Stores Co. Stephen Hasegawa - J. Crew Group, Inc. Greg Birkenstock - Jones Apparel Group, Inc. Joel W. Sternman - Brylane, Donna Karran Intl., Polo, Phillips Van- Huesen, Brooks Brothers and Calvin Clein Antonio R. Sarabia II - The Gymboree Corporation Robert V. Kuenzel - The Dress Barn, Inc. (888) 422-7128 Code#672382; Filed by: DFT Cutter & Buck, Inc., DFT The Gymbore [MCM EOD 03/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1582-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1014 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT Statement; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1581-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1013 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance for the 3/22/03 hearing; Filed by: DFT Lane Bryant, Inc., DFT The Limited, [MCM EOD 03/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1580-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1012 Filed: 3/15/2003, Entered: 3/15/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Amending List of Represented Parties in Pro Hav Vice Order Dated August 28, 2001 (Ordered Joel W. Sternman be permitted to appear and participate in this case Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for the additional defendant Calvin Klein, Inc. together with local counsel John D. Osborn); [LV EOD 03/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1579-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1011 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST to Participate in March 22, 2003 Hearing on the Motions by Telephone; [LV EOD 03/17/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1578-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1010 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Amend List of Represented Parties in Pro Hac Vice Order and Designatio of local counsel; Consent to designation; proposed order amending list of represented parties in pro hac vice order dated August 28, 2001; [MCM EOD 03/14/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1577-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1009 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service; [LV EOD 03/13/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1576-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1008 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Alan M. Caplan Filed on Behalf of Bushnell, Caplan & Fielding, LLP in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbusement of Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1575-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1007 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of L. Thomas Galloway in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbusement of Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1574-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1006 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Warren Price, III Filed on Behalf of Price Okamoto Himeno & Lum in Support of Reimbursement of Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1573-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1005 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Keith F. Park Filed of Behalf of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes and Lerach LLP in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1572-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1004 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael Rubin Filed on Behalf of Altshuler, Berzon , Nussbaum, Rubin and Demain, in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1571-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1003 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Thomas Grande Filed on Behalf of David Levin Livingston Grande in Support of Reimbursement of Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1570-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1002 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX of Cases in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1569-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1001 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PLAINTIFFS' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1568-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1000 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1567-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 999 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1566-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 998 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Robert K. Goldman Re: (A) Mailing of Notice of Pendency of Class Action, and (B) Proposed Settlemtn, Objection and Opt-out Rights and Hearing (FILED IN PART UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER); [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1565-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 997 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Facsimile Declaration of Pamela Parker in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Application for Attorney' Fees and Expenses; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1564-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 996 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Joyce C.H. Tang in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Settlement Approval; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1563-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 995 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFFS' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Settlement Approval; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1562-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 994 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion for Final Settlement Approval; [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1561-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 993 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Final Settlement Approval (3/22/003 at 1:30 PM); [LV EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1560-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 992 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Counsel's Firm Affiliation; Filed by: DFT J.C. Penney Company, Inc. [MCM EOD 03/11/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1559-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 991 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE rescheduling hearings and motions set for Thursday, March 20, 2003 to Saturday, March 22, 2003 at 1:30 pm; [MGM EOD 03/10/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1558-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 990 Filed: 3/8/2003, Entered: 3/8/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to file plaintiffs' motion for final settlement approval.; [MGM EOD 03/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1557-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 989 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Osborn on behalf of defendant Calvin Klein, Inc.; [MCM EOD 03/07/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1556-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 988 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT Designation and Ordering Form; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/04/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1555-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 987 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Order Re: Agreement to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Final Settlement Approval set for 3/20/03 @ 9am; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 02/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1554-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 986 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service; [LV EOD 02/12/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1553-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 985 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Order Continuing February 12, 2003 Case Management Conference to 3/20/03; [MCM EOD 02/07/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1552-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 984 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting defendant Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Participate in February 12, 2003 Case Management Conference by Telephone; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 02/07/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1551-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 983 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Appeal and Ninth Circuit Rule 3-2 Representation Statement; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 02/06/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1550-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 982 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Participate in February 12, 2003 Case Management Conference by Telephone for Gregory Gilchrist and Robert J. Vizas; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 02/04/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1549-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 981 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER taking motion for entry of rule 54(b) judgment off calendar; [MCM EOD 02/07/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1548A-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 980 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT Pursuant to Rule 54(b); [MCM EOD 01/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1548-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 979 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Regarding Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); [LV EOD 01/21/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1547-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 978 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM Of P & A in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment on Plaintiff's Dismissed Claims and Alternative Request for 1292(b) certification; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 01/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1546-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 977 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Rule 54(b) Judgment, or alternatively certification for interlocutory appeal under 28 U. S. C. 1292(b), of plaintiff's Alien Tort Claims Act, Involuntary Servitude, and Peonage Claims scheduled for 02/20/03 @ 9am; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 01/08/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1545-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 