USA v. JONATHAN MARKOVICH, et al
Federal Court Proceeding Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:20-mj-06469

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2021 at 1:31 PM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Travel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Continue
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Continue
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Modify Conditions of Release
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Initial Appearance (MJ CASE ONLY-NO ARRAIGNMENT) & SDO
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 396 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?