976 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re Case Management Conference to be held on 02/12/03 @ 11am; [MCM EOD 01/06/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1544-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 975 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER Levi Strauss & Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 01/06/2003] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1543-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 974 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL Plaintiffs were represented by Attorneys Joyce Tang (via phone) and Akiko Kikuchi. Defendant, was represented by Attorney Robert O'Connor. Attorney O'Connor moved to withdraw his motion at this time. Court granted the motion. ; [KLL EOD 12/26/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1542-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 973 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service - Plaintiffs' Response to Motion of O'Connor Law Firm to Withdraw as Counsel; [LV EOD 12/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1541-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 972 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance for December 26, 2002 Hearing Re Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Joyce Tang 671-477-9891); [LV EOD 12/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1540-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 971 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT 10/31/02 hearing: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval; Continuation of Debtor's Motion to Approve Steelment in Bankruptcy case no. 02-00009, in re: Advance Textile Corp; and Hearing re consent-to-sue forms in Does I, et al vs. Advance textile Corp., et al., CV 99-0002; [LV EOD 12/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1539-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 970 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of October 31, 2002 Hearing: Defendant Levi Strauss and Company's Motion to Dismiss; [LV EOD 12/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1538-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 969 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Denying in Part and Granting in Part Defendant Levi Strauss & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; [MCM EOD 12/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1537-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 968 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF of service that copy of "NOTICE of motion and motion to withdraw as counsel, memorandum in support of motion to withdraw as counsel and declaration in support of motion to withdraw as counsel" was served on December 13, 2002.; Filed by: DFT N.E.T. Corporation [MGM EOD 12/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1536-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 967 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFFS' Response to Motion of O'Connor Law Firm to Withdraw as Counsel; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 12/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1535-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 966 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF of service; Filed by: DFT N.E.T. Corporation [MCM EOD 12/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1534-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 965 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFFS' submission of final notices of pendency of class action, proposed settlements, objection and opt-out rights and hearing; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MGM EOD 12/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1533-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 964 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS' submission of amended notices of pendency of class action, proposed settlements, objection and opt-out rights and hearing; (Exhibits A-1 through B-2); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MGM EOD 12/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1532-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 963 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFFS' submission of amended notices of pendency of class action, proposed settlements, objection and opt-out rights and hearing; (Exhibits A-1 through D-2); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MGM EOD 12/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1531-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 962 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in support of motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant N.E.T. Corporation; Filed by: DFT N.E.T. Corporation [MGM EOD 11/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1530-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 961 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION in support of motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant N.E.T. Corporation; Filed by: DFT N.E.T. Corporation [MGM EOD 11/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1529-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 960 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of motion and motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant N.E.T. Corporation; Filed by: DFT N.E.T. Corporation [MGM EOD 11/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1528-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 959 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and order extending certain deadlines in connection with settlement preliminarily approved on October 31, 2002; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 11/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1527-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 958 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Joyce C. H. Tang re: Plaintiffs' submission of final notices of pendency of class action, proposed settlements, objection and opt-out rights and hearing; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 11/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1526-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 957 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER allowing Merits Discovery against Levi Strauss & Co.; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 11/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1525-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 956 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY PROCEEDINGS: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (CONVERTED TO PDF FOR CMECF CONVERSION 7/23/2005 5:48AM) (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1524-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 955 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON DEFENDANT LEVI STRAUSS' MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiffs were represented by Attorneys Albert Meyerhoff, Joyce Tang, and Michael Rubin. Defendants were represented by Attorneys Timothy Cahn, Gregory Gilchrist (via telephone) and Thomas Clifford. Attorneys Cahn and Gilchrist argued the motion to dismiss on behalf of Levi Strauss. Attorney Rubin argued on behalf of Plaintiffs. Court, after hearing all the arguments, took the matters under advisement and stated that a written memorandum would be forthcoming. ; [KLL EOD 10/31/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1523-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 954 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER CONDITIONAL ORDER Granting plaintiff's motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; [MCM EOD 10/31/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1522-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 953 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PLAINTIFFS' submission of amended notices of pendency of class action, proposed settlements, objection and opt-out rights and hearing; [MGM EOD 10/31/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1521-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 952 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 10/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1520-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 951 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of participation via telephone for Edward Patrick Swan, Jr. on Thursday, October 31, 2002 at 10:00 am on hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Filed by: DFT Concorde Garment Manufacturing Corpo [MGM EOD 10/29/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1519-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 950 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting defendant Levi Strauss & Company's Application for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy R. Cahn; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 10/25/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1518-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 949 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANT Levi Strauss & Company's Application for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy R. Cahn; [LV EOD 10/25/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1517-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 948 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Defendant Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Participate in October 31, 2002 hearings by telephone; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 10/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1516-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 947 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANT Levi Strauss & Company's motion to particpate in October 231, 2002 hearing by telephone; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1515-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 946 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1514-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 945 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1513-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 944 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1512-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 943 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE Of Svc of submission of original declaration of Michael Rubin and submission of original declaration of Keith Park; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1511-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 942 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE Of Svc of submission of original declaration of Michael Rubin and submission of original declaration of Keith Park; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1510-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 941 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUBMISSION of original declaration of Keith Park; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/22/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1509-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 940 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUBMISSION of Original Declaration of Michael Rubin; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/22/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1508-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 939 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service Service (Stipulation by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant Levi Strauss & Co., Regarding the Third Amended Complaint/Stipluation and Order Regarding Defendant Levi's Strauss Company's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint/Plaintiffs Opposition to Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint/Appendix of Cases and Other Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint); [LV EOD 10/22/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1507-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 938 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service (Stipulation by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant Levi Strauss & Co., Regarding the Third Amended Complaint/Stipluation and Order Regarding Defendant Levi's Strauss Company's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint/Plaintiffs Opposition to Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint/Appendix of Cases and Other Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Levi Strauss & Company's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint); [LV EOD 10/22/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1506-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 937 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service (Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Keith Park/ Application for Pro Vice Admission of Keith Park/ Declaration of Keith Park in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice/Stipulation and Order re: Extension of Time to Mail Distribute and Publish Settlement Notices/Erratum Re: Third Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief); [LV EOD 10/22/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1505-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 936 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of facsimile declaration of Michael Rubin in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of settlements; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1504-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 935 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of filing of facsimile declaration of Keith Park in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of settlements; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1503-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 934 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Joyce C.H. Tang in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of settlement; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1502-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 933 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM plaintiff's memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion for preliminary approval of settlement; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1501-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 932 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of motion for preliminary approval of settlement; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1500-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 931 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION plaintiff's motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - scheduled for 10/31/02 @ 10am; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1499-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 930 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and order regarding defendant Levi Strauss & Company's reply in support of motion to dismiss third amended complaint - reply may be 16 pages in length; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 10/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1498-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 929 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY Defendant Levi Strauss & Company's reply in support of motion to dismiss third amended complaint; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 10/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1497-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 928 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Defendant Levi Strauss & Company's Notice of Non Opposition to allow merits discovery; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 10/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1496-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 927 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and order re: agreement to shorten time for hearing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary settlement approval; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1495-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 926 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM Of P & A in support of plaintiffs' motyion to allow merits discovery against Levi Strauss & Co.; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/15/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1494-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 925 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of motion to allow merits discovery against Levi Strauss & Co.; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/15/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1493-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 924 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and order staying litigation until hearing on Preliminary approval of settlement agreement; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/09/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1492-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 923 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service of Entry of Appearance; Filed by: DFT The May Department Stores Company [MCM EOD 10/09/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1491-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 922 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance by John D. Osborn on behalf of defendant The May Department Stores Company; Filed by: DFT The May Department Stores Company [MCM EOD 10/09/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1490-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 921 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              2ND STIPULATION and Order regarding defendant Levi Strauss & Company's motion to dismiss third amended complaint; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1489-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 920 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION by and Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Levi Strauss & Co., regarding the Third Amended Complaint; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1488-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 919 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX of Cases and other authorities in support of plaintiff's opposition to Levi Strauss & Company's motion to dismiss the third amended complaint; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1487-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 918 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION to Levi Strauss & Company's motion to dismiss the third amended complaint (hearing set for 10/31/02 @ 9am); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 10/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1486-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 917 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting application for pro hac vice admission of Keith Park; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 09/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1485-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 916 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Keith Park in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 09/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1484-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 915 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Keith Park; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 09/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1483-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 914 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and order regarding defendant Levi Strauss & Company's motion to dismiss third amended complaint; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 09/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1482-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 913 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and order re: extension of time to mail, distribute and publish settlement notices; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 09/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1481-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 912 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and order enlarging time to respond to third amended complaint; [MCM EOD 09/10/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1480-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 911 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 09/09/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1479-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 910 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 09/09/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1478-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 909 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATUM RE: Thrid Amended Complaint for damages and injunctive relief - Demand for Jury Trial; [MCM EOD 09/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1477-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 908 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service (Levi Strauss & Co's Notice of Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint); [LV EOD 08/26/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1476-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 907 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LEVI STRAUSS & CO.'S memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion to dismiss and / or strike portions of plaintiff's third amended complaint; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 08/23/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1475-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 906 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LEVI STRAUSS & CO'S Notice of motion to dismiss and / or strike portions of plaintiff's third amended complaint scheduled for 9/26/02 @ 9am; Filed by: DFT Levi Strauss & Company [MCM EOD 08/23/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1474-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 905 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address and phone numbers of Alschuler Grossman Stein & Kahan LLP; Filed by: DFT Tommy Hilfiger Usa, Inc. [MCM EOD 08/13/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1473-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 904 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and order re: extension of discovery cut-off and opposition to defendant Target Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 08/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1472-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 901 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and order extending time to respond to third amended complaint (Defendants Target Corporation , the Associated Merchandising Corporation and Levi Strauss & Co. shall have until 8/26/02 to respond to the Third Amended Complaint; [MCM EOD 08/08/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1469-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 903 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service; [LV EOD 08/09/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1471-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 902 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service; [LV EOD 08/09/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1470-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 900 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANT Joo Ang Apparel, Inc.'s answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint; [LV EOD 08/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1468-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 899 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and order re: duties and responsibilities of lead and liaison counsel; [MCM EOD 08/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1467-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 898 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN of subpoena in a civil case for SGMA executed on 8/1/02; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 08/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1466-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 897 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service of docs. upon parties; Filed by: DFT Hansae (saipan), Inc., DFT Top Fashion Corporation, DFT Onwel Manufacturing Saipan, Inc., DFT Mariana Fashions, Inc. [MCM EOD 08/01/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1465-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 896 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service of answer to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories to defendant Pang Jin Sang Corp.; defendant Pang Jin Sa Corp's response to plaintiffs' fourth set of requests for prodcution of documents; answer to plaintiffs' fourth set of special interrogatories to defendant United International Corp.; and defendant United International Corp.'s response to plaintiff's fourth set of requests for production of documents upon parties; Filed by: DFT Pang Jin Sang Sa Corporation [MCM EOD 07/26/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1464-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 895 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT for damages and injunctive relief - demand for jury trial; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 07/25/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1463-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 894 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER sealing defendant Sako Corp.'s accidentally filed responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories and fourth request for production of documents; [MCM EOD 07/25/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1462-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 893 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE Defendant Sako Corporation's ex parte motion to place under seal accidentally filed responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories and fourth request for production of documents; Filed by: DFT Sako Corporation [MCM EOD 07/25/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1461-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 892 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE Defendant Sako Corporation's responses to plaintiff's fourth request for production of documents; Filed by: DFT Sako Corporation [MCM EOD 07/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1460-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 891 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE Defendant Sako Corporation's responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories; Filed by: DFT Sako Corporation [MCM EOD 07/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1459-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 890 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of service of Def. Uno Moda Corporation's Responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories; defendant Uno Moda Corporations' responses to plaintiff's fourth request for production of documents; defendant Uno Moda Corp.'s highly confidential addendum to its responses to plaintiff's third set fo special interrogatories; defendant Uno Moda Corp.'s amended highly confidential addendum to it responses to plaintiff's second set of special interrogatories; defendant Uno Moda Corp.'s responses to plaintiff's fourth request for production of documents; defendant Winners Corp.'s responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories; and defendant Winners Corp.'s highly confidential addendum to its responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories upon parties on 7/23/02; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [MCM EOD 07/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1458-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 889 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF of service of Def. Uno Moda Corporation's Responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories; defendant Uno Moda Corporations' responses to plaintiff's fourth request for production of documents; defendant Uno Moda Corp.'s highly confidential addendum to its responses to plaintiff's third set fo special interrogatories; defendant Uno Moda Corp.'s amended highly confidential addendum to it responses to plaintiff's second set of special interrogatories; defendant Uno Moda Corp.'s responses to plaintiff's fourth request for production of documents; defendant Winners Corp.'s responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories; and defendant Winners Corp.'s highly confidential addendum to its responses to plaintiff's third set of special interrogatories upon Teker Civille on 7/22/02; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [MCM EOD 07/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1457-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 888 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and order re: extension of time to mail, distribute and publish settlement notices; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 07/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1456-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 887 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF of Service (of Subpoena upon Saipan Garment Manufacturers' Associateion, Ltd.); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 07/17/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1455-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 886 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT Of Proceeding Motion in Furtherance of May 10, 2002 Order held on 6/07/02; [MCM EOD 07/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1454-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 885 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting joint request for modification of settlement notices; [MCM EOD 07/02/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1453-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 884 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and order re: extension of time to file details of lead counsel; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 07/01/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1452-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 883 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFF'S and Settling Defendant's Joint request for modification of settlement notices; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 07/01/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1451-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 882 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by personal delivery of the Declaration of Defendant US CNMI Development Corporation; Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [MCM EOD 06/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1450-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 881 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF of Service by Facsimile (Declaration of Defendant US CNMI Development Corporation); Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [LV EOD 06/26/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1449-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 880 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and order re: extension of time to file third amended complaint; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/26/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1448-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 879 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Defendant US-CNMI Development Corporation; [LV EOD 06/25/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1447-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 878 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER modifying the May 10, 2002 Order regarding the publication of settlement notices; [MCM EOD 06/14/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1446-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 877 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service of docs upon parties on 6/12/02 re notice of telephonic appearance for motion in furtherance of 5/10/02 order; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/13/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1445-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 876 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service of plaintiffs and the Class request for designation of lead counsel, plaintiffs and the Class amended request for designation of lead counsel, order granting application for pro hac vice admission of Benny C. Goodman, III, Application for pro hac vice admission of Benny C. Goodman, III and Declaration of Benny C. Goodman , III FPR Application admission pro hac vice upon parties on 5/24/02; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/13/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1444-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 875 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF of Service (Declaration Regarding Posting of Notice of Settlement); [LV EOD 06/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1443-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 874 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of Service (Declaration Regarding Posting of Notice of Settlement (filed June 7, 2002)); Filed by: DFT Grace International, Inc. [LV EOD 06/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1442-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 873 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST plaintiff's request for modification of May 10, 2002 Order regarding methods of publishing notice of settlements; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1441-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 872 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting plaintiff's motion in furtherance of May 10, 2002 order and to extend time to mail, distribute and publish settlement notices, to extend fairness hearing date, and to require defendants to provide names and addresses of former workers; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/10/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1440-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 871 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and order re: extension of time to file third amended complaint (parties stipulated the period of time for the plaintiffs to file a third amended complaint shall be extended from June 10, 2002 to June 25, 2002; [LV EOD 06/10/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1439-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 870 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF of service of Declarations regarding the posting of Notice of Settlement upon parties on 6/6/02; Filed by: DFT Uno Moda Corporation, DFT Winners Co [MCM EOD 06/10/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1438-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 869 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF of Service by Facsimile (Declaration of Defendant US CNMI Development Corporation of Posting of Notice of the Proposed Settlements in Accordance with the Court's Order of May 10, 2002; [LV EOD 06/10/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1437-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 868 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY MOTION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE MAY 10, 2002 ORDER. Plaintiffs were represented in Court by Attorney Joyce Tang. Defendants were represented in Court by Attorneys Richard Pierce, Robert Goldberg, Sean Frink, Wesley Bogdan, Matthew Smith, Colin Thompson, Perry Inos, and Joseph Horey Attorney Pamela Parker (via telephone) argued the motion for the Plaintiffs. Court, after hearing all argument, ordered that the defendants make available the documents needed and set appropriate dates in which to do so, and further stated that a written order would be forthcoming.; [MCM EOD 06/08/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1436-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 867 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION regarding posting of notice of settlement; Filed by: DFT Grace International, Inc. [MCM EOD 06/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1435-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 866 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Motion; [LV EOD 06/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1434-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 865 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Telephonic appearance for June 7, 2002 hearing re motion in furtherance of May 10, 2002 order and to extend time to mail distribute and publish settlement notices to extend fairness hearing date and to require defendants to prove names; [MCM EOD 06/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1433-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 864 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service; [MCM EOD 06/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1432-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 863 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service; [MCM EOD 06/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1431-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 862 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service of declaration re posting of notice of settlement at United International Corporation, Net Appaal Co., Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, Inc. and Pang Jin Sang Sa Corp.; Filed by: DFT Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, I [MCM EOD 06/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1430-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 861 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION regarding the posting of notice of settlement; Filed by: DFT Neo Fashion Inc., DFT Uno Moda Corpo [MCM EOD 06/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1429-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 860 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re posting of notice of settlement at United International Corporation, Net apparel Co., Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, Inc. (nka RIFU) and Pang Jing Sang Sa Corp.; Filed by: DFT Micronesian Garment Manufacturing, I [MCM EOD 06/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1428-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 859 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re posting of notice of settlement at Sako Corporation; Filed by: DFT Sako Corporation [MCM EOD 06/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1427-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 858 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re posting of Notice of Settlement at Express MFG. Inc.; Filed by: DFT Express Manufacturing, Inc. [MCM EOD 06/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1426-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 857 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM Of P & A in support of motion in furtherance of May 10, 2002 order and to extend time to mail, distribute and publish settlement notices, to extend fairness hearing date, and to require defendants to provide names and addresses of former workers; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1425-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 856 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of motion and motion in furtherance of May 10, 2002 Order and to Extend time to mail, distribute and publish settlement notices, to extend fairness hearing date, and to require defendants to provide names and addresses of former workers; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1424-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 855 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE motion under local rules 7.1.h.3(b) and 7.1.h.5 for an order shortening time; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 06/06/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1423-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 854 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF of service of Declaration re posting of Notice of Settlement; [MCM EOD 06/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1422-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 853 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF of service of Declaration re Posting of Notice of Settlement at Top Fashion and Onwel; [MCM EOD 06/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1421-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 852 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF of service by personal delivery; Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [MCM EOD 06/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1420-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 851 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN of service of Subpoena in a civil case for Handsome (Saipan) Inc. executed on 5/30/02; [MCM EOD 06/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1419-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 850 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN of Subpoena in a Civil Case for Jin Apparel, Inc. executed on 5/30/02; [MCM EOD 06/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1418-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 849 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving plaintiff's lead and liaison counsel and defendant's co-liaison counsel; [MCM EOD 06/04/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1417-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 848 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Herman M. De Leon Guerrero; Filed by: DFT Concorde Garment Manufacturing Corpo [MCM EOD 06/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1416-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 847 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of defendant US-CNMI Development Corporation of Posting of Notice of the Proposed Settlements in Accordance with the Court's Order of May 10, 2002; Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [MCM EOD 06/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1415-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 846 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION Re Posting of notice of Settlement at Onwel; [LV EOD 06/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1414-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 845 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION Re Posting of Notice of Settlement at Top Fashion ; [LV EOD 06/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1413-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 844 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re posting of notice of settlement; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [MCM EOD 05/31/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1412-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 843 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and order re: extension of time to publish, mail and deliver notice of proposed settlements and to file third amended complaint; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1411-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 842 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOMINATION of Robert J. O'Connor as Lead Class Counsel for Manufacturing Defendants; [LV EOD 05/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1410-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 841 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising's Opposition to request for lead counsel submissions set for 5/24/02; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 05/24/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1409-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 840 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Retail Defendant's Submission Pursuant to Order dated May 10, 2002; Filed by: DFT J.C. Penney Company, Inc. [MCM EOD 05/23/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1408-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 839 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED plaintiffs' and the Class' amended request for designation of lead counsel for the class; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/22/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1407-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 838 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST Plaintiffs' and the Class' request for designation of Lead Counsel for the Class; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/22/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1406-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 837 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting application for pro hac vice admission of Benny C. Goodman, III; [MCM EOD 05/21/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1405-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 836 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Benny C. Goodman, III for Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 05/21/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1404-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 835 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION For Pro Hac Vice Admission of Benny C. Goodman, III; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 05/21/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1403-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 834 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT on "PLAINTIFFS' motion to strike" scheduled on Thursday, May 16, 2002; [MGM EOD 05/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1402-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 833 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY Plainitff's Motion to Strike: Plaintiffs were represented by Attorneys Michael Rubin (via telephone), Pamela Parker (via telephone). Defendants were reporesented by attorneys Perry Inos and Harold J. McElhinny (via telephone). Court reported a tentative ruling. All attorneys made their comments and stated their agreement to the tentative ruling. Court granted plaintiff's motion to strike and will issue an order consistent with its tentative rule. Adjourned 9:11 a.m. ; [LV EOD 05/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1401-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 832 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting plaintiffs' Rule 56(f) request to defer defendants Target's and The Associated Merchandising Corp.'s motion for summary judgment; [MCM EOD 05/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1400-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 831 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUBMISSION of original declaration of Angela Padilla in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion to strike; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 05/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1399-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 830 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBMISSION of original declaration of Angela L. Padilla in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's opposition to plaintiff's request pursuant to Federal rule of Civil Procedure 56(f); Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 05/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1398-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 829 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUBMISSION of original declaration of Kay Schultz in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 05/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1397-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 828 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUBMISSION of original declaration of Ellen K. Tansey in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 05/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1396-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 827 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUBMISSION of original declaration of Michael D. Ladin in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corporation, DFT Target Corporation [MCM EOD 05/16/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1395-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 826 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance for May 16, 2002 Hearing Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Pamela Parker, Michael Rubin at 1-800-600-2869 participant code: 613042); [LV EOD 05/15/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1394-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 825 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance for the May 16, 2002 Hearing (Harold J. McElhinny will participate by phone 5/16/02 at 9:00 AM PH# 1-800-600-2869 participant code is 613042); Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [LV EOD 05/15/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1393-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 824 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Plaintiff's reply memorandum; Notice of filing of fax of reply declaration; Application of Pro Hac Vice ; Declaration of Shawn M. Hays; and Order granting pro hac vice application upon parties on 5/7/02; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/15/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1392-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 823 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE Of Svc of Plaintiff's reply memorandum; Notice of filing of fax of reply declaration; Application of Pro Hac Vice ; Declaration of Shawn M. Hays; and Order granting pro hac vice application upon parties on 5/7/02; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/15/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1391-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 822 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBMISSION of original declaration of Pamela M. Parker; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/13/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1390-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 821 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUBMISSION of original reply declaration of Pamela M. Parker; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/13/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1389-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 820 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part customer defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiff's second amended complaint; [MCM EOD 05/10/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1388-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 819 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER consolidating case nos. CV-01-0031, CV-01-0036 and CV-01-003 for purposes of partial settlement; granting plaintiff's motion for class certification denying defendants' motion to strike the declaration of Arthur Miller; granting plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of settlements; and granting plaintiffs' motion for an order requiring contractor defendants to post notices of proposed settlement; [MCM EOD 05/10/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1387-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 818 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing of facsimile of reply declaration of Pamela M. Parker pending receipt of original; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1386-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 817 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in further support of request pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(f) to defer defendants Target Corp.'s and the Associated Merchandising Corp.'s motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 5/16/02 @ 9am; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1385-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 816 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shawn M. Hays; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1384-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 815 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Shawn M. Hays for Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1383-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 814 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shawn M. Hays; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 05/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1382-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 813 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service that copy of "NOTICE of telephonic appearance for April 5, 2002 hearing re: plaintiffs' motion to strike" was served upon parties on April 4, 2002; [MGM EOD 05/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1381-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 812 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service that copy of "NOTICE of telephonic appearance for April 5, 2002 hearing re: plaintiffs' motion to strike" was served upon parties on April 4, 2002; [MGM EOD 05/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1380-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 811 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service that copy of "ORDER granting application for pro hac vice admission of Michelle M. Ciccarelli"; "APPLICATION for pro hac vice admission of Michelle M. Ciccarelli"; and "DECLARATION of Michelle M. Ciccarelli for application for admission pro hac vice" was served upon parties on April 4, 2002.; [MGM EOD 05/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1379-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 810 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service that copy of "ORDER granting application for pro hac vice admission of Michelle M. Ciccarelli"; "APPLICATION for pro hac vice admission of Michelle M. Ciccarelli"; and "DECLARATION of Michelle M. Ciccarelli for application for admission pro hac vice" was served upon parties on April 4, 2002.; [MGM EOD 05/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1378-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 809 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service that copy "ORDER regarding plaintiffs' motion to strike" was served upon parties on April 12, 2002.; [MGM EOD 04/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1377-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 808 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service that copy "ORDER regarding plaintiffs' motion to strike" was served upon parties on April 2, 2002.; [MGM EOD 04/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1376-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 807 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service that copy "PLAINTIFFS' reply memorandum in support of their motion to strike"; "DECLARATION of Joyce C.H. Tang in support of plaintiffs' reply memorandum in support of their motion to strike" was served April 5, 2002.; [MGM EOD 04/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1375-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 806 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Angela L. Padilla in support of Target Corporation's and The Associated Merchandising Corporation's opposition to plaintiffs' request pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f); Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MGM EOD 04/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1374-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 805 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TARGET Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f); Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [LV EOD 04/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1373-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 804 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service that copy of "NOTICE of filing facsimile of declaration of Pamela M. Parker pending receipt of original" was served upon parties on April 23, 2002.; [MGM EOD 04/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1372-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 803 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service that copy of "NOTICE of filing facsimile of declaration of Pamela M. Parker pending receipt of original" was served upon parties on April 23, 2002.; [MGM EOD 04/30/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1371-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 802 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Facsimile of Declaration of Pamela M. Parker Pending Receipt of Original; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 04/23/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1370-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 801 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and order Modifying Protective Order; [LV EOD 04/23/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1369-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 800 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT Of Proceeding plaintiff's motion to strike Target Corporation and Associated Merchandising Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment held on 4/5/02; [MCM EOD 04/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1368-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 799 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER regarding plaintiff's motion to strike; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 04/08/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1367-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 798 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY PROCEEDINGS: PLTFS. MOTION TO STRIKE TARGET CORPORATION AND THE ASSOCIATED MERCHANDISING CORP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Plaintiffs were represented by Attorneys Michael Rubin (via telephone), Pamela Parker (via telephone) and Joyce Tang. Defendants were represented by Attorneys Perry Inos and Harold J. McElhinny (via telephone). Court reported the tentative ruling. Attorney McElhinny argued against the motion. Attorney Pamela Parker argued on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Court ruled that the Plaintiffs shall file their Rule 56 (F) affidavit by Monday, April 23rd; moving party defendant shall file opposition by the 30th of April; reply shall be filed by May 7th and the hearing will be on May 16th at 9:00 a.m. ; [KLL EOD 04/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1366-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 797 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of firm name to: Katten Muchin Zavis Rosenman; Filed by: DFT Brooks Brothers, Inc. [MCM EOD 04/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1365-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 796 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Joyce C.H. Tang In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Strike; [LV EOD 04/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1364-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 795 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINITFFS' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Strike (4/5/02); [LV EOD 04/05/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1363-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 794 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of motion to dismiss second amended complaint held on 3/19/02; [MCM EOD 04/04/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1362-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 793 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service CERTIFICATE of Service ( 1- Notice of Motion 2-Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike form the hearing calendar defendants Target, Inc's and Associated Merchandising Corp's Motion for Summary Judgment 3-Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Palintiffs' Motion to Strike form the hearing calendar defendans target, Inc.'s and Associated Merchandising Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment;; [LV EOD 04/04/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1361-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 791 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance for the April 5, 2002 at 11:00 a.m.; [LV EOD 04/04/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1359-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 792 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service ( 1- Notice of Motion 2-Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike form the hearing calendar defendants Target, Inc's and Associated Merchandising Corp's Motion for Summary Judgment 3-Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Palintiffs' Motion to Strike form the hearing calendar defendans target, Inc.'s and Associated Merchandising Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 04/04/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1360-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 790 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Association's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; [LV EOD 04/04/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1358-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 789 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Angela L. Padilla In Support of Target Corporation's an dthe Associated Merchandising Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike; [LV EOD 04/04/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1357-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 788 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting application for pro hac vice admission of Michelle M. Ciccarelli; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 04/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1356-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 787 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michelle M. Ciccarelli for application for admission pro hac vice; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 04/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1355-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 786 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION Pro Hac Vice for Michelle M. Ciccarelli; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 04/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1354-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 785 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of telephonic appearance for April 5, 2002 hearing re: plaintiff's motion to strike set for April 5, 2002; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 04/03/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1353-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 784 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike from the Hearing Calendar Defendants Target, Inc.'s and Associated Merchandising Corp's Motion for Summary Judgment; [LV EOD 04/01/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1352-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 783 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion (4/5/02 at 11:00 AM); [LV EOD 04/01/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1351-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 782 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Strike form the Hearing Calendar Defendants Target, Inc's and Assiciated Merchandising Corp's Motion for Summary Judgment ( April 5, 2002 @ 11:00 AM); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 04/01/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1350-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 781 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and order re: plaintiffs' motion to strike Target Corp. and the Associated Merchandising Corp's motion for summary judgment scheduled for 4/5/02 @ 11am; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/29/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1349-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 780 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service (Notice of Supplemental Authority Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss); [LV EOD 03/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1348-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 779 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service (Notice of Supplemental Authority Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Dedendants' Motion to Dismiss; [LV EOD 03/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1347-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 778 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of Service (1 - Statement of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment; 2 - Notice of Motion and Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment 3 - Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment 4) Declaration of Ellen K. Tansey in Support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment; 5) Declaration of Michael D. Laden in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment 6) Declaration of Kay Schultz in Support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment); [LV EOD 03/27/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1346-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 777 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael D. Laden in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 03/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1345-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 776 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Ellen K. Tansey in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 03/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1344-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 775 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Kay Schultz in support of Target Corporation's and The Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 03/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1343-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 774 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of uncontroverted fact in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 03/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1342-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 773 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in support of Target Corporation's and the Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for summary judgment; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 03/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1341-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 772 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of motion and Target Corporation's and Associated Merchandising Corporation's motion for Summary Judgment set for 4/18/02 @ 9am; Filed by: DFT The Associated Merchandising Corpor [MCM EOD 03/20/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1340-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 771 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO DISMISS 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs were represented by Attorney Michael Rubin, and Joyce Tang. Defendants were represented by Attorneys Thomas Clifford, John Osborn, William Fitzgerald, Steven Pixley, Robert Goldberg, Jay Sorensen, Brian McMahon, Eric S. Smith, Richard Pierce, Robert O'Connor, Reginald Steer, Brien Nicholas, Colin Thompson, Daralyn Durey, Albert H. Meyerhoff, Michael Cantor and Gregory P. Joseph. Attorneys Gregory P. Joseph, Richard Pierce and Duralyn Durey argued the motion on behalf of defendants. Attorney Rubin argued on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Court, after hearing all the arguments, took the matters under advisement and stated that a written memorandum would be forthcoming. ; [KLL EOD 03/19/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1339-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 770 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of Service (Reply by Certain Defendants in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint); [LV EOD 03/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1338-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 769 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 03/18/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1337-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 768 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service that copy of "MANUFACTURER defendants' reply to plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' second amended complaint" was served on March 12, 2002.; [MGM EOD 03/15/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1336-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 767 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF of Service by Personal Delivery (Defenants US CNMI Development Corporation's Notice of Joinder in the Manufacturer Defenants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dimiss Second Amended Complaint to the Law Office of Teker Civille Torres & Tang); Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [LV EOD 03/14/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1335-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 766 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF of Service by Facsimile (Defendant US CNMI Development Corporation's Notice of Joinder in the Manufacturer Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion fot Dismiss Second Amended Complaint) ; [LV EOD 03/14/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1334-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 765 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of joinder in the manufacturer defendants' reply to plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' second amended complaint scheduled for 3/19/02; Filed by: DFT Us-cnmi Development Corporation [MCM EOD 03/13/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1333-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 764 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Certain Defendants in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: DFT American Pacific Textile, Inc., DFT [LV EOD 03/13/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1332-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 763 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Order Re: Page Limit; [LV EOD 03/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1331-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 762 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX of Electronic, State and Legislative Authorities in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; [LV EOD 03/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1330-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 761 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Manufacturer Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; [LV EOD 03/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1329-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 760 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service (Notice of Bankruptcy Filing); Filed by: DFT Advance Textile Corporation [LV EOD 03/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1328-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 759 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY defendant's reply in support of their motion to dismiss the second amended complaint; [MCM EOD 03/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1327-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 758 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service (Submission of Original Declaration of Professor Arthur Miller); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 03/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1326-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 757 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service (Submission of Original Declaration of Professor Arthur Miller); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 03/12/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1325-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 756 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing; Filed by: DFT Advance Textile Corporation [LV EOD 03/11/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1324-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 755 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service (Declaration of Joyce C.H. Tang Responding to Defendants' Motion for LEave to File Supplemental Material and for Hearing on Shortened Time); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 03/11/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1323-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 754 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUBMISSION of Original Declaration of Elizabeth J. Arleo (UNDER SEAL); Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 03/11/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1322-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 753 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUBMISSION of Original Declaration of Professor Arthur Miller; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [LV EOD 03/11/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1321-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 752 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1320-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 751 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1319-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 750 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1318-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 749 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Generic GCMS Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE Of Svc ; Filed by: PTF Doe I, PTF Doe Ii, PTF Doe Iii, PTF [MCM EOD 03/07/2002] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1317-1) (cnv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 424 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?